Valdez v. Tesla, Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG20049344

Tags
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 8:34 PM DT (1.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Valdez , Brandon, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Moore , Caleb, Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Clawson, Shannon R., Attorney
No Logo Ochs, Danielle, Attorney
No Logo Ochs-tillotson, Danielle, Attorney
No Logo Whitten, Amanda B, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Other Employment
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (67) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None ?
Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed (3 Pages)
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 66 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None ?
    Case Management Conf Continuance 04/26/2021 02:30 PM D- 518
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None ?
      Case Management Conference Order Issued (3 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None ?
        Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None ?
          Case Management Statement of Brandon Valdez Filed (6 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: None ?
            Joint Case Management Statement Filed (6 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: None ?
              Receipt for Record on Appeal of Brandon Valdez Filed (1 Page)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None ?
                Notice of Certification of Record Filed (1 Page)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: None ?
                  Clerk's Certificate Filed (7 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: None ?
                    Notice of Certification of Record Filed (2 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: None ?
                      Receipt for Notice of Appeal by DCA Filed (1 Page)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                        Notice of Tentative Case Management Order Filed (5 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 55 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                          Case Management Conf Continuance 12/14/2020 02:30 PM D- 518
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                            Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                              Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                                Billing Notice Filed (1 Page)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: None ?
                                  Notice Designating Record on Appeal by Defendant Filed (6 Pages)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                                    Case Management Statement of Tesla, Inc, Caleb Moore Filed (6 Pages)
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: None ?
                                      Notification of Filing Notice of Appeal Issued (3 Pages)
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: None ?
                                        Case Management Statement of Brandon Valdez Filed (6 Pages)
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: None ?
                                          Receipt for Record on Appeal of Brandon Valdez Filed (1 Page)
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: None ?
                                            Notice of Appeal (Unlimited) Filed by Tesla, Inc (2 Pages)
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None ?
                                              Notice of Entry of Order Filed (7 Pages)
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                Demurrer to Complaint - Overruled (4 Pages)
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                  Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (3 Pages)
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                    Clerk's Certificate Filed (7 Pages)
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                      Notice of Certification of Record Filed (2 Pages)
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                        Appellant's fees paid Filed (5 Pages)
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/5/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                          Receipt for Notice of Appeal by DCA Filed (1 Page)
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                            Billing Notice Filed (2 Pages)
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                              Notification of Filing Notice of Appeal Issued (3 Pages)
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                Designation of Record Filed (6 Pages)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                  Notice of Appeal (Unlimited) Filed by Brandon Valdez (2 Pages)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                    Demurrer to Complaint - Motion Rescheduled (3 Pages)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                      Hearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 518 date: 08/19/2020 time: 02:30 PM
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                        Motion to Compel (Motion) Denied (5 Pages)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                          Notice of Entry of Order Filed (8 Pages)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                            Case Management Conf Continuance 09/14/2020 02:30 PM D- 518
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                              Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                  Order Denying Motion of Defendant Tesla Inc. to Compel Arbitration and to Stay the Action Filed (5 Pages)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    Motion to Compel (Motion) Taken Under Submission (2 Pages)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        Demurrer to Complaint Taken Under Submission (2 Pages)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            Hearing Reset to Motion to Compel (Motion) 05/26/2020 01:30 PM D- 518
                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                              Hearing Reset to Demurrer to Complaint 05/26/2020 01:30 PM D- 518
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                Amneded Case Management Statement Filed (7 Pages)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  Case Management Statement of Brandon Valdez Filed (6 Pages)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                    Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed (10 Pages)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                      Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed (10 Pages)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                        Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed (13 Pages)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/7/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                          Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed (10 Pages)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/6/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                            Opposition Filed (9 Pages)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                              Demurrer to Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 05/20/2020 02:30 PM D- 518
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                Demurrer to Complaint Filed by Caleb Moore, Tesla, Inc (49 Pages)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                  Motion to Compel (Motion) Hearing Confirmed for 05/20/2020 02:30 PM D- 518
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                    Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant (104 Pages)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                      Answer to Complaint Filed for Tesla, Inc (7 Pages)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                        Proof of Service on Complaint As to Caleb Moore Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                          Proof of Service CMC Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                            Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tesla, Inc Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                                                                                              Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                Initial Case Management Conference 06/02/2020 02:30 PM D- 518 (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                  Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                    Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Brandon Valdez (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                      Complaint - Other Employment Filed (16 Pages)

                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 48 times.

                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?