Canezin v. Tesla
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of New Jersey, County of Bergen, Case No. BER-SC-000426-20

Tags
Last Updated March 12, 2020 at 9:18 PM DT (1.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Andre Canezin, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla"
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: None
Trial Scheduled Notice submitted by Case Management
    Blank 5 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None Court Filing
    The court has determined to adjourn the following event (Hearing scheduled for 08:45 AM on 04/13/2020 with Judge MONAGHAN JOSEPH G. Re: Trial ) due to courthouse closure for a public health emergency - COVID-19. The matter will be rescheduled.
      Blank 4 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None Court Filing
      The court has determined to adjourn the following event (Hearing scheduled for 08:45 AM on 04/13/2020 with Judge MONAGHAN JOSEPH G. Re: Trial ) due to courthouse closure for a public health emergency - COVID-19. The matter will be rescheduled.
        Blank 3 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None
        Trial Scheduled Notice submitted by Case Management
          Blank 2 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None
          Sum Srvd Trial Sch Notice submitted by Case Management
            Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None
            Complaint for BER SC 000426-20 submitted by ANDRE CANEZIN on behalf of ANDRE CANEZIN against TESLA

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 35 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?