Buggs v. Telsa, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG20054661

Tags
Last Updated September 9, 2021 at 12:31 PM DT (1.3 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Buggs, Donald, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Chaudhari, Roshni, Attorney
No Logo Heyne, Laura E., Attorney
No Logo Mcfadden, Maureen E, Attorney
No Logo Ochs, Danielle, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Other Employment
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (88) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 88 Filed: 9/3/2021, Entered: None ?
Case Management Conf Continuance 12/08/2021 03:00 PM D- 514
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/3/2021, Entered: None ?
    Case Management Conference Order Issued (3 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/3/2021, Entered: None ?
      Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (3 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: None ?
        Release of Funds Issued and Filed (3 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/24/2021, Entered: None ?
          Notice of Change of Counsel Within the Same Law Firm Filed (3 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/19/2021, Entered: None ?
            Notice of Change of Lead Attorney Filed for Telsa, Inc. , Tesla, Inc. (3 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/29/2021, Entered: None ?
              Answer to Complaint Filed for Tesla, Inc. (8 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: None ?
                Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) - Dropped (2 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: None ?
                  Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 79 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: None ?
                    Case Management Conf Continuance 09/03/2021 02:00 PM D- 514
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: None ?
                      Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: None ?
                        Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 76 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: None ?
                          Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) 07/14/2021 01:30 PM D- 514
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/2/2021, Entered: None ?
                            Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) - Dropped (2 Pages)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/2/2021, Entered: None ?
                              Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/2/2021, Entered: None ?
                                Motion for Reconsideration Denied (2 Pages)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/2/2021, Entered: None ?
                                  Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: None ?
                                    Supplement to June 25 Status Report Filed (4 Pages)
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: None ?
                                      Pltfs' Arbitration Discovery Status Statement Filed (4 Pages)
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/25/2021, Entered: None ?
                                        Status Report (JOINT) Filed (7 Pages)
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: None ?
                                          Case Management Conference Order Issued (3 Pages)
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: None ?
                                            Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Blank 66 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: None ?
                                              Case Management Conf Continuance 05/20/2021 03:00 PM D- 514
                                                Blank 65 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                Hearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 514 date: 07/02/2021 time: 02:00 PM
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                  Motion for Reconsideration - Motion Rescheduled (2 Pages)
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                    Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued (1 Page)
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                      Hearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 514 date: 07/02/2021 time: 02:00 PM
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                        Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) - Motion Rescheduled (2 Pages)
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                          Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued (1 Page)
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                            Reply & Notice to Strike Untimely Response to Motion for Reconsideration Filed (3 Pages)
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                              Reply /Response RE: Motions Set for May 18, 2021 Filed (4 Pages)
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                Notice of of Appearance Filed (3 Pages)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                  Proposed Order Filed for Telsa, Inc. (3 Pages)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                    Declaration of Jazmyne K. Jefferson in Support of Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration Filed by (90 Pages)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                      Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration Filed (12 Pages)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                        Hearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 514 date: 05/18/2021 time: 03:00 PM
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                          Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) - Motion Rescheduled (2 Pages)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                            Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued (1 Page)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                              Application Re: Extension of Time Granted (2 Pages)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                Declaration in Support of Opposition to Ex Parte Application for Additional Discovery Filed (47 Pages)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                  Opposition to Ex Parte Application for Additional Discovery Filed (7 Pages)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    Application Re: Extension of Time Filed for Donald Buggs - for Discovery Re Motion to Compel Arbitra (6 Pages)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      Declaration in Support of Supplemental Brief Re Motion to Compel Arbitration Filed (3 Pages)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        Brief (Supplemental) Re Motion to Compel Arbitration Filed (3 Pages)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          Supplemental Declarartion of Jazmyne K. Jefferson in Suppport of Supplemental Brief Filed (39 Pages)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            Supplemental Declaration of Wilette Dimaya in Support of Supplemental Brief Filed (20 Pages)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                              Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel Arbitration Filed (9 Pages)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                Case Management Conf Continuance 07/09/2021 02:00 PM D- 514
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                    Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                      Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                        Motion for Reconsideration Hearing Confirmed for 05/18/2021 03:00 PM D- 514
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                          Motion for Reconsideration Filed for Plaintiff (25 Pages)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                            Hearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 514 date: 04/23/2021 time: 02:00 PM
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                              Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) - Motion Rescheduled (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Taken Under Submission (1 Page)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                  Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                    Hearing Reset to Civil Law and Motion 03/03/2021 01:30 PM D- 514
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                      Hearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 514 date: 02/19/2021 time: 02:00 PM
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                        Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) - Motion Rescheduled (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                          Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued (1 Page)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                            Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply to Motion to Compel Arbitration Filed (27 Pages)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                              Objections of Donald Buggs Filed (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defts' Motion to Compel Arbitration Filed (6 Pages)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                  Case Management Conf Continuance 04/06/2021 03:00 PM D- 514
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                    Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                      Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                        Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Hearing Confirmed for 02/16/2021 03:00 PM D- 514
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                          Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Filed for Defendant (93 Pages)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                            Case Management Statement of Telsa, Inc. , Tesla, Inc. Filed (6 Pages)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                              Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                Answer to Complaint Filed for Telsa, Inc. (7 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                  Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 9/28/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                    Case Management Conf Continuance 02/01/2021 03:00 PM D- 514
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/28/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                      Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/28/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                        Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                          Case Management Conf Continuance 09/28/2020 03:00 PM D- 514
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                            Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                              Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                Proof of Service on Complaint As to Telsa, Inc. Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                  Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 06/29/2020 02:00 PM D- 514 (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Administrative Transfer of Case Within County (Same Jurisdiction) to Hayward Hall of Justi
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued (5 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                          Initial Case Management Conference 06/29/2020 09:00 AM D- 16 (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                            Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                              Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Donald Buggs (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                Complaint - Other Employment Filed (Amended) (7 Pages)

                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 200 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?