Calderon et al v. Clearview AI, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:20-cv-01296-CM
District Judge Colleen McMahon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2021 at 1:42 PM EST (10.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Jennifer Rocio, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bursor & Fisher PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua David Arisohn +1 646 837 7150 +1 212 989 9163 jarisohn@bursor.com
No Logo Mario Calderon, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bursor & Fisher PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua David Arisohn +1 646 837 7150 +1 212 989 9163 jarisohn@bursor.com
v.
No Logo Cdw Government LLC, Defendant
Clearview AI, Inc. Clearview AI, Inc., Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 2/13/2020
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $5000000
Nature of Suit 380 - Personal Property: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity Action
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County XX Out of State
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (79) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: 9/22/2020 Notice of Filing Transcript
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 9/9/20 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: 9/22/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 9/9/2020 before Judge Colleen McMahon. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2020..(McGuirk, Kelly)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank  Telephone Conference
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen McMahon: Telephone Conference held on 9/9/2020. Decision: Conference held. Proceedings in these six matters are stayed pending a disposition from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. There will be no conference September 16, 2020.Submitted by: Chloe Lewis (Court Reporter Pamela Utter). (mde)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020 Notice of appearance
        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tor Bernhard Ekeland on behalf of Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That..(Ekeland, Tor)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: 8/18/2020 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
          CALENDAR NOTICE: Please take notice that the above captioned matter has been scheduled for a: Telephone Conference on Wednesday, September 9, 2020 at 10:30 A.M. before the Honorable Colleen McMahon, United States District Judge. Parties should dial in at 1(888)363-4749, access code (9054506) to join the conference Any scheduling difficulties must be brought to the attention of the Court in writing and faxed to Chambers at (212) 805-6326. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 9/9/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/18/2020) (mml)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: 8/18/2020 Motion to transfer case
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: 8/12/2020 Notice of appearance
              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel Laurence Kurtzberg on behalf of Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That..(Kurtzberg, Joel)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: 8/12/2020 Notice of appearance
                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Floyd Abrams on behalf of Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That..(Abrams, Floyd)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None MDL Conditional Transfer Out Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: 8/4/2020 Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [60] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re [52] Amended Complaint,. Clearview defendants' time to respond to Amended Complaint adjourned sine die. The Court will conference all of the Clearview matters on September 16, 2020 at 11:00. Notice of conference and format of conference will be posted on ECF. (All Defendants.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/4/20) (yv) Modified on 8/4/2020 (yv).
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank  set/reset hearings
                      Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/16/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. (yv)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: 7/30/2020 Certificate of Service Complaints
                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. David Andalcio served on 7/28/2020, answer due 8/18/2020; Jose Flores served on 7/28/2020, answer due 8/18/2020; Wynndalco Enterprises, LLC served on 7/28/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. Service was accepted by Richard S. Reizen. Document filed by Jennifer Rocio; Mario Calderon..(Arisohn, Joshua)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: 7/27/2020, Terminated: 8/4/2020 motion for extension of time to file answerCourt Filing
                          LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: [52] Amended Complaint, addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Lee Wolosky dated July 27, 2020. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That..(Wolosky, Lee)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: 7/23/2020 Certificate of Service Complaints
                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. Richard Schwartz served on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020; Hoan Ton-That served on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. Service was accepted by Andrew Lichtman. Document filed by Jennifer Rocio; Mario Calderon..(Arisohn, Joshua)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: 7/23/2020 Summons issued
                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wynndalco Enterprises, LLC..(pne)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: 7/23/2020 Summons issued
                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Andalcio..(pne)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: 7/23/2020 Summons issued
                                  ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jose Flores..(pne)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: 7/22/2020 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jose Flores, re: [52] Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Mario Calderon, Jennifer Rocio..(Arisohn, Joshua)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: 7/22/2020 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Andalcio, re: [52] Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Mario Calderon, Jennifer Rocio..(Arisohn, Joshua)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: 7/22/2020 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wynndalco Enterprises, LLC, re: [52] Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Mario Calderon, Jennifer Rocio..(Arisohn, Joshua)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: 7/22/2020 Amended Complaint
                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [1] Complaint against Clearview AI, Inc., Wynndalco Enterprises, LLC, David Andalcio, Jose Flores, Hoan Ton-That, Richard Schwartz with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Mario Calderon, Jennifer Rocio. Related document: [1] Complaint..(Arisohn, Joshua)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document 51 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: 5/29/2020 Order on motion to interveneCourt Filing
                                            MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER DENYING THE MOTION TO INTERVENE AND TO DISMISS OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO STAY CASES OR TRANSFER VENUE denying [22] Motion to Intervene. Mutnick's motion for leave to intervene permissively is, therefore, DENIED. This constitutes the decision and order of the Court. It is a written opinion. The Clerk of the Court is directed to remove the motion at Dkt. No. 22 from the Court's list of pending motions. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/29/2020) (mml)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: 5/20/2020 Notice - other
                                              NOTICE of David Mutnick's Notice of Supplemental Information in Support of Motion to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue re: [22] MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue.. Document filed by David Mutnick. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1).(Drury, Scott)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: 5/14/2020 Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT on [45] Supplemental Letter granting [43] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' time to respond to complaints in these actions is adjourned sine die. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/14/2020) (mml) Modified on 5/14/2020 (mml).
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: 5/12/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Lee Wolosky dated May 12, 2020 re: David Mutnick's May 11, 2020 supplemental filing [Dkt. 47]. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc...(Wolosky, Lee)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: 5/11/2020 Notice - other
                                                    NOTICE of Supplemental Authority and Factual Information in Support of Motion to Intervene re: [22] MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue.. Document filed by David Mutnick. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2).(Drury, Scott)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: 5/11/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [36] Motion for Scott Robert Drury to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/11/2020). (mde)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: 5/11/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Lee Wolosky dated May 11, 2020 re: Motion to Extend Time to File Answer. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc...(Wolosky, Lee)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: 5/5/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Lee Wolosky dated May 5, 2020 re: Motion to Extend Time to File Answer. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc...(Wolosky, Lee)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: 5/4/2020, Terminated: 5/14/2020 motion for extension of time to file answerCourt Filing
                                                            LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: [1] Complaint addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Lee Wolosky dated May 4, 2020. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc...(Wolosky, Lee)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: 5/4/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                              DECLARATION of Scott R. Drury in Support re: [22] MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue.. Document filed by David Mutnick. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5).(Drury, Scott)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: 5/4/2020 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [22] MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue. . Document filed by David Mutnick..(Drury, Scott)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: 5/4/2020 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                  MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting [39] DAVID MUTNICK'S REQUEST TO FILE REPLY MEMORANDUM EXCEEDING 10 PAGES. ENDORSEMENT: OK. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/4/2020) (mml)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: 5/1/2020, Terminated: 5/4/2020 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages . Document filed by David Mutnick..(Drury, Scott)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: 4/29/2020 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent CDW, LLC, Corporate Parent CDW Corporation for CDW Government LLC. Document filed by CDW Government LLC..(Dunn, Joshua)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: 4/29/2020 Response to motion
                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re: [22] MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue. . Document filed by CDW Government LLC..(Dunn, Joshua)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 36 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: 4/29/2020, Terminated: 5/11/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                          MOTION for Scott Robert Drury to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by David Mutnick. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Affidavit of Scott R. Drury, # (2) Exhibit 1 to Affidavit-Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Drury, Scott)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: 4/29/2020 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                            DECLARATION of Lee S. Wolosky in Opposition re: [22] MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue.. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4).(Wolosky, Lee)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: 4/29/2020 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [22] MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue. . Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc...(Wolosky, Lee)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: 4/29/2020 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc...(Wolosky, Lee)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: 4/29/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Joshua Lichtman on behalf of Clearview AI, Inc...(Lichtman, Andrew)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: 4/29/2020 Proposed Order
                                                                                    PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by David Mutnick. Related Document Number: [29]..(Drury, Scott) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: 4/29/2020 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Scott R. Drury in Support re: [29] MOTION for Scott Robert Drury to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19634978. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Document filed by David Mutnick. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing).(Drury, Scott)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: 4/29/2020, Terminated: 4/29/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                        MOTION for Scott Robert Drury to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19634978. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by David Mutnick..(Drury, Scott)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: 4/29/2020 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                          DECLARATION of Joshua D. Arisohn in Opposition re: [22] MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue.. Document filed by Mario Calderon, Jennifer Rocio..(Arisohn, Joshua)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: 4/29/2020 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [22] MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue. . Document filed by Mario Calderon, Jennifer Rocio..(Arisohn, Joshua)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                              >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [36] MOTION for Scott Robert Drury to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (laq)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Notice Regarding Deleted Document
                                                                                                ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number NOTE TO COURT REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION ACCEPTANCE. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (laq)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                  >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. [31] Proposed Order, [29] MOTION for Scott Robert Drury to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19634978. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., [30] Affidavit in Support of Motion.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the motion is not correct; missing Certificate of Good Standing from missing Proposed Order; THE DOCUMENTS MUST BE FILED TOGETHER IN ONE EVENT. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (laq)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: 4/22/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER: The plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED to respond to Mutnick's Motion to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue in their respective dockets by 5 PM on April 29, 2020. (Responses due by 4/29/2020.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/22/2020) (mml)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: 4/21/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen Anne Newirth on behalf of David Mutnick..(Newirth, Karen)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: 4/21/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Scott R. Drury in Support re: [22] MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue.. Document filed by David Mutnick. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L).(Newirth, Karen)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: 4/21/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [22] MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue. . Document filed by David Mutnick..(Newirth, Karen)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: 4/21/2020, Terminated: 5/29/2020 Motion to intervene
                                                                                                            MOTION to Intervene and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Cases or Transfer Venue. Document filed by David Mutnick..(Newirth, Karen)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: 4/15/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              DIRECTIVE: Nor is it obvious to this court why any "lead plaintiff's counsel" is necessary. There are only two related cases pending before me. Should this New York court end up being the place where this Illinois statute gets interpreted, and where alleged violations of Illinois law are litigated, my inclination would be to consolidate the two cases and allow the three law firms involved for the plaintiffs to divide the laboring oar, on the understanding that I would not be paying three, or even two, sets of lawyers to appear and do the work of one at any conference, hearing, deposition, or other event. This is not a securities fraud class action; I am not constrained by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act; I simply have two related but identical class actions in front of me, as to which attorneys' fees will be parceled out eventually (should plaintiffs prevail) as though it were a single case. I thus decline to take any action on the "lead plaintiffs counsel" motion filed in Calderon until I have entertained any motions addressed to the complaints that may be filed by the defendants. In that regard, the cases shall be consolidated, and a single motion shall be filed under each docket number, addressed to the pleadings as they have been filed. The allegations against the common defendant (Clearview) are in all relevant respects identical; there is no need for separate motions in the two cases. The parties are free to set their own schedule, subject to the court's veto - and my veto will likely be to accelerate the filing of motions, not to defer it. You have ten business days to get me a motion schedule. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/14/2020) (mml)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: 4/9/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Frank S. Hedin in Support re: [17] MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Mario Calderon, Jennifer Rocio..(Arisohn, Joshua)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: 4/9/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Scott A. Bursor in Support re: [17] MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Mario Calderon, Jennifer Rocio..(Arisohn, Joshua)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: 4/9/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [17] MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Mario Calderon, Jennifer Rocio..(Arisohn, Joshua)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: 4/9/2020 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by Mario Calderon, Jennifer Rocio..(Arisohn, Joshua)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: 4/9/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Joshua D. Arisohn dated April 9, 2020 re: Diversity Jurisdiction. Document filed by Mario Calderon, Jennifer Rocio..(Arisohn, Joshua)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: 4/6/2020 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc...(Wolosky, Lee)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: 3/4/2020 Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [13] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. OK. Will there be a motion to consolidate these cases? If so, when? CDW Government LLC answer due 4/24/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/4/2020) (mml)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020, Terminated: 3/4/2020 motion for extension of time to file answerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: [1] Complaint addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Joshua Dunn dated March 3, 2020. Document filed by CDW Government LLC..(Dunn, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [11] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. OK. Clearview AI, Inc. answer due 4/24/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/27/2020) (mml)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: 2/26/2020, Terminated: 2/27/2020 motion for extension of time to file answerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: [1] Complaint addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Lee Wolosky dated February 26, 2020. Document filed by Clearview AI, Inc...(Wolosky, Lee)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: 2/26/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael W. Ross on behalf of Clearview AI, Inc...(Ross, Michael)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: 2/26/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lee Scott Wolosky on behalf of Clearview AI, Inc...(Wolosky, Lee)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: 2/20/2020 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. CDW Government LLC served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. Service was accepted by Lyle Neeman, Document Specialist at IL Corp. Svc. Co.. Document filed by Mario Calderon; Jennifer Rocio..(Arisohn, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: 2/20/2020 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Clearview AI, Inc. served on 2/19/2020, answer due 3/11/2020. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Intake Specialist at CT Corp.. Document filed by Mario Calderon; Jennifer Rocio..(Arisohn, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: 2/14/2020 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Clearview AI, Inc...(pne)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: 2/14/2020 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CDW Government LLC..(pne)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
                                                                                                                                                ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joshua David Arisohn. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
                                                                                                                                                  ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joshua David Arisohn. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                    Case Designated ECF. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                      Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: 2/13/2020 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CDW Government LLC, re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Mario Calderon, Jennifer Rocio..(Arisohn, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: 2/13/2020 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Clearview AI, Inc., re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Mario Calderon, Jennifer Rocio..(Arisohn, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: 2/13/2020 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                            CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Arisohn, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: 2/13/2020 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against CDW Government LLC, Clearview AI, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18796618)Document filed by Mario Calderon, Jennifer Rocio..(Arisohn, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 11 times.

                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?