City of Costa Mesa et al v. United States of America et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:20-cv-00368-JLS-JDE
District Judge Josephine L. Staton, presiding

Tags
Last Updated February 22, 2020 at 3:53 PM ST (1.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo City of Costa Mesa, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nahal Kazemi +1 949 476 8700 +1 949 476 0900 nkazemi@kelleranderle.com

Toggle Switch Represented by kelleranderle.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer L Keller +1 949 476 8700 +1 949 476 0900 jkeller@kelleranderle.com
No Logo Katrina Foley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by kelleranderle.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nahal Kazemi +1 949 476 8700 +1 949 476 0900 nkazemi@kelleranderle.com
Space Jennifer L Keller +1 949 476 8700 +1 949 476 0900 jkeller@kelleranderle.com
v.
No Logo Fairview Developmental Center, Defendant
No Logo The California Department of General Services, Defendant
No Logo The California Governors Office of Emergency Services, Defendant
Centers For Disease Control And Prevention Centers For Disease Control And Prevention, Defendant
Officially listed as "The Centers for Disease Control and Prevention"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel A Beck +1 213 894 2574 +1 213 894 7819 daniel.beck@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Defendant
Officially listed as "The Department of Health and Human Services"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel A Beck +1 213 894 2574 +1 213 894 7819 daniel.beck@usdoj.gov
No Logo State of California, Defendant
Officially listed as "The State of California"
No Logo United States Air Force, Defendant
Officially listed as "The United States Air Force"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel A Beck +1 213 894 2574 +1 213 894 7819 daniel.beck@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Defense United States Department of Defense, Defendant
Officially listed as "The United States Department of Defense"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel A Beck +1 213 894 2574 +1 213 894 7819 daniel.beck@usdoj.gov
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel A Beck +1 213 894 2574 +1 213 894 7819 daniel.beck@usdoj.gov
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/22/2020, Entered: 2/22/2020 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff City of Costa Mesa, re Order,,, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines,, [9] served on February 21, 2020. (Keller, Jennifer)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: 2/21/2020 OrderCourt Filing
    TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER and Order Setting Expedited Hearing, Notice of Hearing by Judge Josephine L. Staton re Amended APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Relocation of Coronavirus Patients [4], APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Relocation of Coronavirus Patients [1]. Opposition due no later than Sunday, 2/23/2020 @ 12:00 PM, Expedited Hearing set for 2/24/2020 @ 2:00 PM in Courtroom 10A before Judge Josephine L. Staton. Plainiffs are ORDERED to serve this Temporary Restraining Order and this notice of Hearing on all Defendants FORTHWITH. (dgo)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: 2/21/2020 Notice of Attorney Appearance or Reassignment for the USA
      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Assistant United States Attorney Daniel A. Beck on behalf of Defendant The Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, The Department of Health and Human Services, The United States Air Force, The United States Department of Defense, United States of America. (Attorney Daniel A Beck added to party The Centers for Disease Control and Prevention(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel A Beck added to party The Department of Health and Human Services(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel A Beck added to party The United States Air Force(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel A Beck added to party The United States Department of Defense(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel A Beck added to party United States of America(pty:dft))(Beck, Daniel)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: 2/21/2020 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
        NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff City of Costa Mesa, (Keller, Jennifer)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: 2/21/2020 Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
          CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff City of Costa Mesa. (Keller, Jennifer)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: 2/21/2020 Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form
            NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Relocation of Coronavirus Patients [1]. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): No Case initiating document such as a Complaint or Notice of Removal has been filed. Please e-file documents accordingly. (car)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: 2/21/2020, Terminated: 2/21/2020 Motion for temporary restraining order
              Amended APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Relocation of Coronavirus Patients filed by Plaintiff City of Costa Mesa. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Temporary Restraining Order, # (2) Proposed Order Order to Show Cause re Issuance of Preliminary Injunction, # (3) Declaration of Kim Barlow, # (4) Declaration of Jason Dempsey in Support of Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re Issuance of Preliminary Injunction, # (5) Exhibit to Declaration of Jason Dempsey) (Keller, Jennifer)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: 2/21/2020 Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: 2/21/2020 Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html formCourt Filing
                  NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: 2/21/2020, Terminated: 2/21/2020 Motion for temporary restraining order
                    APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Relocation of Coronavirus Patients filed by Plaintiff City of Costa Mesa. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Nahal Kazemi In Support of Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re Issuance of Preliminary Injunction, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Exhibit 10, # (12) Exhibit 11, # (13) Exhibit 12, # (14) Exhibit 13, # (15) Exhibit 14, # (16) Exhibit 15, # (17) Exhibit 16, # (18) Exhibit 17) (Attorney Jennifer L Keller added to party City of Costa Mesa(pty:pla)) (Keller, Jennifer)[$400 PAID RECEIPT NO ACACDC-25460351] Modified on 2/21/2020 (car).
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 146 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?