Austin v. Tesla, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:20-cv-00800-EMC
District Judge Edward M. Chen, presiding

Tags
Last Updated May 11, 2021 at 2:41 PM DT (2.5 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo George J. Austin, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Balance Staffing, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Garcia, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Mendiola, Defendant
No Logo MVP Personnel Staffing Group, Defendant
No Logo Sandy Malloy, Defendant
No Logo Steve Anderson, Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Vince Woodard, Defendant
Office San Francisco
Filed 2/3/2020
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Alameda
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP,ProSe
  Entries (114) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None Refund Status
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None Application for Refund
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Civil Appeals Docketing Statement
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Request For Judicial Notice
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/13/2021, Entered: None Amended Notice of Appeal
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/6/2021, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None USCA Case Number
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None Judgment
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None Order on Ex Parte Application
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/10/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/9/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/9/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/2/2021, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/31/2020, Entered: 12/31/2020 Notice of change of address
                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by George Jarvis Austin to Match Plaintiff's Personal Profile (and prevent any Plaintiff Legal Service Issues) (Austin, George) (Filed on 12/31/2020)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/31/2020, Entered: 12/31/2020 Notice - otherCourt Filing
                                                                  NOTICE by George Jarvis Austin re [80] Order, Plaintiff acknowledges Honorable Judge Chens Order, and his ruling that Plaintiff's Amended Complaint has surpassed Twombly and Iqbal standards (as made reference to in Order). Defendant counsel has yet to assert any Defense, Affirmative or otherwise beyond what Judge Chen has already, asked, and ruled upon in the initial ruling, and its related causes of action (whereas all Ten [10] causes of action in Amended Complaint surpassed Judicial Review), and previously been ordered served on Defendants (Austin, George) (Filed on 12/31/2020)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 80 Filed: 12/31/2020, Entered: 12/31/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER re Supplemental Filings re: [68],[76],[75],[79],[78],[73],[74],[77],[78],[79],[81]. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/31/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 12/31/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: 12/30/2020 Notice - other
                                                                      NOTICE by George Jarvis Austin Plaintiff, Proactively Identified Material Inconsistencies, and subsequently reported (and was retaliated against) while conducting initial due diligence on Defendants financial statement regarding wages, utilizing basic Forensic Accounting Methods to detect fraud. A few of these methods (described generally below in exhibit) include 1. analyzing the reported digits, 2. detecting mathematical biases, and 3. evaluating risk (and justification) based on inconsistent data and utilized findings (including line item deposits, corresponding to specific and unique check numbers, etc. all in Plaintiff's name, George Jarvis (J.) Austin, for each sets of income/wages to be revealed during discovery). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit MSG - Business Valuation, Forensic Accounting & Litigation Support Services Detecting Financial Statement Fraud - Fraudulent financial reporting is any intentional misstatement of, or omission from, the financial statements of a company with the purpose of misleading the statement users It has become clear that there are a variety of subtle methods used to manipulate expenses and revenues that are not easy to detect without knowledge of the necessary analytical tools. In 2002, following a series of major corporate financial fraud scandals, Congress passed the Sarbanes-Oxley Act which enacted strict reforms to financial reporting standards in the hopes of protecting investors from potential fraudulent accounting activities. In spite of these new standards, the number of fraud cases, as well as the dollar value of false financial reportings, has continued to rise for the past 14 years.)(Austin, George) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 78 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: 12/30/2020 Notice - other
                                                                        NOTICE by George Jarvis Austin re [77] Notice (Other),,, Reporting, and Inquiry, to Tesla Investor Relations (before and after crystal-ized negative, and retaliatory employment action) as part of Plaintiff, George Jarvis Austin, due diligence, including with VP of Tesla, at the time, and material facts regarding Labor violations and Intentional Interference with Economic Advantage reporting by Plaintiff, George J. Austin, and various forms of retaliation, with violations including at least $25,000.00 of Plaintiffs wages (since then verified, and proven, by State of California Auditing Investigators (but not yet corrected), and stock/equity awards (approx $20,000.00-$40,000.00 awarded on average to new hires) according to filed reports & exhibits below, and Vice President of Tesla, awarded as early as September 2019, and would now be valued at $250,000.0 0- to $500,000.00, based on growth, not including incentives, level ups, promotions, and bonuses (including Continuous Improvements, and others (Austin, George) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/28/2020, Entered: 12/28/2020 Notice - other
                                                                          LETTER to Mr. Austin from Lisa Skrzycki by George Jarvis Austin re [73] Notice (Other), SEC Whistle-blower Program Participant, Plaintiff George Jarvis Austin, Reported Financial Irregularities leading to Labor Code, and other Violations which qualified under standards of Sarbanes-Oxley Act prohibiting a publicly traded company, or any contractor or agent of such company, from retaliation (which given facts, timing, and context provides strong inference of retaliatory behaviors) against an employee who blows-the-whistle (initially inquired and reported prior to negative employment action, and followed up and cross-referenced since then as the case developed (Austin, George) (Filed on 12/28/2020) Modified on 12/29/2020 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/28/2020, Entered: 12/28/2020 Notice - other
                                                                            NOTICE by George Jarvis Austin re [75] Notice (Other),,,,,,, Material Facts, Context & Evidence Identity Verification, California Senate (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A. Senate Rules Committee Resolution Plaque celebrating successful completion of program (prior to matriculating into law school at Georgetown, after year deferment for Senate Fellowship), signed by then California Senate President pro Tempore, and now Sacramento Mayor, Darrell Steinberg: Whereas, George (Jarvis) Austin was selected from a highly competitive group of outstanding college and university graduates from California (64, out of 1300, generally, 18 out of approx. 500 specifically), and throughout the nation, and was appointed a 2012-2013 California Senate Fellow, and Whereas George (Jarvis) Austin, from Stockton (since 1993, after Florida, and Tennessee), graduated from the University of California, Berkeley, with a Bachelor of Arts degree in Sociology, and Whereas Through his service in the Senate Committee on Governance and Finance, George (Jarvis) Austin had the unique opportunity of acquiring a deeper understanding of the legislative process and public policy formation, while also providing assistance to Senate Members, legislative committees, and their constituencies, and Whereas The California Senate Fellows program, established in 1973 and sponsored jointly by the Senate and California State University, Sacramento, enables 18 individuals to become full-time Senate Staff members in the State Capitol for 11 months As a result of his outstanding service as a Senate Fellow, George (Jarvis) Austin is equipped to provide valuable leadership and contributions to educational institutions; local, regional, state, and federal government; and professional, business, and community endeavors in the State of California and nation; now therefore be it RESOLVED BY THE SENATE RULES COMMITTEE, That George (Jarvis) Austin be commended for his exemplary service on behalf of the Members of the Senate)(Austin, George) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/28/2020, Entered: 12/28/2020 Notice - otherCourt Filing
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT by George Jarvis Austin re [74] Notice (Other),,,, Material Key Facts for Defamation meeting standard of pleading, and destroys any Qualified privilege under 9th Circuit, and other precedent due to Malice, and Reckless Disregard for Truth (which ironically, and hypocritically is what Defendant Company has been held liable for doing - illegally recording, and surveilling, employees). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit The American Prospect Capital & Main : Tesla Workers File Charges with National Labor Board as Battle with Elon Musk Intensies Employees fight back reports: Workers at Tesla's Fremont, California, electric car factory have led an unfair labor practice charge with the National Labor Relations Board (NLRB), accusing the company of illegal surveillance, coercion, intimidation, and prevention of worker communications. The employees claim that Tesla violated multiple sections of the National Labor Relations Act (and Judges have agreed in their rulings).... According to the NLRB complaint obtained by Capital & Main, managers at Tesla "conduct[ed] surveillance" on the workers... "You can't fix problems if you're not allowed to talk about them." Employees also object in the complaint to a confidentiality agreement presented last November, which vowed consequences (including "loss of employment" and "possible criminal prosecution") for speaking publicly or to the media regarding "everything that you work on, learn about, or observe in your work about Tesla"-including wages and working conditions.. Tesla's was so far reaching that five members of the California legislature wrote to the company, warning that the agreement violated protected employee activity.)(Austin, George) (Filed on 12/28/2020) Modified on 12/29/2020 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/28/2020, Entered: 12/28/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                AFFIDAVIT by George Jarvis Austin re [68] Notice (Other),,,,,, Material Key Facts for Defamation meeting standard of pleading, and destroys any Qualified privilege under 9th Circuit, and other precedent. Given accusation of criminality, in the workplace (i.e. recording supervisor in violation of California Penal Code), the false accusation would very likely fall into Defamation Per Se, and further would surpass, destroy, and defeat, any (future) affirmative defense of a Qualified Privilege presented by Defendant counsel due to Malice, and Reckless Disregard for Truth (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit AllLaw If the statement was made maliciously -- i.e., if the plaintiff can show that it was not made with a reasonable purpose or with reasonable cause, or that the speaker made the statement knowing it was false, or with a reckless disregard for the truth -- it will not be protected by a qualified privilege. These facts, and the pattern of Defendant conduct not only meet the pleading standard for Defamation in the workplace (i.e. false accusation of criminal conduct) but worse evidence malice, and complete disregard for truth under Ninth Circuit, and other Jurisdictions, precedent.)(Austin, George) (Filed on 12/28/2020) Modified on 12/29/2020 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/24/2020, Entered: 12/24/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT by George Jarvis Austin re [20] Affidavit, [68] Notice (Other) Discovery, Material Facts & Evidence re: Labor Code Violations (at minimum $25K, underpayment), and subsequent retaliation and defamation shortly after written complaints (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Pre-discovery Defendant Counsel Disclosures pursuant to General Order 71 Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases.sent verifying Plaintiff pre-discovery (half of wages) initial filed on 7/20/20 Docket #20, from Defendant Counsel Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani - UC Berkeley Mail, # (2) Exhibit Plaintiff Response Inquiry to Defendant Counsel's Email - UC Berkeley Mail, # (3) Exhibit Selected Highlighted, and Circled Information from Independently Verified Plaintiff's wages, and wage statements for Q3 and Q4 Plaintiff wages for Q3 & Q4, with wages in Q4 totaling above the maximum benefit threshold of $28,145.01 (for months October through December) triggering Plaintiffs current maximum benefit amount of $1,300 weekly which all serve to substantiate the underlying Labor Code violations (underpayment of at least the specific amount of $25,000.00, as half of the verified wages from Plaintiff were stolen partial basis for retaliation (after written complaints submitted to appropriate authority) including subsequent after the fact Defendants baseless, false accusation of recording a manager in violation of Penal Code. investigated by the State of California Auditing and Accounting Department, and subsequent retaliation. All wages were confirmed by Defendant Employers via State of California Investigator, Accounting and Auditing Department, with my name, George J. Austin, Plaintiff, Pro Se, on checks,and check stubs. Checks also had my permanent address 2107 Montauban Ct. since 2002, with my social security number, unique check IDs, transaction and account verification and personally called b y the Department and they produced written discovery, document production and depositions under penalty of perjury, a felony, as to their veracity (to be provided in full during Discovery))(Austin, George) (Filed on 12/24/2020)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/24/2020, Entered: 12/24/2020 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                    MOTION for Joinder (Defendant Balance Staffing Workforce, LLC's Joinder in Defendant Tesla's Motion to Dismiss or Strike Portions of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint) filed by Balance Staffing, MVP Personnel Staffing Group. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Defendant Balance Staffing Workforce, LLC's Joinder in Defendant Tesla's Motion to Dismiss or Strike Portions of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Ng, Pamela) (Filed on 12/24/2020)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/19/2020, Entered: 12/19/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                      Affidavit by George Jarvis Austin re [67] Motion Hearing,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Strike, Material Facts & Evidence re: Labor Code Violations (at minimum $25K, underpayment), and subsequent retaliation and defamation shortly after written complaints (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Verified Plaintiff's wages for Q3 and Q4 Plaintiff wages for Q3 & Q4, with wages in Q4 totaling above the maximum benefit threshold of $28,145.01 (for months October through December) triggering Plaintiffs current maximum benefit amount of $1,300 weekly which all serve to substantiate the underlying Labor Code violations (underpayment of at least the specific amount of $25,000.00, as half of the verified wages from Plaintiff were stolen partial basis for retaliation (after written complaints submitted to appropriate authority) including subsequent after the fact Defendants baseless, false accusation of recording a manager in violation of Penal Code. investigated by the State of California Auditing and Accounting Department, and subsequent retaliation. All wages were confirmed by Defendant Employers via State of California Investigator, Accounting and Auditing Department, with my name, George J. Austin, Plaintiff, Pro Se, on checks,and check stubs. Checks also had my permanent address 2107 Montauban Ct. since 2002, with my social security number, unique check IDs, transaction and account verification and personally called b y the Department and they produced written discovery, document production and depositions under penalty of perjury, a felony, as to their veracity (to be provided in full during Discovery).)(Austin, George) (Filed on 12/19/2020)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 67 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/19/2020 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 12/18/2020 taking under submission [41][49]. Order to issue. Total Time in Court: 48 Minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorney: George Jarvis Austin. Defendant Attorney: Andrea Milano, Pamela Ng. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/18/2020)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                          OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [41] MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Tesla, Inc.s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, Strike Portions of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint, [49] MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, and Joinder in Defendant's Tesla's Motion to Dismiss or Strike Portions of Plaintiff's FIrst Amended Complaint, [40] MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Tesla, Inc.s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, Strike Portions of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint ) filed byGeorge Jarvis Austin. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit National Employment Law Project 'Exposing Wage Theft Without Fear - Around the country, workers who speak up about workplace violations often face a significant risk of retaliation by their employer. -, # (2) Exhibit In California, justice for wage theft remains elusive - In California, wage theft is rampant., # (3) Exhibit Reuters "Apple, Google, Intel, Adobe to pay $325 million to settle hiring lawsuit - the lawsuit accused Silicon Valley companies of conspiring to limit competition and keep wages down _, # (4) Exhibit Teslas $1 Million Settlement of Wage Claims Gets Final Approval.pdf)(Austin, George) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: 12/22/2020 summons returned executed
                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed Tesla, Inc. served on 10/15/2020, answer due 11/5/2020. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: 12/22/2020 summons returned executed
                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Steve Anderson served on 10/15/2020, answer due 11/5/2020. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: 12/22/2020 summons returned executed
                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed Balance Staffing (Division of Personnel Staffing Group) served on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: 12/17/2020 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE CHANGING TIME OF MOTION HEARING SET 12/18/2020 FROM 1:30PM TO 2:00PM: Motion Hearing re [41] MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Tesla, Inc.s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, Strike Portions of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint, [49] MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, and Joinder in Defendant's Tesla's Motion to Dismiss or Strike Portions of Plaintiff's FIrst Amended Complaint is reset from 1:30PM to 12/18/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: 12/16/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                    NOTICE by George Jarvis Austin re [63] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Acknowledging Order, upcoming Hearing, and Follow Up, Plaintiff shall provide detailed response to Defendant Motion (with increased specificity, and highlighted facts aligned with precedent already surpassing Twombly, and Iqbal, standards for Judicial Review), as well as proactive pre-discovery due diligence, and evidence further substantiating Plaintiff's causes of action (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Daily Labor Report 'Prosecutors Treating Wage Theft as a Crime in These States - Prosecutors in New York and California are starting to view wage violations as an actual crime more often, as opposed to a matter for civil courts., # (2) Exhibit KQED "'Were Being Robbed': Wage Theftin California Often Goes Unpunished by State, # (3) Exhibit Angelus A Catholic News Service "Wage theft: An underreported crime Mark Pattison | Catholic News Service, # (4) Exhibit CBS 'Tesla Fined By California For Lack Of Workers Compensation For Janitors, # (5) Exhibit Gaurdian "Elon Musk apologizes for [Labor Code Violations] Tesla workers paid just $5 an hour by subcontractor)(Austin, George) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: 12/16/2020 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                      Order by Judge Edward M. Chen denying [62] Motion for Extension of Time. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: 12/15/2020, Terminated: 12/16/2020 motion for extension of time to file response/replyCourt Filing
                                                                                                        First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [41] MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Tesla, Inc.s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, Strike Portions of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint, [40] MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Tesla, Inc.s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, Strike Portions of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint to Defendant Previous Employer's Motion filed by George Jarvis Austin. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit SFChronicle.com 'Employers cant duck responsibility for workplace safety by hiring contract workers, # (2) Exhibit Vox 'An Administrative Judge says Tesla tried to sabotage [and illegally surveilled] efforts by factory workers in California breaking labor laws, # (3) Exhibit Bloomberg Law 'Teslas $1 Million Settlement of Wage Claims (Underpayment in Violation of Labor Laws) Gets Final Approval, # (4) Exhibit GQ 'Wage Theft Is the Multibillion-Dollar Crime Almost No One Is Prosecuting _ GQ.pdf, # (5) Exhibit National Employment Law Project 'Exposing Wage Theft Without Fear - Around the country, workers who speak up about workplace violations often face a significant risk of retaliation by their employer. -National Employment Law Project)(Austin, George) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: 12/14/2020 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTIONS HEARING FROM 12/17/2020 TO 12/18/2020 AT 1:30PM: Due to unavailability of the Court, Motion Hearing re: [41][49] set for 12/17/2020 is vacated and rescheduled for 12/18/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. [49] MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, and Joinder in Defendant's Tesla's Motion to Dismiss or Strike Portions of Plaintiff's FIrst Amended Complaint, [41] MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Tesla, Inc.s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, Strike Portions of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: 12/9/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                            NOTICE by George Jarvis Austin re [50] Objection,, Material Facts & Evidence (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Documented verification, and confirmation, of stolen wages via written discovery, document production and depositions, at minimum $25,000.00, investigated by the State of California Auditing and Accounting Department, and subsequent retaliation. All wages were confirmed by Defendant Employers via State of California Investigator, Accounting and Auditing Department, with my name, George J. Austin, Plaintiff, Pro Se, on checks,and check stubs. Checks also had my permanent address 2107 Montauban Ct. since 2002, with my social security number, unique check IDs, transaction and account verification and personally called by the Department and they produced written discovery, document production and depositions under penalty of perjury, a felony, as to their veracity (to be provided in full during Discovery)., # (2) Exhibit Comparable valuation of recent, 2013 in Sacramento, analogous cases with very similar underlying causes of action, and facts, producing a $168,000,000.00 million dollar Jury Award for analogous retaliatory, defamatory, and Labor, Health & Safety, and other code violating organizational behaviors in Chopourian v. Catholic Healthcare West to Plaintiffs Detriment by Defendants Tesla, Balance Staffing, and Personnel Staffing (to be provided in full During Discovery)., # (3) Exhibit Plaintiff due diligence, including with VP of Tesla, at the time, and material facts regarding Labor violations and Intentional Interference with Economic Advantage reporting by Plaintiff, George J. Austin, and various forms of retaliation, with violations including at least $25,000.00 of Plaintiffs wages, and stock/equity awards (approx $20,000.00-$40,000.00 awarded on average to new hires) according to reports & exhibits below, and Vice President of Tesla, awarded as early as September 2019, and would now be valued at $250,000.00- to $500,000.00, based on growth, not including incentives, level ups, promotions, and bonuses (including Continuous Improvements, and others).)(Austin, George) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: 12/9/2020 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                              REPLY (re [49] MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, and Joinder in Defendant's Tesla's Motion to Dismiss or Strike Portions of Plaintiff's FIrst Amended Complaint ) Reply to No Opposition to Defendant Personnel Staffing Group, LLC's Motion to Strike Second Amended Complaint and Joinder filed byMVP Personnel Staffing Group. (Laurenson, Michael) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: 12/8/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                EMPLOYMENT CONTRACT, BREACH & RETALIATION NOTICE Re: Dkt. Nos. 43, 45, 50-57 by George Jarvis Austin re [52] Notice (Other). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Plaintiffs Tesla Employee Badge Issued By Tesla, after training by Tesla, Used to clock in and out of work in Tesla system, and access Tesla facilities, # (2) Exhibit Plaintiffs Tesla email geaustin07@tesla.com connected to app issued by Tesla to connect with Teams and projects, # (3) Exhibit Picture by colleague while at work completing Continuous improvements wearing proper PPE (personal protective equipment) issued by Tesla, in Tesla Production at main headquarters, # (4) Exhibit Examples of some continuous improvements with quotes from Elon Musk that informed the motivation and creative problem solving behind their thought process (submitted to appropriate committees in relation to Health & Safety, Labor and other code concerns, also.)(Austin, George) (Filed on 12/8/2020) Modified on 12/9/2020 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: 12/8/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                  RETALIATION NOTICE Re: Dkt. Nos. 43, 45, 50-56 by George Jarvis Austin re [52] Notice (Other). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Interesting Engineering "Interesting Engineering Tesla's Breakneck Rise Making Workers Rich, Elon Musk Richer., # (2) Exhibit Electrek Tesla's meteoric rise is making a lot of employees very rich, # (3) Exhibit Tech Times As Elon Musk's Wealth Balloons to $46B, He's Making More Tesla Employee Millionaires: Here's the List (Musk is offering Tesla's stock options and grants as being part of the employees' compensation and benefits packages. This stock option compensation is also available for his production associates and sales staff in the auto industry).)(Austin, George) (Filed on 12/8/2020) Modified on 12/8/2020 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: 12/8/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                    RETALIATION NOTICE Re: Dkt. 43, 45, 50-55 by George Jarvis Austin re [52] Notice (Other). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Fortune - Tesla sent incomplete worker safety injury reports, California regulator says, # (2) Exhibit Bloomberg - Hyperdrive Tesla Sent Incomplete Injury Reports, California Regulator Says)(Austin, George) (Filed on 12/8/2020) Modified on 12/8/2020 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: 12/8/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                      RETALIATION NOTICE Re: Dkt. Nos. 43, 45, 50-54 by George Jarvis Austin re [52] Notice (Other). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Workplace Fairness It's Everyone's Job "Hiding Injuries at Tesla - Where The Worker Still Doesnt Matter, # (2) Exhibit CNBC "California agency probing Tesla on occupational safety)(Austin, George) (Filed on 12/8/2020) Modified on 12/8/2020 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: 12/8/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                        RETALIATION NOTICE Re: Dkt. Nos. 43, 45, 50-53 by George Jarvis Austin re [52] Notice (Other). (Attachments: # (1) Forbes Inside Teslas Model 3 Factory, Where Safety Violations Keep Rising, # (2) Bloomberg & Economic Times, India, Auto.com Tesla sent incomplete injury reports, California regulator says, # (3) Los Angeles Times Tesla left hundreds of injuries out of its workplace reports, California regulator says)(Austin, George) (Filed on 12/8/2020) Modified on 12/8/2020 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: 12/8/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                          RETALIATION NOTICE Re: Dkt. Nos. 43, 45, 50-52 by George Jarvis Austin re [52] Notice (Other). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Email with Tesla Worker's Compensation Department, and Email with Jordan, Tesla workers compensation Staff after injury, and treated in Tesla Clinic,but never received, # (2) Exhibit Engadget "Tesla reportedly omitted 'hundreds' of injuries from government reports)(Austin, George) (Filed on 12/8/2020) Modified on 12/8/2020 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: 12/7/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                            RETALIATION NOTICE Re: Dkt. Nos. 43, 45, 50-51 by George Jarvis Austin re [50] Objection. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Business Insider 'Tesla failed to tell regulators about dozens of factory injuries, then claimed without evidence that regulators praised its record-keeping", # (2) Exhibit Reveal.com "Tesla says its factory is safer. But it left injuries o the books", # (3) Exhibit Reveal.com "Tesla Under-reported Employee Injuries)(Austin, George) (Filed on 12/7/2020) Modified on 12/7/2020 (jlgS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/8/2020 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/5/2020, Entered: 12/5/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                              NOTICE Testimonial Defamation Per Se & Analogous Case Valuations Affidavit by George Jarvis Austin re [50] Objection. (Austin, George) (Filed on 12/5/2020) Modified on 12/7/2020 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: 11/19/2020 Objection
                                                                                                                                OBJECTIONS to re [49] MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, and Joinder in Defendant's Tesla's Motion to Dismiss or Strike Portions of Plaintiff's FIrst Amended Complaint to Defendant Personnel Staffing Group & Tesla's Motion Request (and Proposed Order), as well as its underlying, and factually/legally incorrect, assertions several of which have been preemptively (and independently) verified, and proven, in Plaintiff's favor (by independent finders of fact conducting proper proactive due Diligence) by George Jarvis Austin. (Austin, George) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: 11/19/2020 Motion to strikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, and Joinder in Defendant's Tesla's Motion to Dismiss or Strike Portions of Plaintiff's FIrst Amended Complaint filed by MVP Personnel Staffing Group. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 12/3/2020. Replies due by 12/10/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ng, Pamela) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 Notice - otherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by George Jarvis Austin re [15] Order Reassigning Case,,, Case Assigned/Reassigned,, [47] Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, [11] Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Plaintiff's Previously Filed Declination to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge, alternatively to Proceed before Judge Chen (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit of Previously Filed Plaintiff Declination to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge, and Instead Proceeded with Judge Chen See Docket #11, Monday, March 09, 2020 11 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 03/10 2:12 PM CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by George J. Austin. (wsnS, COURT STAFF))(Austin, George) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tesla, Inc... (Milano, Andrea) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Rose Milano (Milano, Andrea) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/15/2020, Entered: 11/15/2020 Notice - otherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by George Jarvis Austin re [39] Notice (Other) of series of previous, and upcoming, filed AFFIDAVITS by Plaintiff buttressing the underlying causes of action, and supporting the subsequent jury, or settlement awards recommended for Defendant Tesla, and its legal representation, suggested review. These include AFFIDAVITS independently verified, and fact checked, under the penalty of perjury by the State of California Auditing and Accounting Departments, and individual employers whom the State contacted for its fact finding, and its requisite, and thorough due diligence (i.e. verifying check stubs, account numbers, transactions, deposits, employer records, etc.) concurrently with the Amended Complaint which already surpassed the Iqual and Twombly standards for Judicial Review by the Honorable Judge Chen. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Example of Similarly Situated Plaintiff, and causes of action, resulting in 2013 nearby (Sacramento) $167 million record verdict for wrongful termination)(Austin, George) (Filed on 11/15/2020)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Objection
                                                                                                                                            OBJECTIONS to re [40] MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Tesla, Inc.s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, Strike Portions of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint to Defendant Tesla's Motion Request (and Proposed Order), as well as its underlying, and factually/legally incorrect, assertions several of which have been preemptively (and independently) verified, and proven, in Plaintiff's favor (by independent finders of fact conducting proper proactive due Diligence) by George Jarvis Austin. (Austin, George) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order re [41] MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Tesla, Inc.s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, Strike Portions of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint, [40] MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Tesla, Inc.s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, Strike Portions of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Tesla, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, Strike Portions of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint by Tesla, Inc.. (Kuei, Jean) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Interested Entities by Tesla, Inc. Defendant Tesla, Inc.s Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Kuei, Jean) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Tesla, Inc.s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, Strike Portions of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint filed by Tesla, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 11/27/2020. Replies due by 12/4/2020. (Kuei, Jean) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Tesla, Inc.s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, Strike Portions of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint filed by Tesla, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 11/27/2020. Replies due by 12/4/2020. (Kuei, Jean) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: 10/20/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Acknowledgement of receipt re [32] Summons Issued. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: 10/6/2020 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT re [37] Affidavit,, [28] Amended Complaint #4 State of California Verification of All Wages in George J. Austin's name, including at least, and approximately, $25,000.00 of stolen, or converted wages; and Request from Employer of Re-issuance to Specified Address (as they were never received by Plaintiff). by George Jarvis Austin. (Austin, George) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/5/2020 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT re [27] Application for Writ, [28] Amended Complaint #4 State of California, EDD Back Pay Made, and proper re-computation adjustment going forward (maximum benefit claim starting 4/20/20 based on Audited, and Verified Wages, Accounts, and Financial Information) by George Jarvis Austin. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit State of California, EDD Confirmation of over $10,000.00 (+) Backpay Made, and Readjustment going Forward to maximum benefit)(Austin, George) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: 9/22/2020 motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                                                                            First MOTION to Amend/Correct [27] Application for Writ, [34] Notice of Additional Parties, [32] Summons Issued, [35] Notice of Additional Parties, [26] Clerk's Notice,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, [24] Notice of Additional Parties, [19] Order Adopting Report and Recommendations,, [28] Amended Complaint, [33] First MOTION for Discovery of EDD representative Ana's processing full payment, and back-pay, adjustment, yet still not received (due to EDD's unconstitutional withholding) over a month ago, on currently receiving EDD Disability Compensati, [18] Amended Complaint Error: Improperly Terminated Defendant Parties (Re-Added) filed by George Jarvis Austin. Responses due by 10/6/2020. Replies due by 10/13/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Docket #18 Amended Complaint, # (2) Exhibit Docket #28 Amended Complaint with Incorporation of Urgent Need Injunctive Relief from Defendant Party Employment Development Department (EDD), # (3) Exhibit Docket #26 Application for Injunctive Relief due to Unconstitutional Irreparable Harm & Urgent Need due to over $10,000 of withheld benefit compensation from Defendant Party Employment Development Department (EDD))(Austin, George) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: 9/22/2020 Notice of Additional Parties
                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on [1] Complaint, and have been added to this case: Vince Woodard (Tesla HR), Daniel Garcia (Tesla Lead), Jose Mendiola (Tesla Supervisor) and Sandy Malloy (Balance HR Officer). (This is a text-only entry.) (Austin, George) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Remark
                                                                                                                                                                Summons delivered to Marshal for service. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: 9/21/2020 Notice of Additional Parties
                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on [1] Complaint, and have been added to this case: California Employment Development Department (Disability Insurance) & Legal Office. (This is a text-only entry.) (Austin, George) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: 9/21/2020 motion for discovery
                                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION for Discovery of EDD representative Ana's processing full payment, and back-pay, adjustment, yet still not received (due to EDD's unconstitutional withholding) over a month ago, on currently receiving EDD Disability Compensation regarding Injunctive Relief see Dockets 27-32 filed by George Jarvis Austin. Responses due by 10/5/2020. Replies due by 10/13/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit #30 Follow Up Communication with Defendant EDD regarding Injunctive Relief Application)(Austin, George) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: 9/21/2020 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                      CORRECTED Summons Issued as to Steve Anderson, Balance Staffing, MVP Personnel Staffing Group, Tesla, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) USM-285)(jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: 9/21/2020 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                        ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY - PLEASE DISREGARD***Summons Issued as to Steve Anderson, Balance Staffing, MVP Personnel Staffing Group, Tesla, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Summons)(jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020).
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/16/2020, Entered: 9/16/2020 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT re [25] Ex Parte Application, [29] Affidavit, [27] Application for Writ, [28] Amended Complaint, [26] Clerk's Notice,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, [24] Notice of Additional Parties Plaintiff Follow Up #2Affidavit For (EDD) INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by George Jarvis Austin. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Copy of Affidavit #1 with missing elements likely due to file compression, # (2) Exhibit 'Notice" Follow Up Email with Chris Workman, EDD Legal Representative, # (3) Exhibit Call Log from Chris Workman confirming reception of Notice to EDD at approx 8:30-8:45am 9/16/20)(Austin, George) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/16/2020, Entered: 9/16/2020 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT re [25] Ex Parte Application, [27] Application for Writ, [28] Amended Complaint, [26] Clerk's Notice,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, [24] Notice of Additional Parties Plaintiff Affidavit For (EDD) INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by George Jarvis Austin. (Austin, George) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/15/2020, Entered: 9/15/2020 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                              SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Incorporating Need for Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filed byGeorge Jarvis Austin. (Austin, George) (Filed on 9/15/2020) Modified on 11/4/2020 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/13/2020, Entered: 9/14/2020 Application for Writ
                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for Writ of Injunctive Relief for Plaintiff by George Jarvis Austin. (Austin, George) (Filed on 9/13/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: 9/4/2020 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR [25] Ex Parte Application. Responses due by 9/13/2020. Replies due by 9/20/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/30/2020, Entered: 8/30/2020 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION For JOINDER Of Necessary Party: California Employment Development Department (EDD) re [21] Affidavit, [20] Affidavit, [23] Affidavit, [22] Affidavit, [24] Notice of Additional Parties, [19] Order Adopting Report and Recommendations filed BY George Jarvis Austin (Austin, George) (Filed on 8/30/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 8/30/2020, Entered: 8/30/2020 Notice of Additional Parties
                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on [1] Complaint, and have been added to this case: California Employment Development Department (EDD). (This is a text-only entry.) (Austin, George) (Filed on 8/30/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/11/2020, Entered: 7/11/2020 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT re [21] Affidavit, [18] Amended Complaint, [20] Affidavit, [22] Affidavit, [19] Order Adopting Report and Recommendations,, Affidavit (Partial) for Confirmation of Legal Service Address of Defendant Parties (Tesla, et. al) by George Jarvis Austin. (Austin, George) (Filed on 7/11/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: 7/9/2020 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT re [21] Affidavit, [16] Order,, [18] Amended Complaint, [20] Affidavit, [17] Clerk's Notice, [19] Order Adopting Report and Recommendations,, Whistle-Blower Retaliation Partial Affidavit (Redacted) Initial Disclosure(s) by George Jarvis Austin. (Austin, George) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: 7/9/2020 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT re [16] Order,, [18] Amended Complaint, [17] Clerk's Notice, [19] Order Adopting Report and Recommendations,, Testimonial Defamation Per Se Affidavit (Redacted) Initial Disclosure(s) by George Jarvis Austin. (Austin, George) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: 7/7/2020 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT re [18] Amended Complaint Partial Wage Affidavit (Redacted) Initial Disclosure(s) by George Jarvis Austin. (Austin, George) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: 7/6/2020 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: 6/26/2020 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                  FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT George J. Austin, Esq. (TBA). against All Defendants. Filed byGeorge Jarvis Austin. (Austin, George) (Filed on 6/26/2020) Modified on 6/29/2020 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 6/13/2020, Entered: 6/13/2020 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE: Objections to [12] Report and Recommendations are EXTENDED to 6/26/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: 5/29/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO SUBMIT OBJECTIONS re [12] REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re [1] Complaint, filed by George J. Austin, [6] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by George J. Austin. Objections due 6/12/2020. No further continuance. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/29/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: 5/6/2020 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 05/06/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: 5/6/2020 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/8/2020 at 2:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: 5/6/2020 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REASSIGNING CASE.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/6/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: 5/6/2020, Terminated: 7/6/2020 Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re dismissal of [1] Complaint and denial of [6] Application for Temporary Restraining Order. Objections due by May 20, 2020. The case management conference previously set for May 8, 2020 is VACATED. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 6, 2020. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/9/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by George J. Austin. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020 Order on Motion for Permission for Electronic Case FilingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order, signed 3/3/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting [9] Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: 2/25/2020 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 3/10/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Envelope)(jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020 order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperisCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting [3], [5] Motions for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and sealing attachments. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2020: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (klhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020, Terminated: 7/6/2020 Motion for TRO
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by George J. Austin. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: 2/18/2020 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by George J. Austin. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/18/2020: # (1) Exhibit) (wsnS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: 2/5/2020 Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why [3] application to proceed in forma pauperis should not be denied. Response due by February 26, 2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on February 5, 2020. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2020: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (klhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by George J. Austin. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR DeadlinesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/1/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/8/2020 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # (1) JCS - Standing Order, # (2) Standing Order for All Judges)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT; No Process with Jury Demand, against Steve Anderson, Balance Staffing, Daniel Garcia, MVP Personnel Staffing Group, Sandy Malloy, Joseph Mendiola, Tesla, Inc., Vince Woodard. Filed by George J. Austin. (Filing Fee: Not Paid; IFPP) Consent/Declination due by 2/18/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 1,885 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?