Trieu Pham v. APPLE, INC.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 19CV361037

Tags
Last Updated May 18, 2021 at 9:59 AM DT (4.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pham, Trieu, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by kletterperetz.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Yosef Peretz +1 415 732 3777 +1 415 732 3791 yp@kletterperetz.com
v.
Apple, Inc. Apple, Inc., Defendant
Case Type Wrongful Termination Unlimited (36)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 61 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Answer/Response (No Fee)
DEFENDANT APPLE INC???S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
    Legal Document 60 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
      Legal Document 59 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
      Case Management Statement
        Legal Document 58 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
        Case Management Statement
          Legal Document 57 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
          Proof of Service
            Legal Document 56 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro TemporeCourt Filing
            re: reporter Raquel Sharp for 10-27-20 - GRANTED by Judge Manoukiian
              Legal Document 55 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None Order After Hearing - POSCourt Filing
              on Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint is OVERRULED, in part, and SUSTAINED, in part, by Judge Manoukian
                Legal Document 54 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                  Legal Document 53 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                    Legal Document 52 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None Response/Reply
                    Reply to Opposition to Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint
                      Legal Document 51 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: None Request
                      Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Apple, Inc's Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint
                        Legal Document 50 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                        Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Apple, Inc's Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint
                          Legal Document 49 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                          Proof of Service
                            Legal Document 48 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None Demurrer
                            to First Amended Complaint : Atty Vadillo, HRG 10/27/20
                              Legal Document 47 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                Legal Document 46 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                  Legal Document 45 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                    Legal Document 44 Filed: 8/5/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                                      Legal Document 43 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                      Case Management Statement
                                        Legal Document 42 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                          Legal Document 41 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                          Case Management Statement
                                            Legal Document 40 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                            Re: Confidential Information - GRANTED by Judge Manoukian
                                              Legal Document 39 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee
                                              FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL atty Peretz
                                                Legal Document 38 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                  Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                                                  Proof of Service
                                                    Legal Document 36 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                                                    env. #4589953 re: Stipulation and Order, requires the $20 filing fee.
                                                      Legal Document 35 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                        Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                          Legal Document 33 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                          Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike
                                                            Legal Document 32 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                            Reply to Opposition to Demurrer
                                                              Legal Document 31 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                              CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
                                                                Legal Document 30 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                Case Management Statement
                                                                  Legal Document 29 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                  Opposition to Demurrer
                                                                    Legal Document 28 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                    Opposition to Motion to Strike
                                                                      Legal Document 27 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: None Request
                                                                      Request for Judicial Notice
                                                                        Legal Document 26 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                                                                        Proof of Service
                                                                          Legal Document 25 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                                                            Legal Document 24 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
                                                                            for an Order to advancing hearing date of Motion to Strike by Def (Jessica R. Perry)
                                                                              Legal Document 23 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                              of Anjai Vadillo in support of Ex Parte Application
                                                                                Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                                                                                  Granting Def's Ex Parte application and Def's Motion to Strike is Advanced from 05/25/20 to 05/12/20 @9am in D20 by Judge Manoukian
                                                                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                    Unopposed Ex Parte Application
                                                                                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                      Declaration of Anjali Vadillo in Support of Unopposed Ex Parte Application
                                                                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                                                                                        Proof of Service
                                                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                          Amended
                                                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                            Declaration of Anjali Vadillo in Support of Demurrer
                                                                                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None Motion-Strike
                                                                                              HRG 05/25/2020 9am D20 Atty: Vadillo - Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike
                                                                                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Strike
                                                                                                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                  Declaration of Anjali Vadillo in Support of Motion to Strike
                                                                                                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Request Dismissal
                                                                                                      Request for Dismissal
                                                                                                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                                                                                        Proof of Service: Mail
                                                                                                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                                                                                                          RE: Motion to Strike- Please call Law and Motion to reserve hearing @ 408-882-2430. Motion is not reserved.
                                                                                                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Demurrer
                                                                                                            HRG 05/12/2020 9am D20 Atty: Vadillo - DEMURRER
                                                                                                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                              Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Demurrer
                                                                                                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Request
                                                                                                                Request for Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                                                                  Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/31/2019, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/31/2019, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/31/2019, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/31/2019, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 114 times.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?