Chan v. Tesla, Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. HG20051184

Tags
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 8:32 PM DT (1.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Chan, Johnny, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Kim, Charles, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Breach of Contract/Warranty
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Hayward Hall of Justice
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: None ?
Hearing Vacated: Initial Case Management Conference 08/24/2020 09:00 AM D- 24
    Blank 14 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None ?
    Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None ?
      Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed (3 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 12 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None ?
        Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 08/24/2020 09:00 AM D- 24
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None ?
          Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 07/22/2020 09:00 AM D- 24 (3 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: None ?
            Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385) (2 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 9 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: None ?
              Motion to Strike Complaint Reservation Set for dept: 24 date: 04/23/2020 time: 09:00 AM
                Blank 8 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                Demurrer to Complaint Reservation Set for dept: 24 date: 04/23/2020 time: 09:00 AM
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None ?
                  Proof of Service by Mail Filed (2 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                    Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: None ?
                      Initial Case Management Conference 06/08/2020 09:00 AM D- 24 (2 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                        Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tesla, Inc Filed (4 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: None ?
                          Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: None ?
                            Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Johnny Chan (3 Pages)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: None ?
                              Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed (5 Pages)

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 64 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?