CACH, LLC v. Veronica Padilla
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2010-1-CV-185925

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 23, 2020 at 6:00 PM ST (1.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CACH LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson & Kennard

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gloria Zarco +1 916 920 2295
v.
No Logo Padilla, Veronica, Defendant
Case Type Collections Rule 3.740 Limited (09) - under 10,000
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None Writ: Execution (Filed)
Unsatisfied, Sacramento. Deficit: $5,723.92
    Blank 10 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil)
      Blank 9 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None Memorandum Of Costs
      Interest: $113.03. Atty Zarco
        Blank 8 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
          Blank 7 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None Judgment Default
          $5,222.09
            Blank 6 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None Declaration Ccp 1033
              Blank 5 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None Default Entered
              CLERK'S.
                Blank 4 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                  Blank 3 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                    Blank 2 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K
                      Blank 1 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 2 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?