Lee et al v. Tesla, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:20-cv-00570-JVS-KES
District Judge James V. Selna, presiding

Tags
Last Updated April 1, 2021 at 5:38 PM DT (1.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anandhi Bharadwaj, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCune Wright LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C Wright +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 dcw@mccunewright.com
No Logo Inkie Lee, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCune Wright LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C Wright +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 dcw@mccunewright.com
No Logo Laverne Jackson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCune Wright LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C Wright +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 dcw@mccunewright.com
No Logo Lori Sallurday, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCune Wright LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C Wright +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 dcw@mccunewright.com
No Logo Sandy Xia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCune Wright LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C Wright +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 dcw@mccunewright.com
No Logo Sargon Daniel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCune Wright LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C Wright +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 dcw@mccunewright.com
No Logo Stephanie Gleason, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCune Wright LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C Wright +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 dcw@mccunewright.com
No Logo Wayne Sallurday, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCune Wright LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C Wright +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 dcw@mccunewright.com
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None Status Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 54 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None Compel arbitration
      LREF
      Legal Document 53 Filed: 9/29/2020, Entered: None Response
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: 9/22/2020 Motion for Hearing
          REQUEST for Hearing Request for Oral Argument on Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration Or, In the Alternative, Request for Clarification of Tentative Ruling, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration[44], filed by Plaintiffs Nissim Ahronee, Edwin Arroyave, Anandhi Bharadwaj, Michael Curley, Sargon Daniel, William Doyle, Stephanie Gleason, Robert Gucwa, Javier Guzman, Wendy Hensel, Susan Hutcheson, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Mace Rakestraw, Rodrigo Rodriguez, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Hasnin Syed, Joseph Tyson, Yufei Wu, Sandy Xia, Yuxiang Zhang. (Wright, David)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: 9/4/2020 Response in Support of Motion
            RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration[44] filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 49 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: 9/2/2020 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
              Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kelsey Rose Spector counsel for Defendant Tesla, Inc.. Adding Kelsey R. Spector as counsel of record for Tesla, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attorney Kelsey Rose Spector added to party Tesla, Inc.(pty:dft))(Spector, Kelsey)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: 8/24/2020 response in opposition to motion
                OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration[44] filed by Plaintiffs Nissim Ahronee, Edwin Arroyave, Anandhi Bharadwaj, Michael Curley, Sargon Daniel, William Doyle, Stephanie Gleason, Robert Gucwa, Javier Guzman, Wendy Hensel, Susan Hutcheson, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Mace Rakestraw, Rodrigo Rodriguez, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Hasnin Syed, Joseph Tyson, Yufei Wu, Sandy Xia, Yuxiang Zhang. (Wright, David)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/5/2020, Entered: 8/5/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO SET THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO COMPEL CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS TO INDIVIDUAL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS CLAIMS [46] by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs shall file any opposition brief to Defendant's Motion to Compel Certain Plaintiffs to Individual Arbitration and Dismiss Claims ("Motion") [ECF No. 44] on or before August 24, 2020, and that Defendant shall file any reply brief in support of its Motion on or before September 4, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing on Defendant's Motion shall be set for September 21, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. (es)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: 8/4/2020 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                    STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Opposition/Reply as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration[44] filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Somvichian, Whitty)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 45 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: 8/4/2020 Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail
                      Notice of Electronic Filing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration[44] e-mailed to dslavik@slavik.us bounced due to 5.4.7 - Delivery expired (message too old) '[Errno 61] Connection refused'. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: 7/27/2020 Motion to compel arbitrationCourt Filing
                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/21/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Victor Barclay iso Motion to Compel Arbitration, # (2) Exhibit 1 to Barclay Declaration, # (3) Exhibit 2 to Barclay Declaration, # (4) Exhibit 3 to Barclay Declaration, # (5) Exhibit 4 to Barclay Declaration, # (6) Exhibit 5 to Barclay Declaration, # (7) Exhibit 6 to Barclay Declaration, # (8) Exhibit 7 to Barclay Declaration, # (9) Exhibit 8 to Barclay Declaration, # (10) Exhibit 9 to Barclay Declaration, # (11) Exhibit 10 to Barclay Declaration, # (12) Exhibit 11 to Barclay Declaration, # (13) Exhibit 12 to Barclay Declaration, # (14) Exhibit 13 to Barclay Declaration, # (15) Exhibit 14 to Barclay Declaration, # (16) Exhibit 15 to Barclay Declaration, # (17) Exhibit 16 to Barclay Declaration, # (18) Exhibit 17 to Barclay Declaration, # (19) Exhibit 18 to Barclay Declaration, # (20) Exhibit 19 to Barclay Declaration, # (21) Exhibit 20 to Barclay Declaration, # (22) Exhibit 21 to Barclay Declaration, # (23) Exhibit 22 to Barclay Declaration, # (24) Exhibit 23 to Barclay Declaration, # (25) Exhibit 24 to Barclay Declaration, # (26) Exhibit 25 to Barclay Declaration, # (27) Exhibit 26 to Barclay Declaration, # (28) Exhibit 27 to Barclay Declaration, # (29) Exhibit 28 to Barclay Declaration, # (30) Declaration of Jasjit Ahluwalia iso Motion to Compel Arbitration, # (31) Exhibit 1 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (32) Exhibit 2 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (33) Exhibit 3 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (34) Exhibit 4 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (35) Exhibit 5 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (36) Exhibit 6 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (37) Exhibit 7 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (38) Exhibit 8 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (39) Exhibit 9 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (40) Exhibit 10 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (41) Exhibit 11 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (42) Exhibit 12 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (43) Exhibit 13 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (44) Exhibit 14 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (45) Exhibit 15 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (46) Exhibit 16 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (47) Exhibit 17 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (48) Exhibit 18 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (49) Exhibit 19 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (50) Exhibit 20 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (51) Exhibit 21 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (52) Exhibit 22 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (53) Exhibit 23 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (54) Exhibit 24 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (55) Exhibit 25 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (56) Exhibit 26 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (57) Exhibit 27 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (58) Exhibit 28 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (59) Exhibit 29 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (60) Exhibit 30 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (61) Exhibit 31 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (62) Exhibit 32 to Ahluwalia Declaration, # (63) Declaration of Whitty Somvichian iso Motion to Compel Arbitration, # (64) Exhibit 1 to Somvichian Declaration, # (65) Proposed Order) (Somvichian, Whitty)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: 7/10/2020 Amended Complaint/Petition
                          CORRECTED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Does, Tesla, Inc. amending Amended Complaint/Petition,,, [41], filed by Plaintiffs Michael Curley, Javier Guzman, Yuxiang Zhang, Wayne Sallurday, Wendy Hensel, Hasnin Syed, Inkie Lee, Mace Rakestraw, Stephanie Gleason, Robert Gucwa, Laverne Jackson, Sargon Daniel, Lori Sallurday, Joseph Tyson, Edwin Arroyave, William Doyle, Anandhi Bharadwaj, Susan Hutcheson, Rodrigo Rodriguez, Yufei Wu, Nissim Ahronee, Sandy Xia (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Twitter Post, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Website Post, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Twitter Post, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Twitter Post, # (5) Exhibit 5 - Tesla Vehicle Safety Report, # (6) Exhibit 6 - Twitter Post, # (7) Exhibit 7 - NHTSA Letter, # (8) Exhibit 8 - Website Post, # (9) Exhibit 9 - Twitter Post)(Wright, David)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: 7/10/2020 Stipulation to Amend/Correct
                            Joint STIPULATION to CORRECT Amended Complaint/Petition,,, [41] filed by Plaintiffs Nissim Ahronee, Edwin Arroyave, Anandhi Bharadwaj, Michael Curley, Sargon Daniel, William Doyle, Stephanie Gleason, Robert Gucwa, Javier Guzman, Wendy Hensel, Susan Hutcheson, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Mace Rakestraw, Rodrigo Rodriguez, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Hasnin Syed, Joseph Tyson, Yufei Wu, Sandy Xia, Yuxiang Zhang. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - CORRECTED Second Amended Class Action Complaint with Exhibits)(Wright, David)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document 41 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: 7/6/2020 Amended Complaint/Petition
                              SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, [1], Amended Complaint/Petition,,, [25], filed by Plaintiffs Michael Curley, Javier Guzman, Wayne Sallurday, Hasnin Syed, Inkie Lee, Mace Rakestraw, Stephanie Gleason, Robert Gucwa, Laverne Jackson, Sargon Daniel, Lori Sallurday, Edwin Arroyave, William Doyle, Anandhi Bharadwaj, Susan Hutcheson, Rodrigo Rodriguez, Sandy Xia (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Twitter Post, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Website Post, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Twitter Post, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Twitter Post, # (5) Exhibit 5 - Tesla Vehicle Safety Report, # (6) Exhibit 6 - Twitter Post, # (7) Exhibit 7 - NHTSA Letter, # (8) Exhibit 8 - Website Post, # (9) Exhibit 9 - Twitter Post)(Wright, David)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: 6/17/2020 Notice of appearance
                                NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Arthur H Bryant on behalf of Plaintiffs Anandhi Bharadwaj, Sargon Daniel, Stephanie Gleason, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Sandy Xia (Attorney Arthur H Bryant added to party Anandhi Bharadwaj(pty:pla), Attorney Arthur H Bryant added to party Sargon Daniel(pty:pla), Attorney Arthur H Bryant added to party Stephanie Gleason(pty:pla), Attorney Arthur H Bryant added to party Laverne Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Arthur H Bryant added to party Inkie Lee(pty:pla), Attorney Arthur H Bryant added to party Lori Sallurday(pty:pla), Attorney Arthur H Bryant added to party Wayne Sallurday(pty:pla), Attorney Arthur H Bryant added to party Sandy Xia(pty:pla))(Bryant, Arthur)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: 6/12/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT [38] by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs are granted leave to file a second amended complaint to add parties and otherwise amend the pleadings. Plaintiffs shall file a second amended complaint on or before July 6, 2020. Defendant shall file any motion to compel arbitration on or before July 27, 2020. The deadline for Defendant Tesla to file a motion to dismiss, pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 12(b)(6), shall be set at the time of the ruling on the motion to compel arbitration. (es)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: 6/11/2020 Stipulation to Amend/Correct
                                    Joint STIPULATION to AMEND Amended Complaint/Petition,,, [25] filed by Plaintiffs Edwin Arroyave, Anandhi Bharadwaj, Michael Curley, Sargon Daniel, William Doyle, Stephanie Gleason, Robert Gucwa, Javier Guzman, Susan Hutcheson, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Mace Rakestraw, Rodrigo Rodriguez, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Hasnin Syed, Sandy Xia. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Wright, David)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/7/2020, Entered: 5/7/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                      **AMENDED AS TO DATE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ONLY** [35] ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL SETTING DATES; PREPARATION FOR TRIAL; AND GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT AT TRIAL before Judge James V. Selna. (See Document for Details and Deadlines) (es)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/7/2020, Entered: 5/7/2020 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                        MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER RE SCHEDULING DATES by Judge James V. Selna: The Court has read and considered the parties Rule 26(f) Report and sets the following dates: Jury Trial April 26, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. Final PreTrial Conference April 11, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. Discovery Cut-off October 10, 2021. Law and Motion Cut-off February 28, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. Expert Discovery Cut-off December 13, 2021. Class Certification Motion to be filed by May 24, 2021. Hearing Date for Motion for Class Certification to be heard on August 2, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. Hearing on Daubert Motions, Summary Judgment and other dispositive motions to be heard on February 28, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. Status Conference set for October 19, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. The Scheduling Conference set for May 11, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. is VACATED. (See order for details and deadlines.) (es)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/7/2020, Entered: 5/7/2020 Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form onlyCourt Filing
                                          ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL SETTING DATES; PREPARATION FOR TRIAL; AND GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT AT TRIAL before Judge James V. Selna. (See Document for Details and Deadlines) (lb)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document 34 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: 5/4/2020 Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
                                            JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 15-25 Court Days, filed by Plaintiffs Edwin Arroyave, Anandhi Bharadwaj, Michael Curley, Sargon Daniel, William Doyle, Stephanie Gleason, Robert Gucwa, Javier Guzman, Susan Hutcheson, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Mace Rakestraw, Rodrigo Rodriguez, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Hasnin Syed, Sandy Xia.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Proposed Schedule of Pretrial Dates, # (2) Exhibit B - List of Tesla Inc. U.S. Subsidiaries)(Wright, David)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: 4/29/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                            ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: GRANTING [32] Non-Resident Attorney Donald H. Slavik APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff, Inkie Lee, Wayne Sallurday, Anandhi Bharadwaj, Sargon Daniel, Stephanie Gleason, Laverne Jackson, Sandy Xia, Nissim Ahronee, Sanjay Chopra, Edwin Arroyave, Michael Curley, William Doyle, Robert Gucwa, Javier Guzman, Susan Hutcheson, Mace Rakestraw, Rodrigo Rodriguez, and Hasnin Syed designating David C. Wright as local counsel. (es)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: 4/28/2020, Terminated: 4/29/2020 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                              APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Donald H. Slavik to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Edwin Arroyave, Anandhi Bharadwaj, Michael Curley, Sargon Daniel, William Doyle, Stephanie Gleason, Robert Gucwa, Javier Guzman, Susan Hutcheson, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Mace Rakestraw, Rodrigo Rodriguez, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Hasnin Syed, Sandy Xia (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26254368) filed by Plaintiffs Edwin Arroyave, Anandhi Bharadwaj, Michael Curley, Sargon Daniel, William Doyle, Stephanie Gleason, Robert Gucwa, Javier Guzman, Susan Hutcheson, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Mace Rakestraw, Rodrigo Rodriguez, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Hasnin Syed, Sandy Xia. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Wright, David)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: 4/3/2020 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Whitty Somvichian counsel for Defendant Tesla, Inc.. Adding Whitty Somvichian as counsel of record for TESLA, INC. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attorney Whitty Somvichian added to party Tesla, Inc.(pty:dft))(Somvichian, Whitty)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: 4/3/2020 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                  Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Danielle C Pierre counsel for Defendant Tesla, Inc.. Adding Danielle C. Pierre as counsel of record for Tesla, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attorney Danielle C Pierre added to party Tesla, Inc.(pty:dft))(Pierre, Danielle)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: 4/3/2020 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                    Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael G Rhodes counsel for Defendant Tesla, Inc.. Adding Michael G. Rhodes as counsel of record for Tesla, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attorney Michael G Rhodes added to party Tesla, Inc.(pty:dft))(Rhodes, Michael)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: 4/3/2020 waiver of service executed
                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Inkie Lee. upon Tesla, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/31/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Whitty Somvichian. (Wright, David)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: 3/18/2020 Summons issued
                                                        21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, [25] as to Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (es)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 Summons Request
                                                          Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,,, [25] filed by Plaintiffs Edwin Arroyave, Anandhi Bharadwaj, Michael Curley, Sargon Daniel, William Doyle, Stephanie Gleason, Robert Gucwa, Javier Guzman, Susan Hutcheson, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Mace Rakestraw, Rodrigo Rodriguez, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Hasnin Syed, Sandy Xia. (Wright, David)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 Amended Complaint/Petition
                                                            FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, [1], filed by Plaintiffs Wayne Sallurday, Inkie Lee, Stephanie Gleason, Laverne Jackson, Sargon Daniel, Lori Sallurday, Anandhi Bharadwaj, Sandy Xia, Robert Gucwa, Hasnin Syed, Javier Guzman, Susan Hutcheson, William Doyle, Edwin Arroyave, Rodrigo Rodriguez, Michael Curley, Mace Rakestraw(Attorney David C Wright added to party Edwin Arroyave(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Michael Curley(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party William Doyle(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Robert Gucwa(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Javier Guzman(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Susan Hutcheson(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Mace Rakestraw(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Rodrigo Rodriguez(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Hasnin Syed(pty:pla))(Wright, David)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020 Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue SummonsCourt Filing
                                                              NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request[13]. The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case: The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-00570 JVS(KESx). The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (es)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: 2/11/2020 Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form onlyCourt Filing
                                                                Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2020 at 11:30 a.m. before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 5/4/2020. (rrp)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: 1/31/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING [19] Non-Resident Attorney Eric B. Snyder APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs INKIE LEE; WAYNE SALLURDAY; LORI SALLURDAY; ANANDHI BHARADWAJ; SARGON DANIEL; STEPHANIE GLEASON; LAVERNE JACKSON; and SANDY XIA, designating David C. Wright as local counsel. (es)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: 1/31/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING [18] Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan D. Boggs APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs INKIE LEE; WAYNE SALLURDAY; LORI SALLURDAY; ANANDHI BHARADWAJ; SARGON DANIEL; STEPHANIE GLEASON; LAVERNE JACKSON; and SANDY XIA, designating David C. Wright as local counsel. (es)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: 1/31/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING [17] Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin L. Bailey APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs INKIE LEE; WAYNE SALLURDAY; LORI SALLURDAY; ANANDHI BHARADWAJ; SARGON DANIEL; STEPHANIE GLEASON; LAVERNE JACKSON; and SANDY XIA, designating David C. Wright as local counsel. (es)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: 1/29/2020, Terminated: 1/31/2020 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                        APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Eric B. Snyder to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Anandhi Bharadwaj, Sargon Daniel, Stephanie Gleason, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Sandy Xia (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25216372) filed by Plaintiff Anandhi Bharadwaj, Sargon Daniel, Stephanie Gleason, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Sandy Xia. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing (PA), # (2) Certificate of Good Standing (WV), # (3) Proposed Order) (Wright, David)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: 1/29/2020, Terminated: 1/31/2020 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                          APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan D. Boggs to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Anandhi Bharadwaj, Sargon Daniel, Stephanie Gleason, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Sandy Xia (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25216260) filed by Plaintiff Anandhi Bharadwaj, Sargon Daniel, Stephanie Gleason, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Sandy Xia. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing (DC), # (2) Certificate of Good Standing (FL), # (3) Certificate of Good Standing (MA), # (4) Certificate of Good Standing (WV), # (5) Proposed Order) (Wright, David)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: 1/29/2020, Terminated: 1/31/2020 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                            APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin L. Bailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Anandhi Bharadwaj, Sargon Daniel, Stephanie Gleason, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Sandy Xia (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25216059) filed by Plaintiff Anandhi Bharadwaj, Sargon Daniel, Stephanie Gleason, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Sandy Xia. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing (DC), # (2) Certificate of Good Standing (WV), # (3) Proposed Order) (Wright, David)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
                                                                              INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (rrp)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: 1/24/2020 Transferring Case purs GO 19-03 (Related Case)(CV-34)Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:16-cv-02282 JVS(KESx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick and Judge R. Gary Klausner to Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-00570 JVS(KESx). Signed by Judge James V. Selna (rn)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: 1/23/2020 Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form onlyCourt Filing
                                                                                  STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: 1/22/2020 Summons Request
                                                                                    Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, [1] filed by Plaintiffs Anandhi Bharadwaj, Sargon Daniel, Stephanie Gleason, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Sandy Xia. (Wright, David)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: 1/22/2020 Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
                                                                                      NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan D. Boggs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: 1/22/2020 Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
                                                                                        NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Eric B. Snyder. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: 1/22/2020 Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
                                                                                          NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin L. Bailey. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: 1/22/2020 Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons
                                                                                            NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request[5]. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: 1/22/2020 Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                                                                                              NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: 1/22/2020 Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html formCourt Filing
                                                                                                NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Anandhi Bharadwaj, Sargon Daniel, Stephanie Gleason, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Sandy Xia. Related Case(s): 8:16-cv-2282 JVS (Wright, David)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Summons Request
                                                                                                    Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, [1] filed by Plaintiffs Anandhi Bharadwaj, Sargon Daniel, Stephanie Gleason, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Sandy Xia. (Wright, David)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Wright, David)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Affidavit
                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Inkie Lee re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, [1] re Venue, pursuant to the California Consumer Legal Remedies Act filed by Plaintiffs Anandhi Bharadwaj, Sargon Daniel, Stephanie Gleason, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Sandy Xia (Wright, David)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                                                                                                          CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Anandhi Bharadwaj, Sargon Daniel, Stephanie Gleason, Laverne Jackson, Inkie Lee, Lori Sallurday, Wayne Sallurday, Sandy Xia. (Wright, David)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/20/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
                                                                                                            COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25154564 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Laverne Jackson, Sargon Daniel, Inkie Lee, Anandhi Bharadwaj, Lori Sallurday, Sandy Xia, Wayne Sallurday, Stephanie Gleason. (Attorney David C Wright added to party Anandhi Bharadwaj(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Sargon Daniel(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Stephanie Gleason(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Laverne Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Inkie Lee(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Lori Sallurday(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Wayne Sallurday(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Sandy Xia(pty:pla))(Wright, David)
                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 787 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?