Reynolds v. Binance Holdings Ltd.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:20-cv-02117-JSC
Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 12, 2021 at 12:39 PM EDT (4.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Steven Cody Reynolds, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Steven Goldstein +1 646 887 9521 +1 646 887 8153 dgoldstein@sgrlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Gambrell & Russell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne K Edwards +1 213 358 7200 +1 213 358 7310 aedwards@sgrlaw.com
v.
Binance Holdings Limited Binance Holdings Limited, Defendant
Officially listed as "Binance Holdings Ltd."

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter R. Boutin +1 415 398 6000 +1 415 981 0136 peter.boutin@kyl.com
Space Christopher A. Stecher +1 415 398 6000 +1 415 981 0136 christopher.stecher@kyl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roberto Gonzalez +1 202 223 7316 rgonzalez@paulweiss.com
Space Karen R. King +1 212 373 3784 +1 212 492 0784 kking@paulweiss.com
Space THEODORE V. WELLS +1 212 373 3089 +1 212 492 0089 twells@paulweiss.com
Office San Francisco
Filed 3/27/2020
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $338000
Nature of Suit 380 - Personal Property: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Property
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Alameda
Terminated 8/26/2020
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP,CLOSED,CONSENT
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/26/2020, Entered: 8/26/2020 judgmentCourt Filing
JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/26/2020. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 50 Filed: 8/26/2020, Entered: 8/26/2020 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
    ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on August 26, 2020. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/23/2020, Entered: 8/23/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
      Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/13/20, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [48] Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2020. (Related documents(s) [48]) (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2020)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: 8/17/2020 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/13/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Binance Holdings Ltd., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Boutin, Peter) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 47 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: 8/13/2020 Motion HearingCourt Filing
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Motion Hearing held via Zoom webinar on 8/13/2020 re [20] Motion to Dismiss filed by Binance Holdings Ltd. and [21] Motion to Stay Discovery filed by Binance Holdings Ltd. The Motion to Dismiss is granted. The Motion to Stay Discovery is taken under submission. The initial case management conference was not held. (Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce.)(Time 00:21)Attorneys for Plaintiff: Dan Goldstein and Anne Edwards.Attorneys for Defendant: Roberto Gonzalez, Peter Boutin, and Karen King. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/13/2020)
            LREF
            Blank 46 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: 8/7/2020 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom HearingCourt Filing
            CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing and Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1613661817?pwd=Z0tnSzBvKzJMN25SRFB3M1B6dFBadz09Meeting ID: 161 366 1817Password: 924619Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: 7/27/2020 Objection
              OBJECTIONS to re [44] Notice (Other) Clarification to Plaintiff's Clarification of His Request for Judicial Notice by Binance Holdings Ltd.. (Boutin, Peter) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: 7/20/2020 Notice - other
                NOTICE of Clarification to [32] Request for Judicial Notice by Steven Cody Reynolds (Edwards, Anne) (Filed on 7/20/2020) Modified on 7/22/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 43 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: 7/20/2020 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                  CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING. Please take notice the hearing on the pending motions (Dkt. Nos. [20] & [21]) and the initial case management conference set for July 23, 2020 are continued to August 13, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. by video conference before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020) Modified on 7/20/2020 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: 7/17/2020 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                    ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting [41] Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel Goldstein. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: 7/17/2020, Terminated: 7/17/2020 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14703988.) filed by Steven Cody Reynolds. (Goldstein, Daniel) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: 7/16/2020 Joint Case Management Statement
                        JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT [AMENDED] filed by Steven Cody Reynolds. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Edwards, Anne) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 39 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: 7/16/2020 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom HearingCourt Filing
                          CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. The motion hearing and initial case management conference set for 7/23/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1613661817?pwd=Z0tnSzBvKzJMN25SRFB3M1B6dFBadz09Meeting ID: 161 366 1817Password: 924619Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: 7/16/2020, Terminated: 7/16/2020 Motion to Appear by Telephone
                            MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Steven Cody Reynolds. (Edwards, Anne) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: 7/16/2020, Terminated: 7/16/2020 Motion to Appear by Telephone
                              MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the July 23, 2020 Hearing filed by Binance Holdings Ltd.. (Boutin, Peter) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: 7/13/2020 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                REPLY (re [21] MOTION to Stay Discovery ) filed byBinance Holdings Ltd.. (Boutin, Peter) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: 7/13/2020 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                  REPLY (re [20] MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byBinance Holdings Ltd.. (Boutin, Peter) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: 7/8/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                    ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting [33] Stipulation REGARDING DEADLINE FOR SPECIALLY-APPEARING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT REPLY BRIEFS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS [ECF #20] AND MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY [ECF #21]. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: 7/7/2020, Terminated: 7/8/2020 stipulation
                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [20] MOTION to Dismiss, [21] MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Binance Holdings Ltd.. (Boutin, Peter) (Filed on 7/7/2020) Modified on 7/8/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020 Request For Judicial Notice
                                        Request for Judicial Notice re [30] Opposition/Response to Motion, [29] Opposition/Response to Motion filed bySteven Cody Reynolds. (Related document(s)[30], [29]) (Edwards, Anne) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020 Declaration in Support
                                          Declaration in Support of [30] Opposition/Response to Motion, [29] Opposition/Response to Motion filed bySteven Cody Reynolds. (Related document(s)[30], [29]) (Edwards, Anne) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                            OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [21] MOTION to Stay Discovery ) filed bySteven Cody Reynolds. (Edwards, Anne) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                              OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [20] MOTION to Dismiss ) filed bySteven Cody Reynolds. (Edwards, Anne) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 28 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: 6/19/2020 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Please take notice that the case management conference set for 6/25/2020 is continued to 7/23/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Joint case management conference statement shall be filed by 7/16/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: 6/19/2020 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting [18] Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Karen King. (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: 6/19/2020 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting [17] Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Roberto Gonzalez. (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: 6/19/2020 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting [16] Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Theodore Wells. (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: 6/19/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Stecher on Behalf of Specially-Appearing Defendant Binance Holdings Ltd. (Stecher, Christopher) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: 6/18/2020, Terminated: 7/16/2020 Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                                          MOTION to Appear by Telephone for June 25, 2020 Case Management Conference filed by Binance Holdings Ltd.. (Boutin, Peter) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: 6/18/2020 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                            Certificate of Interested Entities by Binance Holdings Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Binance Holdings Ltd. for Binance Holdings Ltd.. (Boutin, Peter) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: 6/18/2020, Terminated: 8/26/2020 Motion To StayCourt Filing
                                                              MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Binance Holdings Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 7/2/2020. Replies due by 7/9/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay Discovery)(Boutin, Peter) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: 6/18/2020, Terminated: 8/26/2020 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                MOTION to Dismiss filed by Binance Holdings Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 7/2/2020. Replies due by 7/9/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Samuel Lim in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # (2) Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Boutin, Peter) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: 6/18/2020 Case Management Statement
                                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT [JOINT] filed by Steven Cody Reynolds. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Edwards, Anne) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: 6/18/2020, Terminated: 6/19/2020 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14595243.) filed by Binance Holdings Ltd.. (King, Karen) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: 6/18/2020, Terminated: 6/19/2020 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14595216.) filed by Binance Holdings Ltd.. (Gonzalez, Roberto) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: 6/18/2020, Terminated: 6/19/2020 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14595178.) filed by Binance Holdings Ltd.. (Wells, Theodore) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: 6/4/2020 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                          ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Edwards, Anne) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: 6/4/2020 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                            CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Binance Holdings Ltd... (Boutin, Peter) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: 6/4/2020 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                              ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Boutin, Peter) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: 5/6/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                NOTICE by Steven Cody Reynolds OF ENTRY OF [11] ORDER RE STIPULATION REGARDING DEFENDANTS AGREEMENT TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT AND RELATED DOCUMENTS; AND REGARDING PLAINTIFFS AGREEMENT TO AN EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT (Edwards, Anne) (Filed on 5/6/2020) Modified on 5/7/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: 5/5/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting [10] Stipulation Regarding Defendant's Agreement to Accept Service of Summons, Complaint and Related Documents; and Regarding Plaintiff's Agreement to an Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Initial Complaint. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: 5/5/2020, Terminated: 5/5/2020 stipulation
                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Defendant's Agreement to Accept Service of Summons, Complaint and Related Documents; and Regarding Plaintiff's Agreement to an Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Steven Cody Reynolds. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Declaration)(Edwards, Anne) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: 4/22/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                      NOTICE by Steven Cody Reynolds re [7] Certificate of Service of Withdrawal of Proof of Service on Binance Holdings Ltd. (Edwards, Anne) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: 4/17/2020 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                        Certificate of Interested Entities by Steven Cody Reynolds (Edwards, Anne) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: 4/10/2020 Certificate of service
                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven Cody Reynolds of Summons, Complaint and Related Documents (Edwards, Anne) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: 4/10/2020 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                            CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Steven Cody Reynolds.. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Edwards, Anne) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: 3/27/2020 Summons issued
                                                                                              Summons Issued as to Binance Holdings Ltd.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2020)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: 3/27/2020 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                                Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2020)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: 3/27/2020 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/10/2020. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2020)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: 3/27/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                    Proposed Summons. (Edwards, Anne) (Filed on 3/27/2020)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: 3/27/2020 Complaint
                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Binance Holdings Ltd. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-14320134.). Filed by Steven Cody Reynolds. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet) (Edwards, Anne) (Filed on 3/27/2020) Modified on 3/27/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 37 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?