District Appellate Supreme
Federal
North Dakota District Court Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit United States Supreme Court

Richard Brakebill, et al v. Alvin Jaeger
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit, Case No. 18-1725

Tags
Last Updated February 15, 2020 at 10:08 PM EST (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alvin Jaeger, In His Official Capacity As The North Dakota Secretary Of State, Defendant - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Ann Fischer +1 701 328 3621 elifischer@nd.gov
Space James E. Nicolai +1 701 328 3640 jnicolai@nd.gov
No Logo Della Merrick, Plaintiff - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Lee Campbell +1 303 447 8760
Space Jacqueline De Leon +1 303 447 8760
Space Thomas A. Dickson +1 701 222 4400 tdickson@dicksonlaw.com
Space Daniel Lewerenz +1 202 785 4166
Space Joel West Williams +1 202 785 4166 +1 202 822 0068 williams@narf.org
No Logo Dorothy Herman, Plaintiff - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Lee Campbell +1 303 447 8760
Space Jacqueline De Leon +1 303 447 8760
Space Thomas A. Dickson +1 701 222 4400 tdickson@dicksonlaw.com
Space Daniel Lewerenz +1 202 785 4166
Space Joel West Williams +1 202 785 4166 +1 202 822 0068 williams@narf.org
No Logo Elvis Norquay, Plaintiff - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Lee Campbell +1 303 447 8760
Space Jacqueline De Leon +1 303 447 8760
Space Thomas A. Dickson +1 701 222 4400 tdickson@dicksonlaw.com
Space Daniel Lewerenz +1 202 785 4166
Space Joel West Williams +1 202 785 4166 +1 202 822 0068 williams@narf.org
No Logo Lucille Viviier, On Behalf Of Themselves, Plaintiff - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Lee Campbell +1 303 447 8760
Space Jacqueline De Leon +1 303 447 8760
Space Thomas A. Dickson +1 701 222 4400 tdickson@dicksonlaw.com
Space Daniel Lewerenz +1 202 785 4166
Space Joel West Williams +1 202 785 4166 +1 202 822 0068 williams@narf.org
No Logo Ray Norquay, Plaintiff - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Lee Campbell +1 303 447 8760
Space Jacqueline De Leon +1 303 447 8760
Space Thomas A. Dickson +1 701 222 4400 tdickson@dicksonlaw.com
Space Daniel Lewerenz +1 202 785 4166
Space Joel West Williams +1 202 785 4166 +1 202 822 0068 williams@narf.org
No Logo Richard Brakebill, Plaintiff - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Lee Campbell +1 303 447 8760
Space Jacqueline De Leon +1 303 447 8760
Space Thomas A. Dickson +1 701 222 4400 tdickson@dicksonlaw.com
Space Daniel Lewerenz +1 202 785 4166
Space Joel West Williams +1 202 785 4166 +1 202 822 0068 williams@narf.org
Nature of Suit 3441 - Civil Rights: Voting
Case Type Civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.ndd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/iquery.pl?caseNumber=1:16-cv-00008-DLH
Lower Court Case https://ecf.ndd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/iquery.pl?caseNumber=1:16-cv-00008-DLH
  Entries (67) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 00803848476 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None ?
Supreme Court Letter extending time to file cert petition until 12/02/2019. [4844561] [18-1725] (LMT)
    LREF
    Blank 00803801916 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: None ?
    MANDATE ISSUED. [4821612] [18-1725] (LMT)
      LREF
      Blank 00803785591 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None ?
      URL link(s) from court decision attached. [4813936] [18-1725] (LMT)
        LREF
        Blank 00803785583 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None ?
        URL link(s) from court decision attached. [4813931] [18-1725] (LMT)
          LREF
          Blank 00803785576 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None ?
          JUDGMENT FILED - The district court's order of April 3, 2018, granting a preliminary injunction is vacated and the cause is remanded in accordance with the opinion of this court. STEVEN M. COLLOTON, DUANE BENTON and JANE KELLY Hrg Sep 2018 [4813927] [18-1725] (LMT)
            LREF
            Blank 00803785545 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None ?
            OPINION FILED - THE COURT: Steven M. Colloton, Duane Benton and Jane Kelly
            AUTHORING JUDGE:Steven M. Colloton (PUBLISHED),
            DISSENT BY: Jane Kelly [4813914] [18-1725] (LMT)
              LREF
              Blank 00803599230 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None ?
              DOCUMENT FILED - Supreme CourtOrder denying application to vacate the stay entered by the 8th Circuit. Justice Ginsburg, Dissenting [4723544] [18-1725] (SRD)
                LREF
                Blank 00803570197 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None ?
                URL link from the dissent to the court's opinion of September 24, 2018 [4709830] [18-1725]--[Edited 10/02/2018 by SRD] (SRD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 00803567034 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None ?
                  URL link(s) from court decision attached. [4708246] [18-1725] (YML)
                    LREF
                    Blank 00803566934 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None ?
                      LREF
                      Blank 00803564904 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None ?
                      REPLY to response [4704034-2] filed by Appellees Mr. Richard Brakebill, Ms. Dorothy Herman, Mr. Della Merrick, Mr. Elvis Norquay, Mr. Ray Norquay and Ms. Lucille Viviier w/service 09/19/2018. [4707129] [18-1725] (MLC)
                        LREF
                        Blank 00803559636 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None ?
                        Response of Appellees Mr. Richard Brakebill, Ms. Dorothy Herman, Mr. Della Merrick, Mr. Elvis Norquay, Mr. Ray Norquay and Ms. Lucille Viviier to 28(j) citation, [4703627-2], filed by Alvin Jaeger, 28(j) citation, [4703627-3], filed by Alvin Jaeger. w/service 09/13/2018 - FOR CAL [4704608] [18-1725] (MLC)
                          LREF
                          Blank 00803558390 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None ?
                          RESPONSE in opposition to motion [4702636-2], motion [4702636-3] filed by Attorney Mr. James E. Nicolai for Appellant Alvin Jaeger , w/service 09/12/2018. [4704034] [18-1725] (JEN)
                            LREF
                            Blank 00803557527 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None ?
                            28(j) citation filed by Appellant Alvin Jaeger w/service 09/11/2018 - FOR CAL [4703627] [18-1725] (JEN)
                              LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None ?
                              ARGUED & SUBMITTED in Omaha to Judges Steven M. Colloton, Duane Benton, Jane Kelly on 09/10/2018.
                              Mr. James E. Nicolai for Appellant Alvin Jaeger.
                              Mr. Matthew Lee Campbell for Appellees Mr. Richard Brakebill, Ms. Dorothy Herman, Mr. Della Merrick, Mr. Elvis Norquay, Mr. Ray Norquay and Ms. Lucille Viviier.
                              Rebuttal by Mr. James E. Nicolai for Alvin Jaeger.
                              RECORDED. Click Here To Listen to Oral Argument [4703002] [18-1725] (TAB)
                                LREF
                                Blank 00803555413 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None ?
                                MOTION to strike previously filed reply, Doc. No. [4701639-2], And RESPONSE to reply , [4701639-2], filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew Lee Campbell for Appellees Mr. Richard Brakebill, Ms. Dorothy Herman, Mr. Della Merrick, Mr. Elvis Norquay, Mr. Ray Norquay and Ms. Lucille Viviier w/service 09/07/2018. [4702636] [18-1725] (MLC)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 00803554529 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None ?
                                  28(j) citation filed by Appellant Alvin Jaeger w/service 09/07/2018 - FOR CAL [4702242] [18-1725] (JEN)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 00803553202 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None ?
                                    REPLY to response [4698494-2] filed by Appellant Alvin Jaeger w/service 09/05/2018. [4701639] [18-1725] (JEN)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 00803552862 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None ?
                                      ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Mr. Matthew Lee Campbell for Mr. Richard Brakebill, Ms. Dorothy Herman, Mr. Della Merrick, Mr. Elvis Norquay, Mr. Ray Norquay and Ms. Lucille Viviier for argument in September, at the Special Session in Omaha, Nebraska. [4701493] [18-1725] (MLC)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 00803552831 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None ?
                                        JUDGE ORDER: [4701178-2] Hrg Sep 2018 [4701481] [18-1725]
                                        Appellant's motion for leave to file an overlength reply is denied. Appellant may have until September 6, 2018, to file a reply that complies with the length limit of FRAP 27. (SRD)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 00803552765 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None ?
                                          ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Mr. James E. Nicolai for Alvin Jaeger for argument in September, at the Special Session in Omaha, Nebraska. [4701461] [18-1725] (JEN)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None ?
                                            SET FOR ARGUMENT - CASE PLACED ON CALENDAR - for Special Session in Omaha at the Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse on Monday, September 10, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. To be heard before Judges Steven M. Colloton, Duane Benton and Jane Kelly in Division I, Court of Appeals Courtroom, 4th Floor. The courtroom deputy will be Susan Duenow. All attorneys presenting oral argument must complete a Response Form. Click Here to Complete the Oral Argument Response Form. Click Here for the Complete Calendar
                                            PLEASE REVIEW THE ENTIRE CALENDAR CAREFULLY, PARTICULARLY THE COUNSEL NOTICE PAGE. If you are appointed counsel under the Criminal Justice Act and require airline transportation to oral argument, the court will issue a travel authorization the next business day. [4701432] [18-1725] (TAB)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 00803552490 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                              JUDGE ORDER: On the court's own motion, this case is set for oral argument in Omaha, Nebraska on Monday, September 10, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. The hearing panel will consist of Judges Colloton, Benton, and Kelly. Counsel are allotted twenty (20) minutes per side for oral argument. Counsel presenting oral argument should report to the Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 S. 18th Plaza, Court of Appeals Courtroom on the 4th Floor, at least 30 minutes before Court convenes. Hrg Sep 2018 [4701331] [18-1725] (TAB)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 00803552151 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                MOTION to file an overlength brief, filed by Attorney Mr. James E. Nicolai for Appellant Alvin Jaeger w/service 09/04/2018. [4701178] [18-1725] (JEN)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 00803552129 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                  EXHIBITS to REPLY [4698494-2] filed by Appellant Alvin Jaeger w/service 09/04/2018. [4701176] [18-1725]--[Edited 09/05/2018 by LMT] (JEN)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 00803552109 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                    REPLY to response [4698494-2] filed by Appellant Alvin Jaeger w/service 09/04/2018. [4701169] [18-1725] (JEN)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 00803546453 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                      RESPONSE in opposition to motion [4694624-2] filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew Lee Campbell for Appellees Mr. Richard Brakebill, Ms. Dorothy Herman, Mr. Della Merrick, Mr. Elvis Norquay, Mr. Ray Norquay and Ms. Lucille Viviier , w/service 08/27/2018. [4698494] [18-1725] (MLC)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 00803538503 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                        MOTION for stay, filed by Attorney Mr. James E. Nicolai for Appellant Alvin Jaeger w/service 08/16/2018. [4694624] [18-1725] (JEN)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                          Paper copies Reply brief, [4683480-2] filed by Alvin Jaeger 10 paper copies received.
                                                          [4685689] [18-1725] (LMT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 00803515338 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                            BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF filed by Alvin Jaeger. w/service 07/16/2018 , Length: 6476 words
                                                            10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF HEADER FROM Alvin Jaeger due 07/23/2018 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs
                                                            [4683480] [18-1725] (LMT)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 00803514242 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                              REPLY brief of Alvin Jaeger submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4682907] [18-1725] (JEN)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                Paper copies Appellee/Respondent brief, [4678343-2] filed by Mr. Richard Brakebill, Ms. Dorothy Herman, Mr. Della Merrick, Mr. Elvis Norquay, Mr. Ray Norquay and Ms. Lucille Viviier 10 paper copies received.
                                                                [4679616] [18-1725] (LMT)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                  RECORD FILED - APLEE/RES APPENDIX, 1 volumes, Comments: 3 copies, Source Location: St. Louis
                                                                  [4679069] [18-1725] (LMT)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 00803504427 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                    BRIEF FILED - APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Richard Brakebill, Ms. Dorothy Herman, Mr. Della Merrick, Mr. Elvis Norquay, Mr. Ray Norquay and Ms. Lucille Viviier, w/service 07/02/2018 , Length: 12994 words
                                                                    10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF HEADER FROM Richard Brakebill, et al. due 07/09/2018 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs
                                                                    . Reply brief of Alvin Jaeger due on 07/16/2018. [4678343] [18-1725] (LMT)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 00803504355 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                      APPELLEE brief of Mr. Richard Brakebill, Ms. Dorothy Herman, Mr. Della Merrick, Mr. Elvis Norquay, Mr. Ray Norquay, Ms. Lucille Viviier and Alvin Jaeger submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4678311] [18-1725] (MLC)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 00803504316 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                        Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Matthew Lee Campbell for Appellees Mr. Richard Brakebill, Ms. Dorothy Herman, Mr. Della Merrick, Mr. Elvis Norquay, Mr. Ray Norquay and Ms. Lucille Viviier. [4678295] [18-1725] (LMT)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 00803503805 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                          APPELLEE brief of Mr. Richard Brakebill, Ms. Dorothy Herman, Mr. Della Merrick, Mr. Elvis Norquay, Mr. Ray Norquay and Ms. Lucille Viviier submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4678029] [18-1725] (MLC)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 00803498815 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                            APPEARANCE filed by Daniel D. Lewerenz for Appellees Mr. Richard Brakebill, Ms. Dorothy Herman, Mr. Della Merrick, Mr. Elvis Norquay, Mr. Ray Norquay and Ms. Lucille Viviier w/service 06/25/2018 [4675593] [18-1725] (DL)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 00803489109 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 00803485953 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                REPLY to response [4668426-2] filed by Appellant Alvin Jaeger w/service 06/05/2018. [4669451] [18-1725] (JEN)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                  RECORD FILED - APLNT/PET APPENDIX, 1 volumes, Comments: 3 copies, Source Location: St. Louis
                                                                                  [4669544] [18-1725] (LMT)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    Paper copies Appellant/Petitioner Brief, [4667021-2] filed by Alvin Jaeger 10 paper copies received. w/Addendum attached
                                                                                    [4669534] [18-1725] (LMT)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 00803483927 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      RESPONSE in opposition to motion for stay [4662402-2] filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew Lee Campbell for Appellees Mr. Richard Brakebill, Ms. Dorothy Herman, Mr. Della Merrick, Mr. Elvis Norquay, Mr. Ray Norquay and Ms. Lucille Viviier , w/service 06/01/2018. [4668426] [18-1725] (MLC)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 00803480861 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Alvin Jaeger. w/service 05/30/2018 , Length: 12704 words
                                                                                        10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF HEADER FROM Alvin Jaeger due 06/04/2018 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs
                                                                                        . Brief of Richard Brakebill, Dorothy Herman, Della Merrick, Elvis Norquay, Ray Norquay and Lucille Viviier due on 06/29/2018 [4667021] [18-1725] (LMT)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 00803480822 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Alvin Jaeger , w/service 05/30/2018 [4667007] [18-1725] (LMT)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 00803480741 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            APPELLANT brief of Alvin Jaeger submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4666969] [18-1725] (JEN)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 00803480638 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                              Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. James E. Nicolai for Appellant Alvin Jaeger. [4666916] [18-1725] (LMT)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 00803480601 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Alvin Jaeger. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4666908] [18-1725] (JEN)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 00803480566 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  Addendum deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. James E. Nicolai for Appellant Alvin Jaeger. New electronic copy of addendum due on 06/04/2018 [4666889] [18-1725] (LMT)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 00803480203 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                    APPELLANT brief of Alvin Jaeger submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4666705] [18-1725] (JEN)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 00803471479 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                      MOTION for stay, filed by Appellant Alvin Jaeger w/service 05/02/2018. [4662402] [18-1725] - Accepted overlength per order dated 5/16/2018. (LMT)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 00803471406 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                        JUDGE ORDER: The appellant's motion for leave to file an overlength motion for stay pending appeal has been considered by the court and is granted. The appellees' motion for leave to file an overlength response of equal length is granted. The appellees' motion for an extension of time until June 1, 2018, to file a response to the motion for stay is also granted. [4658958-2] [4658958-3] [4657360-2] [4658958-4] Adp May 2018 [4662359] [18-1725] (LMT)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 00803465876 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                          REPLY to response [4659382-2], motion [4658958-2], motion [4658958-3], motion [4658958-4] filed by Appellees Mr. Richard Brakebill, Ms. Dorothy Herman, Mr. Della Merrick, Mr. Elvis Norquay, Mr. Ray Norquay and Ms. Lucille Viviier w/service 05/09/2018. [4659789] [18-1725] (MLC)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 00803465086 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                            RESPONSE in opposition to motion for extension of time to file a response [4658958-2], motion for miscellaneous relief [4658958-3], motion And Response [4658958-4] filed by Attorney Mr. James E. Nicolai for Appellant Alvin Jaeger , w/service 05/08/2018. [4659382] [18-1725] (JEN)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 00803464961 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                              RESPONSE in opposition to motion [4658958-2], motion [4658958-3], motion [4658958-4] filed by Attorney Mr. James E. Nicolai for Appellant Alvin Jaeger , w/service 05/08/2018. [4659337] [18-1725] Document inadvertently sent with typo. Counsel to resubmit without typo.--[Edited 05/08/2018 by LMT] (JEN)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 00803464802 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                APPEARANCE filed by Richard de Bodo for Appellees Mr. Richard Brakebill, Ms. Dorothy Herman, Mr. Della Merrick, Mr. Elvis Norquay, Mr. Ray Norquay and Ms. Lucille Viviier w/service 05/08/2018 [4659273] [18-1725] (RD)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 00803464147 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                  MOTION for extension of time to file response to motion for stay, [4657384-2], , motion to file an overlength response, [4657360-2], until 06/01/2018, to file an overlength response of 11,345, And RESPONSE to motion for stay , [4657384-2], motion to file an overlength response , [4657360-2], filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew Lee Campbell for Appellees Mr. Richard Brakebill, Ms. Dorothy Herman, Mr. Della Merrick, Mr. Elvis Norquay, Mr. Ray Norquay and Ms. Lucille Viviier w/service 05/07/2018. [4658958] [18-1725]--[Edited 05/08/2018 by LMT] (MLC)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 00803461978 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                    APPEARANCE filed by Jacqueline De Leon for Appellees Mr. Richard Brakebill, Ms. Dorothy Herman, Mr. Della Merrick, Mr. Elvis Norquay, Mr. Ray Norquay and Ms. Lucille Viviier w/service 05/03/2018 [4657943] [18-1725] (JD)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 00803460953 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                      MOTION for stay, filed by Attorney Mr. James E. Nicolai for Appellant Alvin Jaeger w/service 05/02/2018. [4657384] [18-1725] MOTION HELD FOR RULING ON MOTION TO FILE IT OVERLENGTH - ( SEE ORDER OF 5/16/2018 GRANTING MOTION TO FILE IT OVERLENGTH AND MOTION FILED ENTRY OF 5/16/2018)--[Edited 05/16/2018 by LMT] (JEN)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 00803460909 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                        MOTION to file an overlength motion filed by Attorney Mr. James E. Nicolai for Appellant Alvin Jaeger w/service 05/02/2018. [4657360] [18-1725]--[Edited 05/02/2018 by LMT] (JEN)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 00803452111 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                          APPEARANCE filed by Thomas A. Dickson for Appellees Mr. Richard Brakebill, Ms. Dorothy Herman, Mr. Della Merrick, Mr. Elvis Norquay, Mr. Ray Norquay and Ms. Lucille Viviier w/service 04/23/2018 [4653170] [18-1725] (TAD)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 00803445298 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                            APPEARANCE filed by Joel William West Williams for Appellees Mr. Richard Brakebill, Ms. Dorothy Herman, Mr. Della Merrick, Mr. Elvis Norquay, Mr. Ray Norquay, Ms. Lucille Viviier and Appellant Alvin Jaeger w/service 04/13/2018 [4649843] [18-1725] (JWW)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 00803442971 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                              APPEARANCE filed by James E. Nicolai for Appellant Alvin Jaeger w/service 04/11/2018 [4648720] [18-1725] (JEN)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 00803442492 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                APPEARANCE filed by Matthew Campbell for Appellees Mr. Richard Brakebill, Ms. Dorothy Herman, Mr. Della Merrick, Mr. Elvis Norquay, Mr. Ray Norquay and Ms. Lucille Viviier w/service 04/10/2018 [4648483] [18-1725] (MLC)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 00803440469 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                  BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS:
                                                                                                                                  Transcript due on or before 05/16/2018. Appendix due 05/29/2018. BRIEF APPELLANT, Alvin Jaeger due 05/29/2018
                                                                                                                                  Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant.
                                                                                                                                  Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4647506] [18-1725] (JMM)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 00803440472 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                    Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, order filed 04/03/18, and docket entries. [4647505] [18-1725] (JMM)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 00803440462 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                      Civil case docketed. [4647501] [18-1725] (JMM)
                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 86 times.

                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?