In Re: Application Pursuant to 28 USC Section 1782
Federal Court Proceeding Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:20-mc-00018-DLR

Tags
Last Updated February 15, 2021 at 4:59 PM ST (4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo iFinex Incorporated, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher J. Beal +1 858 638 1400 cbeal@dmalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bergin Frakes Smalley & Oberholtzer PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian McCormack Bergin +1 602 888 7857 +1 602 888 7856 bbergin@bfsolaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by mjllaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Jason Lee +1 949 551 1575 +1 214 800 5107 michael@mjllaw.com
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 4/15/2020
Jury Demand
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County XX Outside US
Terminated 4/20/2020
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Interpreter
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: 4/21/2020 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Corporate Disclosure Statement by iFinex Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Digfinex Inc. for iFinex Incorporated. (Bergin, Brian)
    LREF
    Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: 4/20/2020 Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters RogatoryCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [1] Application to Conduct Discovery Pursuant to 28 USC Section 1782. iFinex Inc. may serve the subpoena on ABT at 2036 East Camelback Road, Phoenix, Arizona 85016. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/20/2020. (MMO)
      LREF
      Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/16/2020, Entered: 4/16/2020 Order of recusalCourt Filing
      ORDER OF RECUSAL - This case reassigned, by random draw, to Judge Douglas L Rayes for all further proceedings. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: MC-20-00018-PHX-DLR. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 4/15/20. (DXD)
        LREF
        Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: 4/15/2020 Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement
        NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to iFinex Incorporated. (MYE)
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: 4/15/2020 New Case Opened
          Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18180643. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: MC-20-18-PHX-MTL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MYE)
            LREF
            Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: 4/15/2020 Declaration
              LREF
              Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: 4/15/2020, Terminated: 4/20/2020 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory
                LREF
                Blank  Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion
                Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Michael Jason Lee and Christopher J Beal on behalf of Petitioner iFinex Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 4 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?