Somani v. Tesla, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:20-cv-00391-B
District Judge Jane J. Boyle, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 18, 2020 at 1:35 PM DT (9.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hameeda Somani, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bowman and Brooke LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan Scott Jones +1 972 616 1700 +1 972 616 1701 ryan.jones@bowmanandbrooke.com
Office Dallas
Filed 2/18/2020
Jury Demand Both
Demand $9999000
Nature of Suit 195 - Contract Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Anderson
Terminated
Origin 2
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case B-44[District Court of Dallas County, Texas]
Defendant Custody Status
Flag JURY
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: 5/1/2020 OrderCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER: This case is dismissed with prejudice. See Doc. 12. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/1/2020) (chmb)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: 4/30/2020 Notice - other
    NOTICE of Dismissal with Prejudice as to all claims against Defendant, Tesla Inc., d/b/a Tesla Motors, Inc filed by Hameeda Somani (Mott, Adam)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 11 Filed: 3/23/2020, Entered: 3/23/2020 OrderCourt Filing
      ELECTRONIC ORDER: The parties have settled the case. See Doc. 10. It is hereby ORDERED that dismissal papers are due by May 23, 2020. The Clerk is directed to administratively close this case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 3/23/2020) (chmb)
        LREF
        Blank  terminated case
        Civil Case Terminated per [11] Order. (mla)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: 3/20/2020, Terminated: 3/23/2020 Motion to vacate
          First MOTION to Vacate Deadlines and Notice of Settlement filed by Hameeda Somani (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Order re: Notice of Settlement and Motion to Vacate Deadlines) (Mott, Adam)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: 3/20/2020 Notice of Attorney Appearance
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam C Mott on behalf of Hameeda Somani. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Mott, Adam)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: 3/11/2020 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [7] Motion to Continue. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties' joint status report is now due 3/25/2020, and mandatory initial disclosures 4/3/2020. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 3/11/2020) (chmb)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020, Terminated: 3/11/2020 Motion to Continue
                MOTION to Continue filed by Tesla Inc (Jones, Ryan)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                  ELECTRONIC ORDER denying [5] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adam Mott. The order is DENIED without prejudice. Local Rule 83.10 requires there to be local counsel in a case. Local counsel means a member of the bar of this Court who resides or maintains the attorney's principal office in this district and whose residence or principal office is located within 50 miles of this courthouse. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 2/28/2020) (chmb)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020, Terminated: 2/28/2020 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                    Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10659685) filed by Hameeda Somani (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Attorney Certificate of Good Standing, # (2) Proposed Order Attorney PHV Proposed Order) (Mott, Adam)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: 2/19/2020 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                      STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 3/11/2020. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 2/19/2020) (svc)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: 2/19/2020 Judge BoyleCourt Filing
                        New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cdt)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: 2/18/2020 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
                          CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tesla Motors, Inc., Tesla, Inc.. (Jones, Ryan)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: 2/18/2020 notice of removalCourt Filing
                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from B-44th Judicial District Court, Dallas County, case number DC-20-00397 filed by Tesla Motors, Inc., Tesla, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10630649) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) 1, # (2) Exhibit(s) 2, # (3) Exhibit(s) 3, # (4) Cover Sheet, # (5) Cover Sheet Supplement) (Jones, Ryan)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 16 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?