Riley v. Tesla, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 0:20-cv-60517-RS
District Judge Rodney Smith, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 10, 2021 at 8:29 PM DT (1.1 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James B. Riley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Colson Hicks Eidson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lewis S Eidson +1 305 476 7400 +1 305 476 7444 mike@colson.com
Space Curtis B Miner +1 305 476 7400 +1 305 476 7444 curt@colson.com
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Office Ft Lauderdale
Filed 3/10/2020
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 355 - Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Broward (Office - Ft Lauderdale)
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag AOV
  Entries (69) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Pretrial Stipulation
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None In Limine
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None In Limine
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Notice of Striking
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/2/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/2/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: None Motion to Seal (Public)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: None Hearing
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 58 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: None Motion to Seal (Public)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: None Mediation report
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/6/2021, Entered: None Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/4/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 53 Filed: 8/3/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/3/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/3/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/27/2021, Entered: 7/27/2021 response in opposition to motion
                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [44] MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Experts' Affidavits Filed in Opposition to Tesla's Daubert Motions and Memorandum of Law filed by James B. Riley. Replies due by 8/3/2021. (Wasson, Roy)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Reply to Response to motion
                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [34] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Tesla, Inc. (Lumish, Wendy)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Response/Reply (Other)
                                            REPLY to [33] Statement, [39] Response/Reply (Other), Reply Statement of Material Facts by Tesla, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Lumish, Wendy)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Response in Support of Motion
                                              RESPONSE in Support re [31] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Ralph White Under Fed.R.Evid. 702 and 403 and Memorandum of Law filed by Tesla, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exh. A)(Lumish, Wendy)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Response in Support of Motion
                                                RESPONSE in Support re [28] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Biomechanic Expert Kelly Kennett and Memorandum of Law filed by Tesla, Inc. (Lumish, Wendy)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Response in Support of Motion
                                                  RESPONSE in Support re [29] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Robert Caldwell and Memorandum of Law filed by Tesla, Inc. (Lumish, Wendy)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: 7/13/2021 Motion to strike
                                                    MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Experts' Affidavits Filed in Opposition to Tesla's Daubert Motions and Memorandum of Law by Tesla, Inc. Responses due by 7/27/2021 (Lumish, Wendy)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: 7/7/2021 Notice - other
                                                      NOTICE by James B. Riley re [39] Response/Reply (Other), of Filing Corrected Exhibit "G" to Plaintiff's Response to Tesla's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Corrected Exhibit G: NTSB Battery and Vehicle Report) (Miner, Curtis)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 response in opposition to motion
                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [31] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Ralph White Under Fed.R.Evid. 702 and 403 and Memorandum of Law filed by James B. Riley. Replies due by 7/13/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: CV of Ralph White, # (2) Exhibit B: Declaration of Ralph White)(Miner, Curtis)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 response in opposition to motion
                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [28] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Biomechanic Expert Kelly Kennett and Memorandum of Law filed by James B. Riley. Replies due by 7/13/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit B: Kennett CV, # (2) Exhibit D: Medical Examiner Report, # (3) Exhibit E: Kennett Affidavit)(Miner, Curtis)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 response in opposition to motion
                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re [29] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Robert Caldwell and Memorandum of Law filed by James B. Riley. Replies due by 7/13/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: Affidavit of Robert Caldwell, P.E.)(Miner, Curtis)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 Response/Reply (Other)
                                                              RESPONSE to [33] Statement by James B. Riley. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: James Riley Deposition, # (2) Exhibit B: James Riley Declaration, # (3) Exhibit C: Tesla Interrogatory Response, # (4) Exhibit D: Tesla 332-334, # (5) Exhibit E: NTSB Accident Brief, # (6) Exhibit F: Grosshart Deposition, # (7) Exhibit G: NTSB Battery and Vehicle Report, # (8) Exhibit H: Kohn Deposition, # (9) Exhibit I: Tesla 528-555, # (10) Exhibit J: Text Messages)(Miner, Curtis)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document 38 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 response in opposition to motion
                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re [34] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by James B. Riley. Replies due by 7/13/2021. (Miner, Curtis)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: 6/16/2021 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roy D. Wasson on behalf of James B. Riley. Attorney Roy D. Wasson added to party James B. Riley(pty:pla). (Wasson, Roy)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: 6/16/2021 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                    PAPERLESS ORDER granting [35] Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file the following by July 6, 2021:1) Response to [28] Defendant's MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Biomechanic Expert Kelly Kennett and Memorandum of Law;2) Response to [29] Defendant's MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Robert Caldwell and Memorandum of Law;3) Response to [31] Defendant's MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Ralph White Under Fed.R.Evid. 702 and 403 and Memorandum of Law; and(4) Response to [34] Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 6/16/2021. (tcl)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: 6/16/2021, Terminated: 6/16/2021 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time One-Week to Respond to Defendants' re [29] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Robert Caldwell and Memorandum of Law, [28] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Biomechanic Expert Kelly Kennett and Memorandum of Law, [34] MOTION for Summary Judgment , [31] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Ralph White Under Fed.R.Evid. 702 and 403 and Memorandum of Law by James B. Riley. Responses due by 6/30/2021 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Miner, Curtis)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 34 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: 6/14/2021 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by Tesla, Inc. Responses due by 6/28/2021 (Lumish, Wendy)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: 6/14/2021 statement
                                                                          Statement of: Undisputed Material Facts In Support Of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Tesla, Inc (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exh. A, # (2) Exhibit Exh. B, # (3) Exhibit Exh. C)(Lumish, Wendy)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: 6/14/2021 Notice - other
                                                                            NOTICE by Tesla, Inc re [28] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Biomechanic Expert Kelly Kennett and Memorandum of Law of Filing Corrected Exhibit to DE 28 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Corrected Exh C to DE 28) (Lumish, Wendy)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 31 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: 6/14/2021 Motion in Limine
                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Ralph White Under Fed.R.Evid. 702 and 403 and Memorandum of Law by Tesla, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exh. A, # (2) Exhibit Exh. B, # (3) Exhibit Exh. C, # (4) Exhibit Exh. D, # (5) Exhibit Exh. E, # (6) Exhibit Exh. F pp 1-300, # (7) Exhibit Exh. F pp 301-600, # (8) Exhibit Exh. F pp 601-900, # (9) Exhibit Exh. F pp 901-1200, # (10) Exhibit Ex. F pp 1201-1500, # (11) Exhibit Exh. F pp 1501-1575, # (12) Exhibit Exh. G, # (13) Exhibit Exh. H, # (14) Exhibit Exh. I, # (15) Exhibit Exh. J)(Lumish, Wendy)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 30 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: 6/14/2021 Motion to Seal (Attorney)
                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Seal File Under Seal an Exhibit to Defendant's Motion Exclude Testimony of Plf's Expert Ralph White Under Fed.R.Evid. 702 and 403 and Motion for Summary Judgment per Local Rule 5.4 by Tesla, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Order) (Lumish, Wendy)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: 6/14/2021 Motion in Limine
                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Robert Caldwell and Memorandum of Law by Tesla, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exh. A, # (2) Exhibit Exh. B, # (3) Exhibit Exh. C, # (4) Exhibit Exh. D, # (5) Exhibit Exh. E, # (6) Exhibit Exh. F, # (7) Exhibit Exh. G, # (8) Exhibit Exh. H, # (9) Exhibit Exh. I)(Lumish, Wendy)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: 6/14/2021 Motion in Limine
                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Biomechanic Expert Kelly Kennett and Memorandum of Law by Tesla, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exh. A, # (2) Exhibit Exh. B, # (3) Exhibit Exh. C, # (4) Exhibit Exh. D, # (5) Exhibit Exh. E, # (6) Exhibit Exh. F, # (7) Exhibit Exh. G)(Lumish, Wendy)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: 6/14/2021 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wendy Frank Lumish on behalf of Tesla, Inc. Attorney Wendy Frank Lumish added to party Tesla, Inc(pty:dft). (Lumish, Wendy)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 6/7/2021, Entered: 6/7/2021 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                  PAPERLESS ORDER denying [25] Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 6/7/2021. (tcl)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/3/2021, Entered: 6/3/2021, Terminated: 6/7/2021 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadlines for Dispositive and Daubert Motions re [18] Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, by Tesla, Inc. Responses due by 6/17/2021 (Rudock, Robert)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: 5/24/2021 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Denise Helen Georges on behalf of James B. Riley. Attorney Denise Helen Georges added to party James B. Riley(pty:pla). (Georges, Denise)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: 5/4/2021 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Shanan Montoya on behalf of James B. Riley. Attorney Patrick Shanan Montoya added to party James B. Riley(pty:pla). (Montoya, Patrick)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: 4/19/2021 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                          PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part [21] Renewed Joint Motion to Continue Trial by Thirty (30) Days or, Alternatively, To Extend Expert Discovery Deadlines. Unless otherwise stated, the parties shall comply with the following deadlines: 1. Plaintiff shall disclose experts, expert witness summaries, and reports as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) by May 7, 2021. 2. Defendant(s) shall disclose experts, expert witness summaries, and reports as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) by May 21, 2021. 3. Exchange of rebuttal expert witness summaries and reports as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) by May 28, 2021. 4. Expert discovery shall be completed by June 14, 2021. All other deadlines found within the Amended Scheduling Order [DE 18] shall remain unchanged. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/19/2021. (ogn)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: 4/8/2021, Terminated: 4/19/2021 Motion to Continue
                                                                                            Renewed MOTION to Continue re [19] Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Continue Trial and Pretrial Deadlines by Thirty (30) Days re [18] Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, filed by James B. Riley by James B. Riley. Responses due by 4/22/2021 (Miner, Curtis)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: 4/5/2021 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                              PAPERLESS ORDER denying [19] Joint Motion to Continue Trial and Pretrial Deadlines by Thirty (30) Days, whereby the parties seek to extend all deadlines, including trial. A scheduling order may be modified only for good cause and with the judges consent. The good cause standard precludes modification unless the schedule cannot be met despite the diligence of the party seeking the extension. The parties have failed to show good cause or why the scheduling order should be modified. Instead, the parties simply state that legitimate professional and personal reasons have made the scheduling of depositions difficult without any further explanation. Thus, the Court is not inclined to extend the deadlines at this time. The motion is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/5/2021. (ogn)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: 4/2/2021, Terminated: 4/5/2021 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Continue Trial and Pretrial Deadlines by Thirty (30) Days re [18] Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, by James B. Riley. Responses due by 4/16/2021 (Miner, Curtis)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: 1/20/2021 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER, granting in part [17] Motion for Extension of Time. Expert Discovery due by 5/28/2021. Fact Discovery due by 5/14/2021. Mediation Deadline 8/13/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 6/14/2021. In Limine Motions due by 9/10/2021. Motions due by 9/10/2021. Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/10/2021. Calendar Call set for 10/5/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Smith. Jury Trial set for 10/12/2021 before Judge Rodney Smith. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 1/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/14/2021, Terminated: 1/19/2021 MOTION for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Pretrial Deadlines and Continue Trial Date re [8] Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, by James B. Riley. Responses due by 1/28/2021 (Miner, Curtis)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: 10/27/2020 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND CERTAIN PRETRIAL DEADLINES,granting [15] Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: 10/26/2020, Terminated: 10/27/2020 MOTION for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Certain Pretrial Deadlines re [8] Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, by James B. Riley. Responses due by 11/9/2020 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Miner, Curtis)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: 10/1/2020 Order on Motion for Protective/Confidentiality OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 10/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (dpr)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: 9/30/2020, Terminated: 10/1/2020 Motion for Protective/Confidentiality Order
                                                                                                            STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Tesla, Inc (Rudock, Robert) Converted to Motion per chamber on 10/1/2020 (mf). Modified on 10/1/2020 (mf).
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: 8/14/2020 Order scheduling Mediation.Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Michael C. Siboni, Esq. Mediation Hearing set for 2/24/2021 10:00 AM, either virtually or in-person. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: 7/1/2020 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Michael C Siboni as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 2/24/2021 at 10:00 a.m.. (Miner, Curtis)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: 5/13/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  PAPERLESS ORDER granting [9] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Vincent Galvin. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/13/2020.(ogn)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: 5/12/2020, Terminated: 5/13/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                    Defendant's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Vincent Galvin. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12877052 by Tesla, Inc. Responses due by 5/26/2020 (Rudock, Robert)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: 5/12/2020 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 8/16/2021 before Judge Rodney Smith., Calendar Call set for 8/10/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Smith., Amended Pleadings due by 5/29/2020., Expert Discovery due by 4/16/2021., Fact Discovery due by 4/16/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 5/29/2020., Mediation Deadline 5/14/2021., In Limine Motions due by 7/16/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 4/16/2021., Motions due by 7/16/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/16/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/12/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: 5/11/2020 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1
                                                                                                                        Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by James B. Riley (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Miner, Curtis)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: 5/11/2020 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                          Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tesla, Inc (Rudock, Robert)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: 4/30/2020 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                            Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by James B. Riley (Miner, Curtis)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: 4/28/2020 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/11/2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (dco)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: 4/3/2020 Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Tesla, Inc. Attorney Robert John Rudock added to party Tesla, Inc(pty:dft). (Rudock, Robert)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020 Clerk's Notice of Judge AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020 Complaint
                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Tesla, Inc., d/b/a Tesla Motors, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12580691, filed by James B. Riley, as personal representative of the Estate of Barrett Riley. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Miner, Curtis)
                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 374 times.

                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?