Porsche Financial Services, Inc. v. Chelly Massie
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. 19TRCV00731

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2020 at 10:00 PM ST (1.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Porsche Financial Services, Inc. Porsche Financial Services, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Porsche Financial Services Inc. Dba Bently Financial Services"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Miller Stacey Ann.
v.
No Logo Massie Chelly, Defendant
Type Other Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction)
Status Request for Dismissal - Before Trial not following ADR or more than 60 days since ADR 11/05/2019
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: 11/5/2019 Request For Dismissal
    Blank 6 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: 8/23/2019 Order to Show Cause
    Hearing
      Blank 5 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: 8/23/2019 Notice of Case Management Conference
        Blank 4 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019 Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
          Blank 3 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019 Summons
          on Complaint
            Blank 2 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019 Civil Case Cover Sheet
              Blank 1 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019 Complaint

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 0 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?