Melissa Dlin Mottola v. Tesla, Inc., A Delaware Corporation, et al.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. 20BBCV00047

Tags
Last Updated December 14, 2020 at 12:21 AM ST (5.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mottola Melissa Dlin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nita Nicholas
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Motors Inc. A Business Entity Form Unknown"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sidran, David +1 510 835 3400
Space Sidran, David +1 510 835 3400
Type Contract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (no fraud/negligence) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Pending
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 36 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: 11/30/2020 Notice Of Ruling
    Blank 35 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: 11/18/2020 Minute Order
    Post-Arbitration Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: D...
      Blank 34 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: 11/4/2020 Case Management Statement
        Blank 33 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: 11/3/2020 Case Management Statement
          Blank 32 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: 10/2/2020 Declaration
          OF HAYDEN S. ALFANO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT TESLA, INC. fka TESLA MOTORS, INC.?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND TO STAY THE INSTANT ACTION
            Blank 31 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: 10/2/2020 Request For Judicial Notice
              Blank 30 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: 10/2/2020 reply
              TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND TO STAY THE INSTANT ACTION
                Blank 29 Filed: 9/28/2020, Entered: 9/28/2020 Declaration
                in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel
                  Blank 28 Filed: 9/28/2020, Entered: 9/28/2020 Proof of Service
                  not Summons and Complaint
                    Blank 27 Filed: 9/28/2020, Entered: 9/28/2020 Opposition
                    to Motion to Compel Binding Arbitration and Stay the Instant Action
                      Blank 26 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: 6/15/2020 Minute Order
                      Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER STAYING THE INST...
                        Blank 25 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: 6/15/2020 Opposition
                        TO DEFENDANT?S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER STAYING THE INSTANT CASE PENDING THE RESOLUTION OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION
                          Blank 24 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: 6/12/2020 Declaration In Support Of Ex Parte Application
                            Blank 23 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: 6/12/2020 Order
                            GRANTING TESLA, INC.?S EX PARTE APPLICATION/MOTION FOR AN ORDER STAYING THE INSTANT CASE PENDING THE RESOLUTION OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION
                              Blank 22 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: 6/12/2020 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities;
                                Blank 21 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: 6/12/2020 Notice
                                OF DEFENDANT TESLA, INC.?S EX PARTE APPLICATION/MOTION FOR AN ORDER STAYING THE INSTANT CASE PENDING THE RESOLUTION OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION
                                  Blank 20 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: 6/12/2020 Request For Judicial Notice
                                    Blank 19 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: 6/12/2020 Ex-Parte Application
                                    MOTION FOR AN ORDER STAYING THE INSTANT CASE PENDING THE RESOLUTION OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION
                                      Blank 18 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: 6/2/2020 Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay the Instant Action
                                        Blank 17 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: 5/27/2020 Certificate of Mailing for
                                        (Court Order) of 05/27/2020
                                          Blank 16 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: 5/27/2020 Minute Order
                                          Court Order
                                            Blank 15 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: 5/27/2020 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities;
                                              Blank 14 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: 5/27/2020 Declaration
                                              OF RAYMOND KIM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT TESLA, INC. fka TESLA MOTORS, INC.?S MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND TO STAY THE INSTANT ACTION
                                                Blank 13 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: 5/27/2020 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                in Support of Defendants Motion to Compel Binding Arbitration to Stay the Instant Action
                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: 5/27/2020 Declaration
                                                  OF HAYDEN S. ALFANO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT TESLA, INC. fka TESLA MOTORS, INC.?S MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND TO STAY THE INSTANT ACTION
                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: 5/27/2020 Motion to compel
                                                    BINDING ARBITRATION AND TO STAY THE INSTANT ACTION
                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: 5/8/2020 Minute Order
                                                      Court Order
                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: 5/8/2020 Certificate of Mailing for
                                                        (Court Order) of 05/08/2020
                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: 2/21/2020 Answer
                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: 1/31/2020 Proof Of Personal Service
                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 Notice of Case Management Conference
                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 Summons
                                                                      on Complaint
                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 Complaint

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 27 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?