Student A v. Liberty University, Inc.,
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Western District Court, Case No. 6:20-cv-00023-NKM
District Judge Norman K. Moon, presiding

Tags
Last Updated May 12, 2021 at 6:33 PM DT (2.3 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (71) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Order Staying Case
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Opposition
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Support
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: None Order Staying Case
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Support
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: None Protective Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Opposition
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Support
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None Stay
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Support
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: None Certify Class
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/5/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: None Pretrial Order
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Return of Service
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                            Electronic Summons Issued as to Liberty University, Inc., NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(al)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 Complaint
                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Liberty University, Inc., filed by Student A. (Filing & Administrative fee $400.00, receipt number 0423-3370244). (Attachment: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(al)
                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 61 times.

                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?