FLAVOR & FRAGRANCE S v. KLEEN BRITE LABORATO, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:01-cv-04925-AMW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FLAVOR & FRAGRANCE SPECIALTIES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Scarinci & Hollenbeck

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PATRICK J. SWEENEY +1 201 392 8900
v.
No Logo ABC CORPORATIONS, Defendant
No Logo John Does, Defendant
No Logo Kleen Brite Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
Office Newark
Filed 10/23/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Default
County Bergen
Terminated 8/6/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BL, CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE of change of attorney address by FLAVOR & FRAGRANCE S (aa)
    LREF
    Blank 10 Filed: 8/6/2002, Entered: 8/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER, dismissing action ast to ABC Corp (1-10) and John Does (1-10) ( signed by Judge Alfred M. Wolin ) (NM) (jd)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2002, Entered: 8/6/2002 Terminated Case
      Case closed (jd)
        LREF
        Blank 9 Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/14/2002 Default -Judgment
        DEFAULT JUDGMENT for $177,440.00 in favor of FLAVOR & FRAGRANCE SPECIALIST, INC. and against KLEEN BRITE LABORATORIES, INC. (nr) Modified on 06/14/2002
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/14/2002 Clerks Entry of Default*
          DEFAULT ENTERED as to KLEEN BRITE LABORATO granting [6-1] default requested for failure to appear (nr)
            LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: 6/14/2002 Affidavit
            AFFIDAVIT of AMOUNT DUE (nr)
              LREF
              Blank 7 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: 6/14/2002 Affidavit
              AFFIDAVIT of MICHAEL O'B. BOLDT on behalf of FLAVOR & FRAGRANCE S Re: [6-1] default requested (nr)
                LREF
                Blank 6 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: 6/14/2002 request for default
                REQUEST BY FLAVOR & FRAGRANCE S FOR DEFAULT AGAINST KLEEN BRITE LABORATO (nr) Modified on 06/14/2002
                  LREF
                  Blank 5 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: 2/26/2002 Summons Returned Executed
                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to KLEEN BRITE LABORATO 2/15/02 Answer due on 3/7/02 for KLEEN BRITE LABORATO (nr) Modified on 06/14/2002
                    LREF
                    Blank 4 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: 2/26/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                    Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: none; Minutes of: 02.25.02; The following actions were taken, Proclamation make on: Hrg. on Clerk's notice of call for dismissal By Judge Alfred M. Wolin (nr) Modified on 06/14/2002
                      LREF
                      Blank 3 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 6/14/2002 Notice of Call for dismissal
                      NOTICE of Call for Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 4(m) Motion hearing set for 10:00 2/25/02 (nr)
                        LREF
                        Blank 2 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 10/30/2001, Terminated: 8/6/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                        NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Judge Susan D. Wigenton (dc)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 10/30/2001 Case Referred to Arbitration
                          CASE REFERRED to arbitration (dc)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 10/30/2001 Summons Issued
                            SUMMONS issued for KLEEN BRITE LABORATO ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (dc)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: 10/30/2001 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT filed FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 200304047 (dc)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 23 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?