Josh Siegel v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. 20BBCV00164

Tags
Last Updated December 14, 2020 at 12:28 AM ST (9.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Siegel Josh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kechichian Gregory K..
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Motors Inc."
Type Contract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (no fraud/negligence) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Request for Dismissal - Before Trial not following ADR or more than 60 days since ADR 08/19/2020
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: 8/19/2020 Request For Dismissal
    Blank 13 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020 Minute Order
    Court Order re Vacating Case Management Conference
      Blank 12 Filed: 8/5/2020, Entered: 8/5/2020 Notice of settlement
        Blank 11 Filed: 8/5/2020, Entered: 8/5/2020 Notice of settlement
          Blank 10 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: 7/20/2020 Minute Order
          Court Order RE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING SET ON JULY 28, 2020 TO...
            Blank 9 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: 3/16/2020 Proof Of Personal Service
              Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: 3/2/2020 Summons
              on Amended Complaint (1st
                Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Amendment to Complaint
                Fictitious/Incorrect Name
                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Amended Complaint
                  (1st
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Notice of Case Management Conference
                      Blank 4 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
                        Blank 3 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
                          Blank 2 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Civil Case Cover Sheet
                            Blank 1 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Complaint

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 215 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?