Charlene Jones-Robinson et al v. Tesla Solar et al
State Civil Lawsuit Baltimore County District Court, Case No. D-08-CV-19-033796

Tags
Last Updated January 30, 2020 at 1:32 AM ST (1.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Robinson, Anande G, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla Energy Operations, Inc. Tesla Energy Operations, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: None
Stay Action
    Blank 10 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None
    Order - Motion/Request Granted
      Blank 9 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None
      Supporting Exhibit: Ex 1 - Dft Tesla's Petition to Compel Arbitration
        Blank 8 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None
        Motion/Request: PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND MOTION TO DISMISS
          Blank 7 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None
          Return of Service - Served
            Blank 6 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None
            Return of Service - Served
              Blank 5 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None
              Request for Service - Certified Mail, SDAT or MIA: 71901817596002707172
                Blank 4 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None
                Request for Service - Certified Mail, SDAT or MIA: 71901817596002706915
                  Blank 3 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None
                  Summons Issued (Service Event)
                    Blank 2 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None
                    Summons Issued (Service Event)
                      Blank 1 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: None
                      Complaint / Petition

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 19 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?