Tangri v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:20-cv-01646

Tags
Last Updated September 23, 2020 at 12:34 PM DT (7.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Neetu Tangri, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DarrasLaw

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan B Grabarsky +1 909 390 3770 +1 909 974 2121 sgrabarsky@darraslaw.com
v.
No Logo Tesla Motors, Inc. Long Term Disability Insurance Plan, Defendant
No Logo The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Defendant
Office San Francisco
Filed 3/6/2020
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Santa Clara
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: None Case Management Statement
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Answer
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/6/2020, Entered: 3/6/2020 Complaint
                          COMPLAINT for Benefits Under an Employee Welfare Benefit Plan against All Defendants. Filed byNeetu Tangri. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A to Complaint)(Grabarsky, Susan) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/6/2020, Entered: 3/6/2020 Proposed Summons
                            Proposed Summons. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/6/2020, Entered: 3/6/2020 Civil Cover Sheet
                              Civil Cover Sheet by Neetu Tangri . (Grabarsky, Susan) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/6/2020, Entered: 3/6/2020 Notice - other
                                NOTICE by Neetu Tangri of Interested Parties (Grabarsky, Susan) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/6/2020, Entered: 3/6/2020 Complaint
                                  COMPLAINT for Benefits Under an Employee Welfare Benefit Plan against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14253419.). Filed byNeetu Tangri. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A to Complaint)(Grabarsky, Susan) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 151 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?