Mutnick v. Clearview AI, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:20-cv-00512
District Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 25, 2020 at 3:52 PM EST (1.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo David Mutnick, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Loevy & Loevy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Robert Drury +1 312 243 5900 drury@loevy.com
Space Michael I Kanovitz +1 312 243 5900 +1 312 243 5902 mike@loevy.com
Space Arthur Loevy +1 312 243 5900 +1 312 243 5902 arthur@loevy.com
Space Jonathan I. Loevy +1 312 243 5900 +1 312 243 5902 jon@loevy.com
v.
Clearview AI, Inc. Clearview AI, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hoan Ton-That, Defendant
No Logo RICHARD SCHWARTZ, Defendant
Office Chicago
Filed 1/22/2020
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Lake
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag VALDEZ
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: None extension of time
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: 1/24/2020 attorney appearance
              ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Mutnick by Arthur R. Loevy (Loevy, Arthur)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: 1/24/2020 attorney appearance
                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Mutnick by Jonathan I. Loevy (Loevy, Jonathan)
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: 1/24/2020 attorney appearance
                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Mutnick by Michael I Kanovitz (Kanovitz, Michael)
                      LREF
                      Blank  Summons issued
                      SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That (txl, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 2 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: 1/23/2020 set/reset hearingsCourt Filing
                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Status hearing is set for 3/23/2020 at 9:00 AM. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendants of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: 1/22/2020 Complaint
                          COMPLAINT filed by David Mutnick; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Drury, Scott)
                            LREF
                            Blank  case assigned
                            CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lw, )
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 76 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?