Jeffrey Lee v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 20CV363746

Tags
Last Updated September 14, 2021 at 5:20 AM DT (1.2 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lee, Jeffrey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julian D. Lopez
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by thetafirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Soheyl Tahsildoost st@thetafirm.com
Case Type Other Contract Unlimited (37)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 30 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None Request Dismissal
Request for Dismissal
    Legal Document 29 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: None Notice-Settlement
    conditional 11-26-20
      Legal Document 28 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
      Case Management Statement
        Legal Document 27 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
        Case Management Statement
          Legal Document 26 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
            Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
            Envelope #: 4778678 - Please attach a caption page for the Proof of Service, or state the case number, county and case name.
              Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: None Motion-Reconsideration
                HRG 10/13/20, 9am, D20
                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None Response/Reply
                  PLAINTIFF???S SUR-REPLY TO TESLA, INC.???S MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION
                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                    to Plaintiff's Sur-Reply to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration
                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                      #04711005 Reply- missing hearing date on caption page.
                        Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Order: Submitted MatterCourt Filing
                        Hearig is continued to 07/28/20 by Judge Manoukian
                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None Response/Reply
                              Reply in support of motion to compel arbitration
                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                Declaration of Jonathan Balce in support of MTC Arb Reply
                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                  to Motion to Compel Arbitration
                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                    of Jeffrey Lee
                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                        re: stipulatin to stay action - GRANTED. The entire action shall be stayed until one week after this Court gives notice of its final ruling on def's motion to compel arbitration - signed by Judge Manoukian
                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None stipulation
                                          to stay action
                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None Motion: Compel Arbitration
                                            Re: AMENDED motion to compel binding arbitration, atty Tahlsidoost, 7/21/2020 9am D20
                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Motion: Compel Arbitration
                                              HRG: 07/21/20, 9AM, D20; Atty: Tahsildoost - Motion to Compel Binding Arbitration
                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                Declaration of Soheyl Tahsildoost in Support
                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                  Declaration of Raymond Kim in support
                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Request-Judicial Notice
                                                    Request for Judicial Notice
                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 74 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?