Faubus v. iFinex Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:20-cv-00211-KPF
District Judge Katherine Polk Failla, presiding

Tags
Last Updated February 15, 2021 at 4:56 PM ST (4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bryan Faubus, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Bradley Linkh +1 646 722 4180 glinkh@glancylaw.com
Space Brian P Murray +1 212 682 5340 +1 212 884 0988 bmurray@glancylaw.com
v.
No Logo BFXNA Inc., Defendant
No Logo BFXWW Inc., Defendant
No Logo DigFinex Inc., Defendant
No Logo iFinex Inc., Defendant
No Logo John Does 1-50, Defendant
No Logo Tether Holdings Limited, Defendant
No Logo Tether International Limited, Defendant
No Logo Tether Limited, Defendant
No Logo Tether Operations Limited, Defendant
No Logo Adam Kurtz, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirby McInerney LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen M. Lerner +1 212 371 6600 klerner@kmllp.com
No Logo David Crystal, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirby McInerney LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen M. Lerner +1 212 371 6600 klerner@kmllp.com
No Logo ERIC YOUNG, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirby McInerney LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen M. Lerner +1 212 371 6600 klerner@kmllp.com
No Logo Joseph Ebanks, Movant
Office Foley Square
Filed 1/9/2020
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Dutchess
Terminated 5/19/2020
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
119-cv-09236-KPF
Related Case
119-cv-09236-KPF
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,ECF,MEMBER,RELATED
  Entries (48) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: 1/27/2021 Notice of Filing Transcript
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/22/20 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF.(McGuirk, Kelly)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: 1/27/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 12/22/2020 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/17/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/1/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2021.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF.(McGuirk, Kelly)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: 10/27/2020 Proposed Protective Order
      PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Matthew Script..(Roche, Kyle)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank  Motion Hearing
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Telephone Hearing held on 2/27/2020 re: (58 in 1:19-cv-09236-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Roche Freedman LLP and Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky LLP as Interim Class Counsel filed by Aaron Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Pinchas Goldshtein, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, (24 in 1:20-cv-00169-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kirby McInerney LLP and the Radice Law Firm as Interim Lead Counsel filed by Eric Young, Adam Kurtz, David Crystal, (78 in 1:19-cv-09236-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Aaron Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Pinchas Goldshtein, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, (69 in 1:19-cv-09236-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel filed by Joseph Ebanks: For the reasons set forth on the record, the Leibowitz Plaintiffs' motion to appoint Lead Counsel is GRANTED, and the Young and Faubus Plaintiffs' motions are denied. (Court Reporter Pamela Utter) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF(tn)
          LREF
          Blank  set/reset hearings
          Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF(tn)
            LREF
            Blank  Oral Argument
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Oral Argument held on 2/24/2020 re: (58 in 1:19-cv-09236-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Roche Freedman LLP and Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky LLP as Interim Class Counsel filed by Aaron Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Pinchas Goldshtein, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, (24 in 1:20-cv-00169-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kirby McInerney LLP and the Radice Law Firm as Interim Lead Counsel filed by Eric Young, Adam Kurtz, David Crystal, (69 in 1:19-cv-09236-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel filed by Joseph Ebanks: Attorneys Kyle William Roche, Todd Michael Schneider, Matthew Sinclair Weiler, Caitlin Joan Halligan and Joseph Michael Delich representing the Leibowitz Plaintiffs present. Attorneys Karen M. Lerner, John D. Ridce, David E. Kovel and Anthony Epifanio Maneiro representing the Young Plaintiffs present. Attorney Gregory Bradley Link representing Plaintiff Faubus present. Attorneys Brian E. Cochran and Samuel Howard Rudman representing Plaintiff Ebanks present. Attorneys Jim Walden, Veronica Wayner and Daniel Chirlin representing iFinex Defendants present. The Court defers ruling on motions at this time. The next conference, to be held telephonically, is scheduled for 2/27/2020 at 4:00 p.m. At the appointed time, the parties are directed to call the conference system at (888) 363-4749, and enter access code 6624801. Please note that the conference line will not be available until the scheduled time (4:00 p.m.). (Court Reporter Khris Sellin) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF(tn)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: 2/12/2020 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for oral argument concerning the pending motions to appoint interim lead class counsel on February 24, 2020, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. (Oral Argument set for 2/24/2020 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/11/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF (jca)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 Response to motion
                RESPONSE to Motion re: (78 in 1:19-cv-09236-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., (69 in 1:19-cv-09236-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel., (24 in 1:20-cv-00169-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kirby McInerney LLP and the Radice Law Firm as Interim Lead Counsel. . Document filed by David Crystal, Adam Kurtz, Eric Young. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF.(Kovel, David)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: 1/28/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER: On January 17, 2020, the Court ordered that all counsel seeking to be heard regarding the appointment of lead interim counsel to file their papers on or before January 27, 2020. The Court recognizes that certain counsel had filed motions to be appointed lead interim counsel prior to January 27, 2020, giving other counsel the opportunity to file opposition papers to those pending motions on January 27, 2020. In the interest of allowing interested counsel an equal opportunity to oppose motions to be appointed lead interim counsel, the Court will permit counsel to file papers opposing lead interim counsel motions that were filed on January 27, 2020. Such opposition papers shall be filed on or before February 7, 2020. ( Responses due by 2/7/2020) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/28/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF(mro)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: 1/28/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (24 in 1:20-cv-00169-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kirby McInerney LLP and the Radice Law Firm as Interim Lead Counsel. Plaintiff Bryan Faubus's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Appoint Counsel Kirby McInerney LLP and the Radice Law Firm as Interim Lead Counsel. Document filed by Bryan Faubus. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF(Linkh, Gregory)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Response to motion
                      RESPONSE to Motion re: (58 in 1:19-cv-09236-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Roche Freedman LLP and Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky LLP as Interim Class Counsel., (24 in 1:20-cv-00169-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kirby McInerney LLP and the Radice Law Firm as Interim Lead Counsel., (69 in 1:19-cv-09236-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel. . Document filed by David Crystal, Adam Kurtz, Eric Young. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF(Lerner, Karen)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Notice of appearance
                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen M. Lerner on behalf of David Crystal, Adam Kurtz, Eric Young. (Lerner, Karen)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Order on Motion to consolidate casesCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting (61) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:19-cv-09236-KPF; granting (27) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:20-cv-00169-KPF. The Court is in receipt of the parties' January 16, 2020 joint motion in Leibowitz v. iFinex, Inc., No. 19 Civ. 9236, Young v. iFinex, Inc., No. 20 Civ. 169, Faubus v. iFinex, Inc., No. 20 Civ. 211, seeking to consolidate the matters. The Court is also in receipt of a letter dated January 24, 2020, filed in Ebanks v. iFinex, Inc., No. 20 Civ. 453, requesting that the Court consolidate that matter with Leibowitz, Young, and Faubus as well. The parties' motions are GRANTED. The following actions are hereby consolidated: a. Leibowitz v. iFinex, Inc., No. 19 Civ. 9236; b. Young v. iFinex, Inc., No. 20 Civ. 169; c. Faubus v. iFinex, Inc., No. 20 Civ. 211; d. Ebanks v. iFinex, Inc., No. 20 Civ. 453. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/24/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF (mro)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  Case Consolidation - Member
                            CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:19-cv-09236-KPF. (mro)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: 1/17/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                              SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' joint motion in the above-captioned cases, seeking to consolidate the matters, set a briefing schedule for motions to appoint interim lead counsel, and adjourn the current deadline for Defendants in Leibowitz v. iFinex, Inc., No. 19 Civ. 9236 to file a motion to dismiss. The Court will address the parties' motion to consolidate after it receives Plaintiffs letter in Ebanks v. iFinex, Inc., 20 Civ. 453, letter regarding the same. All counsel seeking to be heard regarding the pending motions to appoint lead interim counsel shall file their papers on or before January 27, 2020. No later than seven days after the appointment of interim lead counsel, counsel for Defendants and interim lead counsel for Plaintiffs shall submit a proposed scheduling order setting forth deadlines for the filing of a consolidated amended complaint and any anticipated motion to dismiss. The briefing schedule concerning an anticipated motion to dismiss in Leibowitz v. iFinex, Inc., No. 19 Civ. 9236 is hereby ADJOURNED sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/17/2020) (jca)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: 1/17/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Samuel H. Rudman dated January 17, 2020 re: Consolidation and Motions for Interim Class Counsel. Document filed by Joseph Ebanks.(Rudman, Samuel)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Gregory B. Linkh et al. dated 01/16/2020 re: Consolidation of Related Actions. Document filed by Bryan Faubus.(Linkh, Gregory)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court recently received Faubus v. iFinex, Inc., No. Civ. 211, as a case related to two previously assigned case, Leibowitz v. iFinex, Inc., No. 19 Civ. 9236 and Young v. iFinex, Inc., No. 20 Civ. 169. Plaintiff in this matter is hereby ORDERED to provide the Court with a letter brief, not to exceed five pages in length, stating their positions regarding whether the three cases should be consolidated. These letter briefs shall be filed on or before January 24, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/14/2020) (va)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank  Case Designation
                                      Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
                                        NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Case Accepted as Related
                                          CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-09236-KPF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: 1/10/2020 Summons issued
                                            ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tether Operations Limited. (pne)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: 1/10/2020 Summons issued
                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tether International Limited. (pne)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: 1/10/2020 Summons issued
                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tether Holdings Limited. (pne)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: 1/10/2020 Summons issued
                                                  ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to iFinex Inc.. (pne)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: 1/10/2020 Summons issued
                                                    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to DigFinex Inc.. (pne)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: 1/10/2020 Summons issued
                                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BFXWW Inc.. (pne)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: 1/10/2020 Summons issued
                                                        ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BFXNA Inc.. (pne)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank  Add Party for Pleading
                                                          ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents All Defendants added. Party added pursuant to [1] Complaint.Document filed by Bryan Faubus. Related document: [1] Complaint.(Linkh, Gregory)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
                                                            ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gregory Bradley Linkh. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Dutchess. (pne)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                              ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Gregory Bradley Linkh to RE-FILE Document No. [7] Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): a summons can not be issued for a party that is not on CM ECF. After the party has been added to the case, re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the summons form PDF. (pne)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
                                                                ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gregory Bradley Linkh. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Bryan Faubus. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pne)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
                                                                  ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gregory Bradley Linkh to RE-FILE re: Document No. [1] Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Tether Limited and John Does 1-50 must be added to the case; the All Defendant radio button was selected; all parties whom the pleading is against were not entered/selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank  Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
                                                                    CASE REFERRED TO Judge Katherine Polk Failla as possibly related to 19CV9236. (pne)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                      Case Designated ECF. (pne)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
                                                                        CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: 1/9/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Philip Murray on behalf of Bryan Faubus. (Murray, Brian)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: 1/9/2020 Statement of Relatedness
                                                                            STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-cv-09236. Document filed by Bryan Faubus.(Linkh, Gregory)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: 1/9/2020 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tether International Limited, re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Bryan Faubus. (Linkh, Gregory)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: 1/9/2020 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tether Operations Limited, re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Bryan Faubus. (Linkh, Gregory)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: 1/9/2020 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DIGFINEX INC., re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Bryan Faubus. (Linkh, Gregory)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: 1/9/2020 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tether Limited, re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Bryan Faubus. (Linkh, Gregory) Modified on 1/10/2020 (pne).
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: 1/9/2020 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tether Holdings Limited, re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Bryan Faubus. (Linkh, Gregory)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: 1/9/2020 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BFXWW INC., re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Bryan Faubus. (Linkh, Gregory)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: 1/9/2020 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BFXNA INC., re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Bryan Faubus. (Linkh, Gregory)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: 1/9/2020 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to IFINEX INC., re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Bryan Faubus. (Linkh, Gregory)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: 1/9/2020 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                              CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Linkh, Gregory)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: 1/9/2020 Complaint
                                                                                                COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18464392)Document filed by Bryan Faubus.(Linkh, Gregory)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                   
                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                  Need Password Help?