WU v. GSX TECHEDU INC. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:20-cv-04457-ES-CLW
District Judge Esther Salas, presiding

Tags
Last Updated May 5, 2021 at 11:00 AM DT (5.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALEXANDRE TAZI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gustavo Fabian Bruckner +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 gfBruckner@pomlaw.com
No Logo COREY HAYS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gustavo Fabian Bruckner +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 gfBruckner@pomlaw.com
No Logo ROBERT ANGELINE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gustavo Fabian Bruckner +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 gfBruckner@pomlaw.com
No Logo ZEQIU WU, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gustavo Fabian Bruckner +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 gfBruckner@pomlaw.com
v.
Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays Capital Inc., Defendant
BofA Securities, Inc. BofA Securities, Inc., Defendant
No Logo CLSA LIMITED, Defendant
Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Defendant
Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Defendant
Goldman Sachs (Asia) LLC Goldman Sachs (Asia) LLC, Defendant
GSX Techedu Inc. GSX Techedu Inc., Defendant
No Logo LARRY XIANGDONG CHEN, Defendant
No Logo MING LIAO, Defendant
No Logo NAN SHEN, Defendant
No Logo Xin, Fan, Defendant
No Logo YIMING HU, Defendant
No Logo Robert Angeline, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Law Firm PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LAURENCE M. ROSEN +1 973 313 1887 +1 212 202 3827 lrosen@rosenlegal.com
Office Newark
Filed 4/17/2020
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Essex
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (77) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Stipulation
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition of Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Dismiss
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 48 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: 12/16/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                            TEXT ORDER: The Court grants Defendant GSX Techedu, Inc. request DE 47 that its deadline and briefing schedule for its anticipated motion to dismiss is extended to match the deadlines of the Underwriter Defendants as set in DE 45.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/16/20. (tjg, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document 47 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: 12/15/2020 Letter
                                                Letter from Defendant GSX Techedu Inc. respectfully requesting consolidation of the briefing schedules for defendants' anticipated motion(s) to dismiss re [22] Amended Complaint,. (MUSOFF, SCOTT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: 12/15/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT DAVID MUSOFF on behalf of GSX TECHEDU INC. (MUSOFF, SCOTT)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: 12/7/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      TEXT ORDER: The Court adopts the Underwriter Defendants and lead Plaintiffs proposed schedule in DE 44: Underwriter Defendants answer, motion to dismiss, or otherwise respond to Amended Complaint due 1/15/21; Lead Plaintiffs opposition due 3/16/21; and Underwriter Defendants reply due by 4/16/21. The parties shall serve their respective briefing and shall file on the docket once the motion once it is fully briefed.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/7/20. (tjg, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: 12/4/2020 Letter
                                                          Letter from Defendants Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Barclays Capital Inc., BofA Securities, Inc., CLSA Limited, and Goldman Sachs (Asia) L.L.C. Requesting a Revised Scheduling Order Extending Time to Respond to Amended Complaint. (DOMALEWSKI, CRAIG)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: 12/4/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT ANDREW HALL on behalf of BARCLAYS CAPITAL, INC., BOFA SECURITIES, INC., CLSA LIMITED, CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC, DEUTSCHE BANK SECURITIES, INC., GOLDMAN SACHS (ASIA) L.L.C. (HALL, SCOTT)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: 12/4/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by CRAIG A. DOMALEWSKI on behalf of BARCLAYS CAPITAL, INC., BOFA SECURITIES, INC., CLSA LIMITED, CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC, DEUTSCHE BANK SECURITIES, INC., GOLDMAN SACHS (ASIA) L.L.C. (DOMALEWSKI, CRAIG)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020 summons returned executed
                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by ROBERT ANGELINE, COREY HAYS, YANG RENBIN, ALEXANDRE TAZI. GOLDMAN SACHS (ASIA) L.L.C. served on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020. (BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020 summons returned executed
                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by ROBERT ANGELINE, COREY HAYS, YANG RENBIN, ALEXANDRE TAZI. BARCLAYS CAPITAL, INC. served on 11/18/2020, answer due 12/9/2020. (BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020 summons returned executed
                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by ROBERT ANGELINE, COREY HAYS, YANG RENBIN, ALEXANDRE TAZI. BOFA SECURITIES, INC. served on 11/18/2020, answer due 12/9/2020. (BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020 summons returned executed
                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by ROBERT ANGELINE, COREY HAYS, YANG RENBIN, ALEXANDRE TAZI. CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC served on 11/18/2020, answer due 12/9/2020. (BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: 11/24/2020 summons returned executed
                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by ROBERT ANGELINE, COREY HAYS, YANG RENBIN, ALEXANDRE TAZI. CLSA LIMITED served on 11/24/2020, answer due 12/15/2020. (BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: 11/20/2020 Letter
                                                                          Letter from Shreefer Law Firm re Service on CLSA Limited. (ams, )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank  Remark
                                                                            Remark - Amended Complaint and Summons sent to CLSA Limited via FedEx. (ams, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: 11/18/2020 summons returned executed
                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by ROBERT ANGELINE, COREY HAYS, YANG RENBIN, ALEXANDRE TAZI. DEUTSCHE BANK SECURITIES, INC. served on 11/16/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Summons issued
                                                                                SUMMONS ISSUED as to BARCLAYS CAPITAL, INC., BOFA SECURITIES, INC., LARRY XIANGDONG CHEN, CLSA LIMITED, CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC, DEUTSCHE BANK SECURITIES, INC., XIN FAN, GOLDMAN SACHS (ASIA) L.L.C., YIMING HU, MING LIAO, NAN SHEN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: 11/9/2020 Summons - Request for Issue
                                                                                  Request for Summons to be Issued by ROBERT ANGELINE, COREY HAYS, YANG RENBIN, ALEXANDRE TAZI as to GOLDMAN SACHS (ASIA) L.L.C.. (BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: 11/9/2020 Summons - Request for Issue
                                                                                    Request for Summons to be Issued by ROBERT ANGELINE, COREY HAYS, YANG RENBIN, ALEXANDRE TAZI as to CLSA LIMITED. (BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: 11/9/2020 Summons - Request for Issue
                                                                                      Request for Summons to be Issued by ROBERT ANGELINE, COREY HAYS, YANG RENBIN, ALEXANDRE TAZI as to BOFA SECURITIES, INC.. (BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: 11/9/2020 Summons - Request for Issue
                                                                                        Request for Summons to be Issued by ROBERT ANGELINE, COREY HAYS, YANG RENBIN, ALEXANDRE TAZI as to BARCLAYS CAPITAL, INC.. (BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: 11/9/2020 Summons - Request for Issue
                                                                                          Request for Summons to be Issued by ROBERT ANGELINE, COREY HAYS, YANG RENBIN, ALEXANDRE TAZI as to DEUTSCHE BANK SECURITIES, INC.. (BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: 11/9/2020 Summons - Request for Issue
                                                                                            Request for Summons to be Issued by ROBERT ANGELINE, COREY HAYS, YANG RENBIN, ALEXANDRE TAZI as to CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC. (BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: 11/9/2020 Summons - Request for Issue
                                                                                              Request for Summons to be Issued by ROBERT ANGELINE, COREY HAYS, YANG RENBIN, ALEXANDRE TAZI as to MING LIAO. (BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: 11/9/2020 Summons - Request for Issue
                                                                                                Request for Summons to be Issued by ROBERT ANGELINE, COREY HAYS, YANG RENBIN, ALEXANDRE TAZI as to YIMING HU. (BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: 11/9/2020 Summons - Request for Issue
                                                                                                  Request for Summons to be Issued by ROBERT ANGELINE, COREY HAYS, YANG RENBIN, ALEXANDRE TAZI as to XIN FAN. (BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: 11/9/2020 Summons - Request for Issue
                                                                                                    Request for Summons to be Issued by ROBERT ANGELINE, COREY HAYS, YANG RENBIN, ALEXANDRE TAZI as to NAN SHEN. (BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: 11/9/2020 Summons - Request for Issue
                                                                                                      Request for Summons to be Issued by ROBERT ANGELINE, COREY HAYS, YANG RENBIN, ALEXANDRE TAZI as to LARRY XIANGDONG CHEN. (BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 22 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: 11/2/2020 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against LARRY XIANGDONG CHEN, GSX TECHEDU INC., NAN SHEN, XIN FAN, YIMING HU, MING LIAO, CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC, DEUTSCHE BANK SECURITIES, INC., BARCLAYS CAPITAL, INC., BofA SECURITIES, INC., CLSA LIMITED, GOLDMAN SACHS (ASIA) L.L.C., filed by YANG RENBIN, ROBERT ANGELINE, COREY HAYS, ALEXANDRE TAZI. (Attachments: # (1) Certification, # (2) Certification)(BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: 10/26/2020 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting [20] Lead Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint and Move or otherwise Respond. Lead Plaintiff shall file the Amended Class Action Complaint on or before 11/2/2020. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/26/2020. (dam)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020, Terminated: 10/26/2020 motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File - Notice of Unopposed Motion and Unopposed Motion of Lead Plaintiff for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint and Move or Otherwise Respond by YANG RENBIN. (Attachments: # (1) Certification of Gustavo F. Bruckner, # (2) [Proposed] Order Granting Lead Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint and Move or Otherwise Respond)(BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: 9/23/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER Regarding Scheduling re [18] Stipulation. Lead Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before 10/26/2020. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/18/2020. (dam, )
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/17/2020, Entered: 9/17/2020 stipulation
                                                                                                              STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Scheduling by YANG RENBIN. (BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank  Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added
                                                                                                                Pro Hac Vice counsel, AUSTIN P. VAN, ESQ. and TERRENCE W. SCUDIERI, JR., ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added
                                                                                                                  Pro Hac Vice counsel, AUSTIN P. VAN, ESQ. and TERRENCE W. SCUDIERI, JR., ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: 9/9/2020 Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                                                                                                    Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Terrence W. Scudieri, Jr. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11328250.) (BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: 9/9/2020 Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                                                                                                      Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Austin P. Van to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11328180.) (BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: 9/9/2020 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER ADMITTING AUSTIN P. VAN AND TERRENCE W. SCUDIERI, JR. PRO HAC VICE, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/8/2020. (lag, )
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: 9/4/2020, Terminated: 9/9/2020 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by YANG RENBIN, ZEQIU WU. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Certification of Gustavo F. Bruckner, # (3) Declaration of Austin P. Van, # (4) Exhibit Austin P. Van Good Standing Certificates, # (5) Declaration of Terrence W. Scudieri, Jr., # (6) Exhibit Terrence W. Scudieri, Jr. Good Standing Certificates)(BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: 9/3/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER: Defendants Motions for Admission Pro Hac vice (DE No. 10 & 11) are administratively terminated. Consistent with Judge Waldors individual preferences, Defendant is directed to submit a consolidated pro hac vice motion with one proposed order for the admission of all pro hac vice applicants.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/3/20. (tjg, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: 9/3/2020 Exhibit
                                                                                                                              Exhibit to [11] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Good Standing Certificate for Terrance W. Scudieri, Jr. by YANG RENBIN, ZEQIU WU. (BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: 9/2/2020, Terminated: 9/3/2020 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by YANG RENBIN, ZEQIU WU. (Attachments: # (1) Certification of Gustavo F. Bruckner, # (2) Declaration of Terrance W. Scudieri, # (3) Exhibit good standing certificate)(BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: 9/2/2020, Terminated: 9/3/2020 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by YANG RENBIN. (Attachments: # (1) Certification of Gustavo F. Brucknet, # (2) Declaration of Austin P. Van, # (3) Exhibit good standing certificate, # (4) Exhibit Good Standing Certificate)(BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines as to [10] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 10/5/2020 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/26/2020, Entered: 8/26/2020 Order on Motion to Appoint Lead PlaintiffCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [7] Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and approving Lead Plaintiff's selection of Lead Counsel. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/26/2020. (dam, )
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: 6/30/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Robert Angeline re [6] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lead Attorney: Laurence M. Rosen. NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOVANT ROBERT ANGELINES MOTION TO APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVE LEAD PLAINTIFFS SELECTION OF COUNSEL (ROSEN, LAURENCE)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines as to [6] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lead Attorney: Laurence M. Rosen., [7] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lead Plaintiff Attorney: Gustavo F. Bruckner.. Motion set for 7/20/2020 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: 6/16/2020, Terminated: 8/26/2020 Appoint Lead Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff , MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lead Plaintiff Attorney: Gustavo F. Bruckner. by YANG RENBIN. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Brief, # (3) Declaration with Exhibits A-E)(BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: 6/16/2020, Terminated: 7/30/2020 Appoint Lead Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff , MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lead Attorney: Laurence M. Rosen. by Robert Angeline. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Brief, # (3) Declaration of Laurence Rosen, # (4) Exhibit 1 - PSLRA Early Notice, # (5) Exhibit 2 - Movant's PSLRA Certification, # (6) Exhibit 3 - Movant's Loss Chart, # (7) Exhibit 4 - Rosen Law Firm Resume)(ROSEN, LAURENCE)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: 5/28/2020 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULING, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/28/2020. (lag, )
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: 5/22/2020 Letter
                                                                                                                                                  Letter from Scott D. Musoff re: Stipulation and Proposed Order. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(MUSOFF, SCOTT)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: 4/27/2020 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS ISSUED as to LARRY XIANGDONG CHEN, GSX TECHEDU INC., NAN SHEN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: 4/23/2020 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit to [1] Complaint by ZEQIU WU. (Attachments: # (1) Summons, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: 4/17/2020 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10700292) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ZEQIU WU. (Attachments: # (1) Certification Zeqiu Wu, # (2) Schedule A)(BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                          Space Space

                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 388 times.

                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?