District Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Central District Court Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  1. Case No. 11-57187
    Filed 12/15/2011
  2. Case No. 14-56444
    Filed 9/4/2014
  3. Case No. 16-55977
    Filed 7/8/2016
United States Supreme Court

Courthouse News Service v. Michael Planet
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 16-55977

Tags
Last Updated February 25, 2020 at 5:35 PM ST (1.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Conference Of Chief Justices, Amicus Curiae,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John C. Eastman +1 877 855 3330
No Logo Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Amicus Curiae,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315
No Logo Courthouse News Service, Plaintiff - Appellee,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Gavin Fetterly +1 415 675 3400
Space Leila Christine Knox +1 415 675 3400 +1 415 675 3434 leila.knox@bryancave.com
Space Rachel Elizabeth Matteo-Boehm +1 415 675 3400
Space Roger Rex Myers +1 415 675 3400
No Logo Michael D. Planet, In His Official Capacity As Court Executive Officer/clerk Of The Ventura County Superior Court, Defendant - Appellant,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nathaniel Garrett
Space Frederick Brevard Hayes +1 310 698 8729
Space Robert A. Naeve
Space Erica L. Reilley
Space Stewart, Craig +1 415 983 1000
Nature of Suit 3440 - Civil Rights: Other
Case Type civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=2:11-cv-08083-SJO-FFM
Lower Court Case https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=2:11-cv-08083-SJO-FFM
  Entries (101) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031607495 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None ?
Filed (ECF) Appellant Michael D. Planet in 16-55977, Appellee Michael D. Planet in 16-56714 Joint Motion to extend time to file a response until 03/06/2020, Motion to extend time to file a reply until 03/20/2020. Date of service: 02/18/2020. [11600904] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Reilley, Erica)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031602922 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None ?
    Filed (ECF) Appellee Courthouse News Service Motion for attorney fees in the amount of $1,893,087.11. Date of service: 02/14/2020. [11598836] [16-55977] --[COURT UPDATE: Spread to case 16-56714. 2/18/2020 by TYL] (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031584766 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None ?
      MANDATE ISSUED.(KMW, NRS and MHM) [11590703] [16-55977, 16-56714] (QDL)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031530306 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None ?Court Filing
        FILED OPINION (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, N. RANDY SMITH and MARY H. MURGUIA) Each side shall bear its own costs. AFFIRMED IN PART; REVERSED IN PART; and REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. Judge: KMW Authoring, Judge: NRS Concurring. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [11565688] [16-55977, 16-56714] --[Edited: Typo corrected. 01/22/2020 by TYL] (AKM)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031385186 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None ?
          Filed (ECF) Appellee Courthouse News Service in 16-55977, Appellant Courthouse News Service in 16-56714 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 11/15/2019. [11500913] [16-55977, 16-56714] --[COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [96].] (SLM)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank  Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None ?
            COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [97]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Appellee Courthouse News Service in 16-55977, Appellant Courthouse News Service in 16-56714 Correspondence: FRAP 28(j) response to Appellant/Cross-Appellee's 11/12/2019 letter to court. Date of service: 11/15/2019 [11500867] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031373944 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None ?
              Filed (ECF) Appellant Michael D. Planet in 16-55977, Appellee Michael D. Planet in 16-56714 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 11/12/2019. [11495994] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Naeve, Robert)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031320355 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                Filed (ECF) Appellee Courthouse News Service in 16-55977, Appellant Courthouse News Service in 16-56714 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 10/21/2019. [11471629] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031307854 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None ?
                  Filed (ECF) Appellant Michael D. Planet in 16-55977, Appellee Michael D. Planet in 16-56714 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 10/16/2019. [11465805] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Naeve, Robert)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                    Terminated participation of Court Reporter Carol Zurborg in this case (Former CTR, inactive filing account). [11458936] [16-55977, 16-56714] (ASW)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009030506527 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None ?
                      Filed (ECF) Appellee Courthouse News Service in 16-55977, Appellant Courthouse News Service in 16-56714 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 11/19/2018. [11093321] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009030498340 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None ?
                        Filed (ECF) Appellant Michael D. Planet in 16-55977, Appellee Michael D. Planet in 16-56714 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 11/15/2018. [11089449] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Naeve, Robert)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009030273236 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None ?
                          Filed (ECF) Appellant Michael D. Planet in 16-55977, Appellee Michael D. Planet in 16-56714 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 08/21/2018. [10984330] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Naeve, Robert)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009030144906 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None ?
                            Filed Audio recording of oral argument.
                            Note: Video recordings of public argument calendars are available on the Court's website, at http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/media/
                            [10927938] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Witt, Dusty)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None ?
                              ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, N. RANDY SMITH and MARY H. MURGUIA. [10926180] [16-55977, 16-56714]--[Edited 06/28/2018 by DJW] (Witt, Dusty)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009030101700 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None ?
                                Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Ms. Caitlin Vogus for Amicus Curiae Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press in 16-55977, 16-56714. [10909213] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Vogus, Caitlin)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009030074877 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None ?
                                  Filed (ECF) Appellee Courthouse News Service in 16-55977, Appellant Courthouse News Service in 16-56714 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/05/2018. [10897212] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009030059324 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None ?
                                    Filed order (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, N. RANDY SMITH and MARY H. MURGUIA) The motion of amici curiae Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 27 Media Organizations to participate in oral argument is GRANTED. Amici will be allotted five minutes of argument time ceded by Courthouse News Service. IT IS SO ORDERED. [10890212] [16-55977, 16-56714] (OC)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009030056661 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None ?
                                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Michael D. Planet in 16-55977, Appellee Michael D. Planet in 16-56714 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/30/2018. [10889095] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Naeve, Robert)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009030046318 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None ?
                                        Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press in 16-55977, 16-56714 Motion for miscellaneous relief [Unopposed Motion of Amici Curiae The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 27 Media Organizations for Leave to Participate in Oral Argument]. Date of service: 05/24/2018. [10884633] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Vogus, Caitlin)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None ?
                                          Attorney Bruce D. Brown substituted by Attorney Caitlin Vogus. [10884287] [16-55977, 16-56714] (RL)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009030045316 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None ?
                                            Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Caitlin Vogus for Amicus Curiae Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press in 16-55977, 16-56714. Date of service: 05/24/2018. [10884168] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Vogus, Caitlin)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029979504 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None ?
                                              Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Ms. Rachel Elizabeth Matteo-Boehm for Appellee Courthouse News Service in 16-55977, Attorney Ms. Rachel Elizabeth Matteo-Boehm for Appellant Courthouse News Service in 16-56714. [10855409] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029976762 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Robert A. Naeve, Esquire for Appellant Michael D. Planet in 16-55977, Attorney Robert A. Naeve, Esquire for Appellee Michael D. Planet in 16-56714. [10854299] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Naeve, Robert)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank  Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                  Notice of Oral Argument on Thursday, June 28, 2018 - 10:00 A.M. - Courtroom 1 - Pasadena CA.

                                                  View the Oral Argument Calendar for your case here.

                                                  Be sure to review the GUIDELINES for important information about your hearing, including when to arrive (30 minutes before the hearing time) and when and how to submit additional citations (filing electronically as far in advance of the hearing as possible).

                                                  When you have reviewed the calendar, download the ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form, complete the form, and file it via Appellate ECF or return the completed form to: PASADENA Office.
                                                  [10854209] [16-55977, 16-56714] (AW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029939279 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                    Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AF): The court has received and considered the request for rescheduling of oral argument in these appeals, and the opposition thereto. While the court is willing to, and regularly does, accommodate the reasonable requests of counsel for rescheduling, it is unable to do so in these appeals given the existing demands for the remainder of calendar year 2018. These consolidated appeals were specially calendared, as counsel has acknowledged, and it appears that other counsel of record will ably handle oral argument. Accordingly, the request to reschedule oral argument is denied. IT IS SO ORDERED. [10837797] [16-55977, 16-56714, 17-56331] (AF)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029913568 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellee Courthouse News Service in 16-55977, Appellant Courthouse News Service in 16-56714 Correspondence: Response to 4/5/18 letter to court from counsel for Michael Planet requesting a rescheduling of oral argument. Date of service: 04/05/2018 [10826395] [16-55977, 16-56714] --[COURT UPDATE: Attached searchable version of correspondence. 4/5/2018 by TYL] (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029912510 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellant Michael D. Planet in 16-55977, Appellee Michael D. Planet in 16-56714 Correspondence: Jones Day letter to Ninth Circuit regarding hearing date. Date of service: 04/05/2018 [10825900] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Naeve, Robert)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029900178 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                          Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: OC): Oral argument will be held at 10:00 a.m. on Thursday, June 28, 2018, in Courtroom 1 of the Richard H. Chambers Courthouse, located at 125 South Grand Avenue in Pasadena, California 91105. http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/information/locations.php Courthouse News Service v. Planet, No. 16-55977 will be heard before Courthouse News Service v. Yamasaki, No. 17-56331. Planet will have twenty minutes per side and Yamasaki will have fifteen minutes per side. [10820535] [16-55977, 16-56714, 17-56331] (OC)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029798263 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellee Courthouse News Service in 16-55977, Appellant Courthouse News Service in 16-56714 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/23/2018. [10775568] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank  Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                              Terminated Jaclyn Briana Stahl for Michael D. Planet in 16-55977 and Michael D. Planet in 16-56714 [10715336] [16-55977, 16-56714] (RR)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029661467 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellant Michael D. Planet in 16-55977, Appellee Michael D. Planet in 16-56714 Correspondence: Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Date of service: 01/05/2018. [10714505] [16-55977, 16-56714]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 01/05/2018 by SLM] (Stahl, Jaclyn)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029596050 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029526592 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellee Courthouse News Service in 16-55977, Appellant Courthouse News Service in 16-56714 Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion of Courthouse News Service to Expedite Setting of Argument and/or Submission or For Other Appropriate Relief]. Date of service: 11/15/2017. [10654676] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank  Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                      Received 7 paper copies of Supplemental Brief [65] filed by Courthouse News Service in 16-55977, 16-56714. [10632691] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Sent to Panel) (RG)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029473540 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                        Filed clerk order: The supplemental brief (sur-reply) [65] submitted by Courthouse News Service is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: tan. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10631499] [16-55977, 16-56714] (SML)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029472702 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                          Submitted (ECF) Supplemental Brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Courthouse News Service in 16-55977, Appellant Courthouse News Service in 16-56714. Date of service: 10/25/2017. [10631109] [16-55977, 16-56714] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct brief type. 10/25/2017 by TYL] (Myers, Roger)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029431102 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                            Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: OC): The motion of Courthouse News Service to file a sur-reply is GRANTED. Courthouse News Service may file a sur-reply of no more than 1,000 words within 14 days of the date of this order. The sur-reply shall be limited to addressing the arguments about the Yamasaki Order made by Michael Planet in his consolidated response/reply brief. IT IS SO ORDERED. [10612784] [16-55977, 16-56714] (OC)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank  Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                              Received 7 paper copies of Cross-Appeal Reply Brief [61] filed by Courthouse News Service in 16-55977, 16-56714. [10582222] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Sent to Panel) (RG)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029358762 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                Filed clerk order: The cross-appeal reply brief [61] submitted by Courthouse News Service is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10580746] [16-55977, 16-56714] (GV)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029357858 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                  Submitted (ECF) Cross-Appeal Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Courthouse News Service in 16-55977, Appellant Courthouse News Service in 16-56714. Date of service: 09/13/2017. [10580391] [16-55977, 16-56714] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct brief type. 9/14/2017 by TYL] (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029353643 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellee Courthouse News Service in 16-55977, Appellant Courthouse News Service in 16-56714 reply to response (motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies), ). Date of service: 09/12/2017. [10578565] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029350085 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Michael D. Planet in 16-55977, Appellee Michael D. Planet in 16-56714 response to motion ([58] Motion (ECF Filing), [58] Motion (ECF Filing) motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies)). Date of service: 09/11/2017. [10577012] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Naeve, Robert)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029340265 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellee Courthouse News Service in 16-55977, Appellant Courthouse News Service in 16-56714 Motion for miscellaneous relief [File Sur-Reply to Respond to Newly-Decided Authority Relied on by Defendant Appellant/Cross-Appellee]. Date of service: 09/07/2017. [10572750] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          Received 7 paper copies of Third Brief on Cross-Appeal [55] filed by Michael D. Planet in 16-55977, 16-56714. [10568845] [16-55977, 16-56714]--[Edited 09/05/2017 by RG] (Sent to Panel) (RG)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029323710 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            Filed clerk order: The third brief on cross-appeal [55] submitted by Michael D. Planet is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: yellow. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10565381] [16-55977, 16-56714] (GV)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029322697 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                              Submitted (ECF) Third Brief on Cross-Appeal for review. Submitted by Appellant Michael D. Planet in 16-55977. Date of service: 08/30/2017. [10564946] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Naeve, Robert)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029224480 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029211888 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellee Courthouse News Service in 16-55977, Appellant Courthouse News Service in 16-56714 response opposing motion ([50] Motion (ECF Filing), [50] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief). Date of service: 07/20/2017. [10515595] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                    Added attorney Craig Stewart for Michael D. Plane. [10514216] [16-55977, 16-56714] (RL)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029209098 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Craig E. Stewart for Appellant Michael D. Planet in 16-55977, Appellee Michael D. Planet in 16-56714. Date of service: 07/19/2017. [10514206] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Stewart, Craig)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029209042 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellant Michael D. Planet in 16-55977, Appellee Michael D. Planet in 16-56714 Motion to extend time to file Reply brief until 09/29/2017. Date of service: 07/19/2017. [10514178] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Naeve, Robert)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                          Received 7 paper copies of Amicus Brief [44] filed by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 27 Media Organizations (sent to panel). [10504342] [16-55977, 16-56714] (DB)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                            Received 7 paper copies of Second Brief on Cross-Appeal [37] filed by Courthouse News Service (sent to panel). [10503806] [16-55977, 16-56714] (DB)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                              Filed four paper copies of supplemental excerpts of record [38] in 20 volume(s) filed by Appellee-Cross-Appellant. [10503519] [16-55977, 16-56714] (GV)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029180515 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [44] submitted by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 27 Media Organizations is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10501316] [16-55977, 16-56714] (GV)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                  Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 27 Media Organizations. [10501302] [16-55977, 16-56714] (GV)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029180175 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                    Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 27 Media Organizations In Support of Plaintiff-Appellee. Date of service: 07/07/2017. [10501168] [16-55977, 16-56714]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. 07/10/2017 by SLM] (Brown, Bruce)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029166379 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                      Filed clerk order: The second brief on cross-appeal [37] submitted by Courthouse News Service is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [38] submitted by Courthouse News Service. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [10495008] [16-55977, 16-56714] (GV)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                        COURT DELETED INCORRECT/DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [38]. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellee Courthouse News Service in 16-55977, Appellant Courthouse News Service in 16-56714. Date of service: 06/30/2017. [10494280] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                          COURT DELETED INCORRECT/DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [38]. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellee Courthouse News Service in 16-55977, Appellant Courthouse News Service in 16-56714. Date of service: 06/30/2017. [10494269] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                            COURT DELETED INCORRECT/DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [38]. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellee Courthouse News Service in 16-55977, Appellant Courthouse News Service in 16-56714. Date of service: 06/30/2017. [10494253] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                              COURT DELETED INCORRECT/DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [38]. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellee Courthouse News Service in 16-55977, Appellant Courthouse News Service in 16-56714. Date of service: 06/30/2017. [10494242] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029164366 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellee Courthouse News Service in 16-55977, Appellant Courthouse News Service in 16-56714. Date of service: 06/30/2017. [10494233] [16-55977, 16-56714]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached excrepts of record, volumes 4-20 and certificat ef service. 06/30/2017 by SLM] (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029164303 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                  Submitted (ECF) Second Brief on Cross-Appeal for review. Submitted by Appellee Courthouse News Service in 16-55977, Appellant Courthouse News Service in 16-56714. Date of service: 06/30/2017. [10494222] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029098235 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029093086 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellee Courthouse News Service in 16-55977, Appellant Courthouse News Service in 16-56714 Motion to extend time to file Second Brief on Cross-Appeal until 06/23/2017. Date of service: 06/06/2017. [10461473] [16-55977, 16-56714]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect correct relief. 06/06/2017 by RY] (Fetterly, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                        Streamlined request [33] by Appellee Courthouse News Service in 16-55977, Appellant Courthouse News Service in 16-56714 to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Second brief on cross-appeal due 06/14/2017 for Courthouse News Service. Third brief on cross-appeal due 07/14/2017 for Michael D. Planet. The optional reply cross-appeal brief is due 14 days from the date of service of the third brief on cross-appeal. [10441441] [16-55977, 16-56714] (JN)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Second Brief on Cross-Appeal by Appellee Courthouse News Service in 16-55977, Appellant Courthouse News Service in 16-56714. New requested due date is 06/14/2017. [10435634] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                            Received 7 paper copies of Amicus Brief [28] filed by Conference of Chief Justices in 16-55977. [10421831] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Sent to Panel) (RG)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                              Filed four paper copies of excerpts of record [25] in 7 volume(s) filed by Appellant Michael D. Planet. [10417780] [16-55977, 16-56714] (sent to panel) (GV)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028994840 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [28] submitted by Conference of Chief Justices is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10417297] [16-55977, 16-56714] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                  Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Conference of Chief Justices. [10417292] [16-55977, 16-56714] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028994207 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                    Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Conference of Chief Justices. Date of service: 05/01/2017. [10417037] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Eastman, John)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                      Received 7 paper copies of Opening Brief [24] filed by Michael D. Planet (sent to panel). [10417020] [16-55977, 16-56714] (DB)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028977831 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                        Filed clerk order: The opening brief [24] submitted by Michael D. Planet, et al., is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [25] submitted by Michael D. Planet, et al. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [10409596] [16-55977, 16-56714] Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [10409596] [16-55977, 16-56714] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028976995 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                          Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Michael D. Planet in 16-55977. Date of service: 04/24/2017. [10409194] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Naeve, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028976887 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                            Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Michael D. Planet in 16-55977. Date of service: 04/24/2017. [10409156] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Naeve, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                              Added attorney Jaclyn Briana Stahl for Michael D. Planet. [10408925] [16-55977, 16-56714] (RL)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028976222 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jaclyn B. Stahl for Appellant Michael D. Planet in 16-55977, Appellee Michael D. Planet in 16-56714. Date of service: 04/24/2017. [10408854] [16-55977, 16-56714] (Stahl, Jaclyn)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028961418 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028937423 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellant Michael D. Planet in 16-56862, 16-55977, Appellee Michael D. Planet in 16-56714 Stipulated Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 04/10/2017. [10390914] [16-56862, 16-55977, 16-56714] (Reilley, Erica)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028923704 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                      Received copy of District Court order filed on 04/03/2017. Approving stipulation to stay enforcement of fee order pending resolution of consolidated Ninth Circuit Appeals [10384884] [16-56862, 16-55977, 16-56714] (JFF)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028707505 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: NT): Pursuant to G.O. 3.6(d), Judge NR Smith has been drawn to replace Judge Noonan. The panel will now consists of Circuit Judges WARDLAW, NR SMITH and MURGUIA. [10272892] (Trierweiler, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028701155 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028687501 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellee Courthouse News Service response opposing motion ([15] Motion (ECF Filing), [15] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief). Date of service: 01/12/2017. [10263865] [16-55977] (Fetterly, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028681400 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellant Michael D. Planet Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 03/03/2017. Date of service: 01/10/2017. [10261174] [16-55977] (Reilley, Erica)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028641775 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellee Courthouse News Service Motion to consolidate cases 16-56714 & 16-56862. Date of service: 12/22/2016. [10244024] [16-55977] (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                  Streamlined request [12] by Appellant Michael D. Planet to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Michael D. Planet opening brief due 01/17/2017. Appellee Courthouse News Service answering brief due 02/16/2017. The optional reply brief is due 14 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [10236376] (GS)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Michael D. Planet. New requested due date is 01/17/2017. [10233945] [16-55977] (Reilley, Erica)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                      Added attorney Frederick Brevard Hayes for Michael D. Planet. [10094677] (RL)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028306256 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Frederick B. Hayes for Appellant Michael D. Planet. Date of service: 08/19/2016. [10094394] [16-55977] (Hayes, Frederick)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028287167 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                            Terminated Frederick B. Hayes for Michael D. Planet in 16-55977 (contact information out of date) [10083418] (RY)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028278268 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed Mediation order: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel may contact circuit mediator to discuss services available through the court's mediation program, to request a settlement assessment conf, or to request a stay of the appeal for settlement purposes. Also, upon agreement of the parties, the brfing sch can be modified or vacated to facilitate settlement discussions. Csl are requested to send copies of this order to their clients. Info regarding the mediation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [10081988] (CL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028229540 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellee Courthouse News Service corporate disclosure statement. Date of service: 07/22/2016. [10060438] [16-55977] (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028229500 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellee Courthouse News Service Motion to assign case to prior panel. Date of service: 07/22/2016. [10060428] [16-55977] (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028218509 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellant Michael D. Planet Correspondence: Appellant's Amended Certificate of Service of Mediation Questionnaire submitted on July 15, 2016. Date of service: 07/19/2016 [10055331] [16-55977] (Reilley, Erica)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028211007 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Michael D. Planet Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/15/2016. [10051924] [16-55977] (Reilley, Erica)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028209567 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellee Courthouse News Service Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/15/2016. [10051286] [16-55977] (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028194058 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                          DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/15/2016. Transcript ordered by 08/08/2016. Transcript due 11/07/2016. Appellant Michael D. Planet opening brief due 12/15/2016. Appellee Courthouse News Service answering brief due 01/17/2017. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [10044273] (DLM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 97 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?