State v. Wong, Brian
State Civil Lawsuit District Court of Travis County, Texas, Case No. D-1-DC-19-300030

Tags
Last Updated February 19, 2020 at 3:45 PM ST (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo State of Texas, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Wong, Brian, Defendant
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None
SIGNED ORDER
    Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None
    MTN:MOTION
      Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None
      SIGNED ORDER
        Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None
        MTN:MOTION
          Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/27/2019, Entered: None
          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL
            Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None
            SURETY BOND
              Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None
              WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED
                Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None
                INDICTMENT 390TH GRAND JURY
                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None
                  APPLICATION FOR SUBPOENA
                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None
                    APPLICATION FOR SUBPOENA
                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None
                      AFFIDAVIT OF WARRANT OF ARREST
                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None
                        MUNICIPAL WARRANT

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 235 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?