District Appellate Supreme
Federal
North Dakota District Court Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit United States Supreme Court

Brakebill et al v. Jaeger
Federal Civil Lawsuit North Dakota District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-00008-DLH-CRH
District Judge Daniel L. Hovland, presiding

Tags
Last Updated February 15, 2020 at 10:06 PM ST (1.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Della Merrick, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickson Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Dickson +1 701 222 4400 tdickson@dicksonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard de Bodo +1 310 907 1000 +1 310 907 2000 rich.debodo@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Native American Rights Fund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew L Campbell +1 303 447 8760 +1 303 443 7776 mcampbell@narf.org
Space Jacqueline D. De Leon +1 303 447 8760 jdeleon@narf.org
Space Daniel David Lewerenz +1 202 785 4166 +1 202 822 0068 lewerenz@narf.org
Space Joel West Williams +1 202 785 4166 +1 202 822 0068 williams@narf.org
No Logo Dorothy Herman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickson Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Dickson +1 701 222 4400 tdickson@dicksonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard de Bodo +1 310 907 1000 +1 310 907 2000 rich.debodo@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Native American Rights Fund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew L Campbell +1 303 447 8760 +1 303 443 7776 mcampbell@narf.org
Space Jacqueline D. De Leon +1 303 447 8760 jdeleon@narf.org
Space Daniel David Lewerenz +1 202 785 4166 +1 202 822 0068 lewerenz@narf.org
Space Joel West Williams +1 202 785 4166 +1 202 822 0068 williams@narf.org
No Logo Elvis Norquay, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickson Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Dickson +1 701 222 4400 tdickson@dicksonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard de Bodo +1 310 907 1000 +1 310 907 2000 rich.debodo@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Native American Rights Fund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew L Campbell +1 303 447 8760 +1 303 443 7776 mcampbell@narf.org
Space Jacqueline D. De Leon +1 303 447 8760 jdeleon@narf.org
Space Daniel David Lewerenz +1 202 785 4166 +1 202 822 0068 lewerenz@narf.org
Space Joel West Williams +1 202 785 4166 +1 202 822 0068 williams@narf.org
No Logo Lucille Vivier, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickson Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Dickson +1 701 222 4400 tdickson@dicksonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard de Bodo +1 310 907 1000 +1 310 907 2000 rich.debodo@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Native American Rights Fund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew L Campbell +1 303 447 8760 +1 303 443 7776 mcampbell@narf.org
Space Jacqueline D. De Leon +1 303 447 8760 jdeleon@narf.org
Space Daniel David Lewerenz +1 202 785 4166 +1 202 822 0068 lewerenz@narf.org
Space Joel West Williams +1 202 785 4166 +1 202 822 0068 williams@narf.org
No Logo Ray Norquay, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickson Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Dickson +1 701 222 4400 tdickson@dicksonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard de Bodo +1 310 907 1000 +1 310 907 2000 rich.debodo@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Native American Rights Fund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew L Campbell +1 303 447 8760 +1 303 443 7776 mcampbell@narf.org
Space Jacqueline D. De Leon +1 303 447 8760 jdeleon@narf.org
Space Daniel David Lewerenz +1 202 785 4166 +1 202 822 0068 lewerenz@narf.org
Space Joel West Williams +1 202 785 4166 +1 202 822 0068 williams@narf.org
No Logo Richard Brakebill, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickson Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Dickson +1 701 222 4400 tdickson@dicksonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard de Bodo +1 310 907 1000 +1 310 907 2000 rich.debodo@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Native American Rights Fund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew L Campbell +1 303 447 8760 +1 303 443 7776 mcampbell@narf.org
Space Jacqueline D. De Leon +1 303 447 8760 jdeleon@narf.org
Space Daniel David Lewerenz +1 202 785 4166 +1 202 822 0068 lewerenz@narf.org
Space Joel West Williams +1 202 785 4166 +1 202 822 0068 williams@narf.org
v.
No Logo Alvin Jaeger, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nici S. Meyer +1 701 328 3640 nsmeyer@nd.gov
Space James E. Nicolai +1 701 328 3640 jnicolai@nd.gov
Space David R. Phillips +1 701 328 3640 drphillips@nd.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the North Dakota Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Ann Fischer +1 701 328 3621 elifischer@nd.gov
Space Matthew A Sagsveen +1 701 328 3640 masagsve@nd.gov
United States of America United States of America, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel J. Freeman +1 202 305 4355 daniel.freeman@usdoj.gov
Space Victor J. Williamson +1 202 305 0036 victor.williamson@usdoj.gov
Office Western
Filed 1/20/2016
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 441 - Civil Rights: Voting
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Burleigh
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case 18-1725[USCA8]
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (140) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 125 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: 1/17/2020 Notice of appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Phillips on behalf of Alvin Jaeger (Phillips, David)
    LREF
    Blank 124 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: 8/21/2019 USCA Mandate
    MANDATE of USCA as to [101] Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Alvin Jaeger (rh)
      LREF
      Blank 123 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: 7/31/2019 USCA Judgment
      USCA JUDGMENT as to [101] Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Alvin Jaeger. The District Court's Order of April 3, 2018, is vacated, and the cause remanded. (Attachments: # (1) Opinion)(cjs)
        LREF
        Blank 122 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: 2/11/2019 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
        (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr no longer assigned to the case, as referral judge. (kmk)
          LREF
          Blank 121 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 settlement conferenceCourt Filing
          (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.: Settlement Conference held on 5/29/2018. No settlement reached. (BG)
            LREF
            Blank 120 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: 5/10/2018 Notice of appearance
            NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A. Sagsveen on behalf of Alvin Jaeger (Sagsveen, Matthew)
              LREF
              Blank 119 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: 5/10/2018 Notice of appearance
              NOTICE of Appearance by Nici S. Meyer on behalf of Alvin Jaeger (Meyer, Nici)
                LREF
                Blank 118 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: 5/10/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                REPLY to Response to Motion re [107] MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier. (Campbell, Matthew)
                  LREF
                  Blank 117 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: 5/10/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                  (Text Only) ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting [116] Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Reply to Docket No. [107]. (RLB)
                    LREF
                    Blank  Docket Correction
                    DOCKET CORRECTION re: [116] Motion for Leave to File Document. Clerk's Office added more complete description for attachment. (cjs)
                      LREF
                      Blank 116 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: 5/8/2018, Terminated: 5/10/2018 motion for leave to file
                      MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Unauthorized Sur-Reply by Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A - Proposed Second Reply In Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Litigation Expenses)(Campbell, Matthew) Modified on 5/9/2018 to add more complete description for attachment(cjs).
                        LREF
                        Blank 115 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: 5/7/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [114] MOTION for Hearing (Settlement Conference). Settlement Conference set for 5/29/2018 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
                          LREF
                          Blank 114 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018, Terminated: 5/7/2018 Motion for Hearing
                          MOTION for Hearing (Settlement Conference) by Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier. (Campbell, Matthew) Modified on 5/7/2018 to correct motion relief from Motion for Miscellaneous Relief to Motion for Hearing. (rh)
                            LREF
                            Blank 113 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/1/2018 Response to motion
                            RESPONSE to Motion re [107] MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Alvin Jaeger. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Vague fees and expenses, # (2) Exhibit 2 - VRA fees and expenses, # (3) Affidavit of Elizabeth Fischer)(Fischer, Elizabeth)
                              LREF
                              Blank 112 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                              ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland denying [103] Motion to Stay (MM)
                                LREF
                                Blank 111 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: 4/26/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [107] MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier. (Campbell, Matthew)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 110 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: 4/26/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [103] MOTION to Stay re [99] Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Expedite, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Alvin Jaeger. (Nicolai, James)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Docket Correction
                                    DOCKET CORRECTION re: [109] RESPONSE. Clerk's office added complete descriptions to attachment. Pursuant to Administrative Policy Section XIII(A), each attachment MUST contain a "description of sufficient detail to make the attachment readily identifiable to the court." Attachment A is not sufficient detail. Counsel should review the Guide to Filing Attachments on out website for further information. (as)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 109 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018 Response to motion
                                      RESPONSE to Motion re [103] MOTION to Stay re [99] Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Expedite, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A - Declaration of Lucille Vivier)(Campbell, Matthew) Modified on 4/25/2018 to add description to attachment. (as)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 108 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 Response to motion
                                        RESPONSE to Motion re [107] MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Alvin Jaeger. (Nicolai, James)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Docket Correction
                                          DOCKET CORRECTION re: [107] MOTION for Attorney Fees and MOTION for Bill of Costs. Clerks office added more complete descriptions to attachments. (js)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 107 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Motion for attorney fees
                                            MOTION for Attorney Fees , MOTION for Bill of Costs by Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier. (Attachments: # (1) Campbell Declaration, # (2) Exhibit A - Curriculum Vitae of Matthew Campbell, # (3) Exhibit B - Curriculum Vitae of Joel Williams, # (4) Exhibit C - Curriculum Vitae of Natalie Landreth, # (5) Exhibit D - Curriculum Vitae of Melody McCoy, # (6) Exhibit E - NARF Costs through 8/1/2016, # (7) Exhibit F - NARF time for 2014-2016, # (8) de Bodo Declaration, # (9) Exhibit 1 - List of Time and Fees, # (10) Dickson Declaration, # (11) Memorandum in Support)(Campbell, Matthew) Modified on 4/18/2018 to add more complete exhibit descriptions. (js)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 106 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                              (Text Only) ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland finding as moot [105] Motion for Extension of Time to File for Attorney's Fees and Cost. See D.N.D. Civ. L.R. 54.1 providing such motions are due within 14 days after entry of judgment. (MM)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 105 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: 4/16/2018, Terminated: 4/17/2018 motion for extension of time to file
                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay. (Campbell, Matthew)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 104 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018 Memorandum In Support
                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [103] MOTION to Stay re [99] Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Expedite, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Alvin Jaeger. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affidavit of Melissa Hamilton, # (2) Exhibit A - Richard Brakebill interrogatory responses, # (3) Exhibit B - Dorothy Herman interrogatory responses, # (4) Exhibit C - Della Merrick interrogatory responses, # (5) Exhibit D - Elvis Norquay interrogatory responses, # (6) Exhibit E - Ray Norquay interrogatory responses, # (7) Exhibit F - Lucille Vivier interrogatory responses)(Nicolai, James) Modified on 4/11/2018 to add exhibit letters to attachment descriptions (lh).
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 103 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018, Terminated: 4/30/2018 Motion To Stay
                                                    MOTION to Stay re [99] Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Expedite, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Alvin Jaeger. (Nicolai, James)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  USCA Case Number
                                                      USCA Case Number 18-1725 for [101] Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (cjs)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 102 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018 NOA Supplement
                                                        Transmittal of Notice of Appeal Supplement to 8th Circuit Court of Appeals re [101] Notice of Interlocutory Appeal (rh)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 101 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018, Terminated: 8/21/2019 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal
                                                          NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to [99] Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Expedite, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Alvin Jaeger. Filing fee $ 505. (rh)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018, Terminated: 8/21/2019 Notice of appeal
                                                            *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [99] Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Expedite, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Alvin Jaeger. Filing fee $505. (Nicolai, James) Modified on 4/4/2018 to restrict access. (rh)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Docket Correction
                                                              DOCKET CORRECTION re: [100] Notice of Appeal. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access and re-filed as Notice of Interlocutory Appeal at [101]. (rh)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 99 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: 4/3/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting [80] Motion Dissolve Preliminary Injunction; granting [89] Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting [95] Motion to Expedite. (MM)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 98 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [89] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Response to Defendant's Motion to Dissolve Preliminary Injunction filed by Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier. (Campbell, Matthew)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 97 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: 3/12/2018 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting [63] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and granting [74] Motion drop Plaintiff Deloris Baker. (MM)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 96 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/12/2018 Response to motion
                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re [89] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Response to Defendant's Motion to Dissolve Preliminary Injunction filed by Alvin Jaeger. See document [94]. (cjs)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 95 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018, Terminated: 4/3/2018 Motion to Expedite
                                                                        MOTION to Expedite Review of Defendant's Motion to Dissolve Injunction and Plaintiffs' Motion for Second Preliminary Injunction by Alvin Jaeger. (Nicolai, James)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 94 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [80] MOTION to Dissolve preliminary injunction re [50] Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction , [89] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Response to Defendant's Motion to Dissolve Preliminary Injunction filed by Alvin Jaeger. (Nicolai, James)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: 2/22/2018 Memorandum In Support
                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [89] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Response to Defendant's Motion to Dissolve Preliminary Injunction Corrected Memorandum filed by Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier. (Campbell, Matthew)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 91 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: 2/22/2018 Notice - other
                                                                              NOTICE by Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier re [90] MEMORANDUM in Support,, of Errata (Campbell, Matthew)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 93 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re [80] MOTION to Dissolve preliminary injunction re [50] Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs. (See Response contained in doc [89] (td)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 90 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Memorandum In Support
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [80] MOTION to Dissolve preliminary injunction re [50] Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction , [89] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Response to Defendant's Motion to Dissolve Preliminary Injunction filed by Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Matthew Barreto, Ph.D. with Exh A-D, # (2) Declaration of Gabriel R. Sanchez Ph.D , # (3)Declaration of Michael D. Herron , # (4) Written Testimony Native American Rights Fund March 17, 2017, # (5) Declaration of Standing Rock Chairman Mike Faith, # (6) Declaration of Standing Rock Chairwoman Myra Pearson, # (7) Jim Silrum e-mail 1/18/2017, # (8) Declaration of Louis Frederick, Director of LIHEAP, # (9) Addendum to Declaration of Daniel McCool, Ph.D., # (10)Declaration of Dr. Gerald R. Webster , # (11) Declaration of Lucille Viver, # (12) Declaration of Carol Davis , # (13) Declaration of Elvis Norquay, # (14) Declaration of Richard Brakebill, # (15) Strategic Plan - End Homelessness Feb, 2008., # (16) Jim Silrum e-mail 2/3/17 (Campbell, Matthew) Modified on 2/27/2018: SEE CORRECTED Memorandum filed at [92] (lh). Modified on 2/27/2018 to add descriptions to the attachments (td).
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 89 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018, Terminated: 4/3/2018 Motion for preliminary injunction
                                                                                    MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Response to Defendant's Motion to Dissolve Preliminary Injunction by Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier. (Campbell, Matthew)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 88 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                      ANSWER to [77] Amended Complaint by Alvin Jaeger.(Nicolai, James)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 87 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting [86] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (ZE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank  set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings
                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines as to [80] MOTION to Dissolve preliminary injunction re [50] Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 2/16/2018 Replies due by 3/9/2018. (cjs)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 86 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018, Terminated: 1/29/2018 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [80] MOTION to Dissolve preliminary injunction re [50] Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Consolidated Briefing Schedule by Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Order)(Campbell, Matthew)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Docket Correction
                                                                                              DOCKET CORRECTION re: [81] Memorandum in Support of Motion. Clerk's office added numbers to exhibits and deleted duplicate word "exhibit" from each attachment. (cd)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 85 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 supplement
                                                                                                SUPPLEMENT to document: [81] MEMORANDUM in Support by Alvin Jaeger. Exhibits S10-S15 filed conventionally in Clerk's office. (cd)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 84 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                  (Text Only) ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting [82] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (JM)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 83 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alvin Jaeger re [81] MEMORANDUM in Support,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (Nicolai, James)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 82 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018, Terminated: 1/16/2018 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Alvin Jaeger. (Nicolai, James)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 81 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Memorandum In Support
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re [80] MOTION Dissolve preliminary injunction re [50] Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alvin Jaeger. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of John Arnold, # (2) Exhibit A1 - Voting Ballot, # (3) Exhibit A2 - Voting Ballot, # (4) Exhibit A3 - Voting Ballot, # (5) Exhibit A4 - Voting Ballot, # (6) Exhibit A5 - Voting Ballot, # (7) Exhibit A6 - Voting Ballot, # (8) Exhibit A7 - Voting Ballot, # (9) Exhibit A8 - Voting Ballot, # (10) Exhibit A9 - Voting Ballot, # (11) Exhibit A10 - Voting Ballot, # (12) Exhibit A11 - Voting Ballot, # (13) Exhibit A12 - Voting Ballot, # (14) Exhibit A13 - Voting Ballot, # (15) Exhibit A14 - Voting Ballot, # (16) Exhibit A15 - Voting Ballot, # (17) Exhibit A16 - Voting Ballot, # (18) Exhibit A17 - Voting Ballot, # (19) Exhibit A18 - Voting Ballot, # (20) Exhibit A19 - Voting Ballot, # (21) Exhibit A20 - Voting Ballot, # (22) Exhibit A21 - Voting Ballot, # (23) Exhibit A22 - Voting Ballot, # (24) Exhibit A23 - Voting Ballot, # (25) Exhibit A24 - Voting Ballot, # (26) Exhibit A25 - Voting Ballot, # (27) Exhibit A26 - Voting Ballot, # (28) Exhibit A27 - Voting Ballot, # (29) Exhibit A28 - Voting Ballot, # (30) Exhibit A29 - Voting Ballot, # (31) Exhibit A30 - Voting Ballot, # (32) Exhibit A31 - Voting Ballot, # (33) Exhibit A32 - Voting Ballot, # (34) Exhibit A33 - Voting Ballot, # (35) Exhibit A34 - Voting Ballot, # (36) Exhibit A35 - Voting Ballot, # (37) Exhibit A36 - Voting Ballot, # (38) Exhibit A37 - Voting Ballot, # (39) Exhibit A38 - Voting Ballot, # (40) Exhibit A39 - Voting Ballot, # (41) Exhibit A40 - Voting Ballot, # (42) Exhibit A41 - Voting Ballot, # (43) Exhibit A42 - Voting Ballot, # (44) Exhibit A43 - Voting Ballot, # (45) Exhibit A44 - Voting Ballot, # (46) Exhibit A45 - Voting Ballot, # (47) Exhibit A46 - Voting Ballot, # (48) Exhibit A47 - Voting Ballot, # (49) Exhibit A48 - Voting Ballot, # (50) Exhibit A49 - Voting Ballot, # (51) Exhibit A50 - Voting Ballot, # (52) Exhibit A51 - Voting Ballot, # (53) Exhibit A52 - Voting Ballot, # (54) Exhibit A53 - Voting Ballot, # (55) Affidavit of Irwin James Narum (Jim) Silrum, # (56) Exhibit S1 - Official Abstract of Votes, # (57) Exhibit S2 - North Dakota Demographics Conference, # (58) Exhibit S3 - Voter ID Sign, # (59) Exhibit S4 - Voter ID Sign, # (60) Exhibit S5 - Voter ID Sign, # (61) Exhibit S6 - Voter ID Sign, # (62) Exhibit S7 - Voter ID Sign, # (63) Exhibit S8 - Voter ID Sign, # (64) Exhibit S9 - Voter ID Sign, # (65) Exhibit S16 - Voter's Affidavit, # (66) Exhibit S17 - Absentee/Mail Ballot, # (67) Exhibit S18 - Voter Information, # (68) Exhibit S19 - Voter Information, # (69) Exhibit S20 - Letter to Voter, # (70) Affidavit of Melissa Hamilton, # (71) Exhibit H1 - Application for ND Driver's License) (Nicolai, James) Modified on 1/17/2018 to delete excess docket text and add exhibit numbering. (cd) Modified on 1/22/2018 to add exhibit descriptions. (cd)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 80 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018, Terminated: 4/3/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                          MOTION to Dissolve preliminary injunction re [50] Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Alvin Jaeger. (Nicolai, James)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 79 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: 12/28/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [63] MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and [74] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier. (Campbell, Matthew) Modified on 12/29/2017 to add link (lh).
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 78 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: 12/27/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deloris Baker, Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier re [77] Amended Complaint (Campbell, Matthew)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 77 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: 12/27/2017 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants filed by Deloris Baker, Dorothy Herman, Richard Brakebill, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Della Merrick, Lucille Vivier.(Campbell, Matthew)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 76 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: 12/27/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier re [63] MOTION for Leave to File First Amended ComplaintMOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Campbell, Matthew)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 75 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting [63] Motion for Leave to File; granting [73] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint due by 12/29/2017. Defendant Alvin Jaeger's answer due 1/31/2018. (ZE)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 73 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017, Terminated: 12/22/2017 motion for extension of time to file answer
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [63] MOTION for Leave to File First Amended ComplaintMOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Alvin Jaeger. (Nicolai, James)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Docket Correction
                                                                                                                        DOCKET CORRECTION re: [17] Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Error in document. Clerk's office restricted access to document per filer's request. (rh)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 72 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017, Terminated: 12/22/2017 motion for extension of time to file answer
                                                                                                                          *RESTRICTED - ERROR IN DOCUMENT* MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint by Alvin Jaeger. (Nicolai, James) Modified on 12/22/2017 to restrict access to document per filer's request. (rh)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 71 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Response to motion
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re [63] MOTION for Leave to File First Amended ComplaintMOTION to Withdraw as Attorney [74] Motion and Drop Ms. Baker from the Matter filed by Alvin Jaeger. (Nicolai, James) Modified on 12/28/2017 to add link (lh).
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 70 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Nicolai on behalf of Alvin Jaeger (Nicolai, James)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  Docket Correction
                                                                                                                                DOCKET CORRECTION re: [66] NOTICE of Appearance. Document filed was a fillable pdf. Clerk's Office restricted access to document and re-filed as a non-fillable pdf at docket [68]; [67] NOTICE of Appearance. Document filed was a fillable pdf. Clerk's Office restricted access to document and re-filed as a non-fillable pdf at docket [69]. (js)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 69 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/18/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline D. De Leon on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (js)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 68 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/18/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel David Lewerenz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (js)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 67 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/15/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                      *RESTRICTED - ERROR IN DOCUMENT* NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline D. De Leon on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (De Leon, Jacqueline) Modified on 12/18/2017 to restrict access. (js)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 66 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/15/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                        *RESTRICTED - ERROR IN DOCUMENT* NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel David Lewerenz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Lewerenz, Daniel) Modified on 12/18/2017 to restrict access. (js)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 65 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER: The court shall hold its ruling on motions at doc. no. [63] in abeyance pending defendant's response. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 74 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Remove Deloris Baker as a named plaintiff by Deloris Baker, Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier. (See Document [63]) (rh)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Objection
                                                                                                                                              OBJECTION re [63] Motion for Leave to File, Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Alvin Jaeger. (Fischer, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017, Terminated: 12/22/2017 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Proposed First Amended Complaint)(Campbell, Matthew) Modified on 12/14/2017 to add exhibit description. (js)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 62 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: 9/20/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Regarding Preliminary Injunction by Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(MM)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 61 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: 9/20/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Daniel L. Hovland: Status Conference held on 9/20/2016. (Court Reporter SE) (jr)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 60 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: 9/20/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Deloris Baker, Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier Regarding Status Conference (Campbell, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: 9/16/2016 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 9/20/2016 at 01:15 PM by telephone before Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Parties are to call phone number and enter access code provided by separate email. (JM)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: 9/15/2016 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Richard de Bodo on behalf of All Plaintiffs (de Bodo, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: 8/31/2016 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Alvin Jaeger re [56] Objection by Alvin Jaeger. (Fischer, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: 8/31/2016 Objection
                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTION Response by Alvin Jaeger. (Fischer, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 55 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: 8/29/2016 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION re [54] Objection to Defendant's Proposed Order by Deloris Baker, Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier. (Campbell, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Docket Correction
                                                                                                                                                                  DOCKET CORRECTION re: [52] (NOTICE). Wrong event selected. Clerks office restricted access to document and re-filed as (OBJECTION) at [54]; [52] (NOTICE). Clerks office added more complete descriptions to attachments. (js)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/29/2016 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION re [51] Notice (Other), by Alvin Jaeger. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Defendant's [Proposed] Order Regarding Preliminary Injuction, # (2) Exhibit B - Affidavit, # (3) Exhibit C - Absentee Ballot Application with Affidavit)(js)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alvin Jaeger re [54] Notice (Other) (Fischer, Elizabeth) Modified on 8/29/2016 to correct link.(js).
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                        *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* NOTICE by Alvin Jaeger of Objection to Proposed Order (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Fischer, Elizabeth) Modified on 8/29/2016 to restrict access. (js)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Docket Correction
                                                                                                                                                                          DOCKET CORRECTION re: [51] Notice. Clerk's office added descriptions to attachments. (lh)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: 8/24/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Deloris Baker, Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier of Submission of Proposed Order (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - 2012 Election Officials' Manual, # (2) Exhibit B - House Bill No. 1332, # (3) Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(Campbell, Matthew) Modified on 8/26/2016 to add descriptions to attachments (lh).
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: 8/1/2016 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting [42] Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (RLB) Order MOOT - See ORDER At [99]. (as)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: 7/21/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Deloris Baker, Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier of Recent Rulings Relevant to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Frank v. Walker, # (2) Exhibit B - Veasey v. Abbott)(Campbell, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: 7/18/2016 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [42] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay. (de Bodo, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Docket Correction
                                                                                                                                                                                    DOCKET CORRECTION re: [45] Response to Motion. Clerk's office removed incorrect link to [43]. (rh)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: 7/5/2016 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alvin Jaeger re [45] Response to Motion, [46] Notice of Substitution of Attorney (Fischer, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: 7/5/2016 Notice of Substitution of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney by Elizabeth Ann Fischer on behalf of Alvin Jaeger (Fischer, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: 7/5/2016 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re [42] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Alvin Jaeger. (Fischer, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/6/2016 to remove incorrect link to [43]. (rh)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Docket Correction
                                                                                                                                                                                            DOCKET CORRECTION re: [43] MOTION. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access, terminated motion and re-filed as MEMORANDUM in Support at [44]. (as)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 44 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: 6/21/2016 Memorandum In Support
                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [42] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Deloris Baker, Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Matthew Barreto, # (2) Declaration of Dan McCool, # (3) Declaration of Gerald Webster, # (4) Exhibit A of Webster Declaration, # (5) Appendix 1 of Webster Declaration, # (6) Appendix 2 of Webster Declaration, # (7) Declaration of Michael Herron, # (8) Declaration of Gabriel Sanchez, # (9) Declaration of Richard Brakebill, # (10) Declaration of Lucille Vivier, # (11) Declaration of Dorothy Herman, # (12) Declaration of LaDonna Allard, # (13) Declaration of Matthew Campbell)(as)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: 6/20/2016, Terminated: 6/21/2016 Motion for preliminary injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Deloris Baker, Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Matthew Barreto, # (2) Declaration of Dan McCool, # (3) Declaration of Gerald Webster, # (4) Exhibit A of Webster Declaration, # (5) Appendix 1 of Webster Declaration, # (6) Appendix 2 of Webster Declaration, # (7) Declaration of Michael Herron, # (8) Declaration of Gabriel Sanchez, # (9) Declaration of Richard Brakebill, # (10) Declaration of Lucille Vivier, # (11) Declaration of Dorothy Herman, # (12) Declaration of LaDonna Allard, # (13) Declaration of Matthew Campbell)(Campbell, Matthew) Modified on 6/21/2016 to restrict access. (as)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: 6/20/2016, Terminated: 8/1/2016 Motion for preliminary injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Deloris Baker, Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier. (Campbell, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: 5/17/2016 Order Adopting StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Adopting [40] Stipulation filed by Della Merrick, Richard Brakebill, Elvis Norquay, Dorothy Herman, Ray Norquay, Deloris Baker by Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(MM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: 5/13/2016 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order re Preliminary Injunction Motion by Deloris Baker, Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay. (de Bodo, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Daniel L. Hovland: Status Conference held on 5/12/2016. (Court Reporter None) (jr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: 5/11/2016 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 5/12/2016 at 01:30 PM Central by telephone before Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (BS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: 5/10/2016 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order re Preliminary Injunction Motion by Deloris Baker, Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay. (de Bodo, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: 4/21/2016 Order on Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland denying [29] Motion for Reconsideration (BS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: 4/20/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Daniel L. Hovland: Status Conference held on 4/20/2016. (Court Reporter None) (jr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Docket Correction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DOCKET CORRECTION re: [34] (RESPONSE to Motion). Modified entry to add additional filer (Deloris Baker). (js)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: 4/19/2016 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re [29] MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier, and Deloris Baker. (Campbell, Matthew) Modified on 4/20/2016 to add Deloris Baker as additional filer (js).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: 4/14/2016 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 4/20/2016 at 12:00 Noon (Central) by telephone before Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Chambers will initiate the call. (BS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: 4/8/2016 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alvin Jaeger re [31] Answer to Complaint, [29] MOTION for Reconsideration , [30] MEMORANDUM in Support (Joseph, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: 4/8/2016 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to [1] Complaint by Alvin Jaeger.(Joseph, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: 4/8/2016 Memorandum In Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [29] MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Alvin Jaeger. (Joseph, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: 4/8/2016, Terminated: 4/21/2016 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Reconsideration by Alvin Jaeger. (Joseph, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: 4/5/2016 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a ClaimCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland denying [14] Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (BS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: 4/5/2016 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF re [14] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Statement of Interest by United States of America. (Williamson, Victor)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: 4/5/2016 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    (Text Only) ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting [25] Motion for Leave to File. (BS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: 4/1/2016, Terminated: 4/5/2016 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File by United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Document)(mk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: 3/9/2016 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alvin Jaeger re [23] Reply to Response to Motion (Joseph, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: 3/9/2016 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [20] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Opposition, [14] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Alvin Jaeger. (Joseph, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: 3/3/2016 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deloris Baker, Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier re [21] Response to Motion to Dismiss (de Bodo, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Docket Correction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DOCKET CORRECTION re: [20] MOTION. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access to document, terminated motion and re-filed as RESPONSE to Motion at [21]. (as)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: 3/3/2016 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re [14] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Deloris Baker, Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier. (as)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: 3/2/2016, Terminated: 3/3/2016 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Opposition by Deloris Baker, Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier. (de Bodo, Richard) Modified on 3/3/2016 to restrict access. (as)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: 2/25/2016 Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    (Text Only) ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting [18] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [14] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiffs' response due by 3/2/2016. (JM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: 2/24/2016, Terminated: 2/25/2016 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [16] MEMORANDUM in Support, [14] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Deloris Baker, Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Lucille Vivier. (Campbell, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: 2/3/2016 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alvin Jaeger re [16] MEMORANDUM in Support (Joseph, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: 2/3/2016 Memorandum In Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re [14] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Alvin Jaeger. (Joseph, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: 2/3/2016 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alvin Jaeger re [14] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Joseph, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: 2/3/2016, Terminated: 4/5/2016 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Alvin Jaeger. (Joseph, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel L. Hovland for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Ralph R. Erickson.(mk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016 Consent/Reassignment Form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Deloris Baker, Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay and Lucille Vivier. (mk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: 1/22/2016 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deloris Baker, Dorothy Herman, Richard Brakebill, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Della Merrick, Lucille Vivier. (Dickson, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: 1/22/2016 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deloris Baker, Dorothy Herman, Richard Brakebill, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Della Merrick, Lucille Vivier. Alvin Jaeger served on 1/21/2016, answer due 2/11/2016 (Dickson, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: 1/20/2016 Notice of Direct Assignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Lucille Vivier. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 2/3/2016. (rh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: 1/20/2016 Notice of Direct Assignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Ray Norquay. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 2/3/2016. (rh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: 1/20/2016 Notice of Direct Assignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Elvis Norquay. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 2/3/2016. (rh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: 1/20/2016 Notice of Direct Assignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Della Merrick. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 2/3/2016. (rh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: 1/20/2016 Notice of Direct Assignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Dorothy Herman. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 2/3/2016. (rh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: 1/20/2016 Notice of Direct Assignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Deloris Baker. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 2/3/2016. (rh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: 1/20/2016 Notice of Direct Assignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Richard Brakebill. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 2/3/2016. (rh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: 1/20/2016 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to Alvin Jaeger. (rh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: 1/20/2016 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Alvin Jaeger (Filing fee $400, receipt number 116000489) filed by Deloris Baker, Dorothy Herman, Richard Brakebill, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay, Della Merrick, Lucille Vivier. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 15 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?