Taaffe v. Robinhood Markets, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 8:20-cv-00513-CEH-SPF
District Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell, presiding

Tags
Last Updated April 13, 2020 at 4:58 PM DT (1.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Travis Taaffe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael S. Taaffe +1 941 364 2720 +1 941 366 3999 mtaaffe@slk-law.com
v.
Robinhood Financial, LLC Robinhood Financial, LLC, Defendant
Robinhood Markets, Inc. Robinhood Markets, Inc., Defendant
Robinhood Securities, LLC Robinhood Securities, LLC, Defendant
Office Tampa
Filed 3/4/2020
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 195 - Contract Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Hillsborough
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Change Venue / Transfer Case
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: None *Order pdf
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None Notice of pendency of related cases
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: None Change Venue / Transfer Case
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None Amended Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: None *Order pdf
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: None order on motion for temporary restraining order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/26/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/26/2020, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: None Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: None Notice of pendency of related cases
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: None Interested persons order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: None Related case order and track 2 notice
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: 3/4/2020 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                      NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:20-cv-513-T-36SPF. (SJB)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: 3/4/2020 Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing Fee $400, Receipt # 113A-16554636) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # (3) Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, # (4) Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, # (5) Proposed Summons Proposed Summons)(Taaffe, Michael) Modified on 3/4/2020 to correct docket text (SJB).
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 259 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?