Hameeda Somani v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit District Court of Dallas County, Texas, Case No. DC-20-00397

Tags
Last Updated January 10, 2020 at 1:37 AM ST (1.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SOMANI, HAMEEDA, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 3/6/2020, Entered: None
Status Conference
    Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None
    RETURN OF SERVICE: EXECUTED - CITATION - TESLA, INC. DBA TESLA MOTORS, INC. - CERT MAIL
      Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None
      ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
        Blank 6 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: None
        ISSUE CITATION: CITATION; Anticipated Server: CERTIFIED MAIL; Anticipated Method: ; Actual Server: CERTIFIED MAIL; Returned: 01/21/2020; Comment: TESLA, INC.
          Blank 5 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: None
          JURY DEMAND
            Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: None
            CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE: LETTER
              Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: None
              CASE FILING COVER SHEET
                Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: None
                ORIGINAL PETITION
                Blank 1 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: None
                NEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 63 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?