Duong v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG20053584

Tags
Last Updated September 9, 2021 at 12:31 PM DT (1.3 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Duong , Ada, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Conn, Elliot, Attorney
No Logo Tahsildoost, Soheyl, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Breach of Contract/Warranty
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 45 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None ?
Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 01/12/2022 09:00 AM D- 24
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None ?
    Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/1/2021, Entered: None ?
      Case Management Statement of Ada Duong Filed (6 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 42 Filed: 6/7/2021, Entered: None ?
        Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 09/15/2021 09:00 AM D- 24
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/7/2021, Entered: None ?
          Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 40 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None ?
            Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 06/30/2021 09:00 AM D- 24
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None ?
              Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None ?
                Case Management Statement of Tesla, Inc. Filed (6 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: None ?
                  Case Management Statement of Ada Duong Filed (6 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 36 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                    Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 02/17/2021 09:00 AM D- 24
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                      Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: None ?
                        Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Granted (3 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                          Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Taken Under Submission (1 Page)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                            Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: None ?
                              Case Management Statement of Ada Duong Filed (6 Pages)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: None ?
                                Case Management Statement of Tesla, Inc. Filed (6 Pages)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/8/2020, Entered: None ?
                                  Response to Defendant Tesla, Inc's Objections to the Declaration of Ada Duong Filed (12 Pages)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                                    Objection to Declaration in Opposition to Motion to Compel Binding Arbitration Filed (9 Pages)
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                                      Supplemental Declaration in Support of Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration Filed (5 Pages)
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                                        Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration Filed (12 Pages)
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                                          Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed (51 Pages)
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Blank 24 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None ?
                                            Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Hearing Confirmed for 09/10/2020 09:00 AM D- 24
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None ?
                                              Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Filed for Defendant (77 Pages)
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Blank 22 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                Case Management Conf Continuance 09/23/2020 09:00 AM D- 24
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                  Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                    Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                      Case Management Statement of Tesla, Inc. Filed (6 Pages)
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                        Case Management Statement of Ada Duong Filed (6 Pages)
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                          Case Management Conf Continuance 07/22/2020 09:00 AM D- 24 (1 Page)
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                            Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued (5 Pages)
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                              Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                  Case Management Statement of Ada Duong Filed (6 Pages)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                    Notice of Posting First Appearance Fees Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                      Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Jeffrey Brand Granted (1 Page)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                        Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Jeffrey Brand Filed for Tesla, Inc. (3 Pages)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                          Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed (1 Page)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/9/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                            First Amended Complaint Filed (23 Pages)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                              Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tesla, Inc. Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                                                Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                  Initial Case Management Conference 06/22/2020 03:00 PM D- 22 (2 Pages)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    Declaration Regarding Venue Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed (23 Pages)
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ada Duong (3 Pages)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 564 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?