Tibet Mimaroglu v. Tesla Motors Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 20SC082234

Tags
Last Updated May 17, 2021 at 11:31 PM DT (4.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mimaroglu, Tibet, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Motors Inc."
Case Type Small Claims $1501 - $5000
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/17/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
    Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/17/2020, Entered: None Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party
      Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/17/2020, Entered: None Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)
        Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Notice of Hearing (no fee)
        NOTICE OF HEARING: 5/21/20, 8:30 AM, Dept. 15.
          Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
            Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party
              Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
              Cert Mail. Hrg: 02/25/20.
                Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000
                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None Service by clerk for certified mail, to each defendant
                  7019 2280 0000 9263 1354

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 248 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?