Rural Community Worker's Alliance et al v. Smithfield Foods, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Western District Court, Case No. 5:20-cv-06063-DGK
District Judge Greg Kays, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 14, 2020 at 4:59 PM DT (10.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jane Doe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Juno Turner +1 720 441 2236 juno@towardsjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Almasri & Marzwanian Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gina Chiala +1 816 531 2224 +1 816 531 2147 ginachiala@jobsandfreedom.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PUBLIC JUSTICE, P.C. (CA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephanie K. Glaberson +1 202 861 5228 sglaberson@publicjustice.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Towards Justice-Golden

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Hollis Seligman +1 720 248 8426 +1 303 957 2289 david@towardsjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by TRIAL LAWYERS FOR PUBLIC JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karla Gilbride +1 202 797 8600 +1 202 232 7203 kgilbride@publicjustice.net
Space DAVID S. MURASKIN +1 202 797 8600 +1 202 232 7203 dmuraskin@publicjustice.net
No Logo Rural Community Worker's Alliance, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Almasri & Marzwanian Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gina Chiala +1 816 531 2224 +1 816 531 2147 ginachiala@jobsandfreedom.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Towards Justice-Golden

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Hollis Seligman +1 720 248 8426 +1 303 957 2289 david@towardsjustice.org
Space Juno Turner +1 720 441 2236 juno@towardsjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by TRIAL LAWYERS FOR PUBLIC JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karla Gilbride +1 202 797 8600 +1 202 232 7203 kgilbride@publicjustice.net
Space Stephanie K. Glaberson +1 202 861 5228 sglaberson@publicjustice.net
Space DAVID S. MURASKIN +1 202 797 8600 +1 202 232 7203 dmuraskin@publicjustice.net
v.
No Logo Smithfield Foods, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mara Halpert Cohara +1 816 460 5760 +1 816 292 2001 mara.cohara@lathropgpm.com
Space Jean Paul Bradshaw, II +1 816 460 5507 +1 816 292 2001 jeanpaul.bradshaw@lathropgpm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan F. Wiltsie +1 202 955 1546 +1 202 778 2201 swiltsie@hunton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexandra B. Cunningham +1 804 787 8087 acunningham@huntonAK.com
No Logo Smithfield Fresh Meats Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mara Halpert Cohara +1 816 460 5760 +1 816 292 2001 mara.cohara@lathropgpm.com
Space Jean Paul Bradshaw, II +1 816 460 5507 +1 816 292 2001 jeanpaul.bradshaw@lathropgpm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan F. Wiltsie +1 202 955 1546 +1 202 778 2201 swiltsie@hunton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by huntonak.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexandra B. Cunningham +1 804 787 8087 acunningham@huntonAK.com
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None Reconsideration
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Clerk's Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: None Strike
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 30 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: 4/27/2020 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER expediting briefing. Plaintiffs' shall respond to Defendants' emergency motion to dismiss, or in the alternative to stay (Doc. [28] ) by 4/29/2020 at 12:00 p.m. Signed on 4/27/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: 4/27/2020 Suggestions in Support of Motion
                SUGGESTIONS in support re [28] Emergency MOTION to dismiss case , or in the Alternative to Stay, Based on Primary Jurisdiction and/or Burford Abstention filed by Jean Paul Bradshaw, II on behalf of Defendants Smithfield Foods, Inc., Smithfield Fresh Meats Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6)(Related document(s)[28]) (Bradshaw, Jean)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: 4/27/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                  Emergency MOTION to dismiss case , or in the Alternative to Stay, Based on Primary Jurisdiction and/or Burford Abstention filed by Jean Paul Bradshaw, II on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/11/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Bradshaw, Jean)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: 4/27/2020 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                    ORDER setting hearing on [3] MOTION for temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunction. Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2020 at 10:00 AM via Video Teleconference before District Judge Greg Kays. Signed on 4/27/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law clerk)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 26 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: 4/27/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                      ORDER granting [22] motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Susan F. Wiltsie for Smithfield Foods, Inc. and Smithfield Fresh Meats Corp. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
                        LREF
                        Blank 25 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: 4/27/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                        ORDER granting [21] motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Alexandra B. Cunningham for Smithfield Foods, Inc. and Smithfield Fresh Meats Corp. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
                          LREF
                          Blank 24 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: 4/27/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                          ORDER granting [18] motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney David Seligman for Jane Doe and Rural Community Worker's Alliance allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
                            LREF
                            Blank 23 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: 4/27/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                            ORDER granting [17] motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Juno Turner for Jane Doe and Rural Community Worker's Alliance allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: 4/27/2020, Terminated: 4/27/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                              Motion to allow Susan F. Wiltsie to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6835424) filed by Mara Halpert Cohara on behalf of All Defendants. (Cohara, Mara)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: 4/27/2020, Terminated: 4/27/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                Motion to allow Alexandra B. Cunningham to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6835415) filed by Mara Halpert Cohara on behalf of All Defendants. (Cohara, Mara)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank  set/reset hearings
                                  Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2020 10:00 AM via Video Teleconference before District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/26/2020, Entered: 4/26/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER extending Defendants' deadline for filing a response. Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' motion for a TRO and/or preliminary injunction is due on or before 12:00 p.m. on April 29, 2020. A hearing on Plaintiffs' motion will be set for April 30, 2020 by future order. Signed on 4/26/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/25/2020, Entered: 4/25/2020 Notice of filing
                                      NOTICE of filing PLAINTIFFS SUGGESTIONS IN OPPOSITION TO LETTER INCLUDING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Jane Doe, Rural Community Worker's Alliance re [15] Notice of filing (Muraskin, David)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/25/2020, Entered: 4/25/2020, Terminated: 4/27/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                        Motion to allow David Seligman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number BMOWDC-6834976) filed by Gina Chiala on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Chiala, Gina)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/25/2020, Entered: 4/25/2020, Terminated: 4/27/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                          Motion to allow Juno Turner to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6834974) filed by Gina Chiala on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Chiala, Gina)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/25/2020, Entered: 4/25/2020 Notice of appearance
                                            NOTICE of appearance by Mara Halpert Cohara on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Mara Halpert Cohara added to party Smithfield Foods, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mara Halpert Cohara added to party Smithfield Fresh Meats Corp.(pty:dft))(Cohara, Mara)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: 4/24/2020 Notice of filing
                                              NOTICE of filing Letter to the Court by Smithfield Foods, Inc., Smithfield Fresh Meats Corp. (Bradshaw, Jean)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: 4/24/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                NOTICE of appearance by Jean Paul Bradshaw, II on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Jean Paul Bradshaw, II added to party Smithfield Foods, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Paul Bradshaw, II added to party Smithfield Fresh Meats Corp.(pty:dft))(Bradshaw, Jean)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: 4/24/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                  ORDER granting [9] motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney David S. Muraskin for Jane Doe and Rural Community Worker's Alliance allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: 4/24/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                    ORDER granting [8] motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Stephanie K. Glaberson for Jane Doe and Rural Community Worker's Alliance allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: 4/24/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                      ORDER granting [7] motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Karla Gilbride for Jane Doe and Rural Community Worker's Alliance allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: 4/24/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiffs' emergency motion for a temporary restraining order [3] on or before 5:00 p.m. on 4/27/2020. Signed on 4/24/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: 4/24/2020, Terminated: 4/24/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                          Motion to allow David Samuel Muraskin to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6833986) filed by Gina Chiala on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Chiala, Gina)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: 4/24/2020, Terminated: 4/24/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                            Motion to allow Stephanie Glaberson to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6833982) filed by Gina Chiala on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Chiala, Gina)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: 4/24/2020, Terminated: 4/24/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                              Motion to allow Karla Gilbride to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6833974) filed by Gina Chiala on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Chiala, Gina)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: 4/24/2020 Return of Service of Complaint Executed
                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Exhibits including affidavit of service)(Chiala, Gina)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: 4/23/2020 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER denying as moot [4] motion for leave to file. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.0(d)(2), the fifteen-page limit for suggestions in support does not include "[e]xhibits, signature blocks, certificates of service, and statements of fact." Accordingly, Plaintiffs' suggestions in support filed in Doc. [3] do not violate the fifteen-page limit imposed by Local Rule 7.0. Signed on 4/23/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: 4/23/2020, Terminated: 4/23/2020 motion for leave to file
                                                                    MOTION for leave to file additional pages filed by Gina Chiala on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/7/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Chiala, Gina)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: 4/23/2020 Motion for TRO
                                                                      Emergency MOTION for preliminary injunction or, in the alternative, a temporary restraining order and an emergency hearing on the same filed by Gina Chiala on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/7/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # (1) Corbo Signed Declaration, # (2) Fritzsche Signed Declaration, # (3) Fuentes Signed Declaration, # (4) Harrison Signed Declaration and exhibit, # (5) Jane Doe Signed Declaration)(Chiala, Gina). Modified on 4/23/2020 to correct docket event. (Moore, Terri).
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: 4/23/2020 Notice of MAPN
                                                                        NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: # (1) MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: 4/23/2020 Complaint
                                                                          COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Gina Chiala on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6832269. Service due by 7/22/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Chiala, Gina) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/23/2020 to separate the Complaint from the Civil Cover Sheet - original documents were added as one document, removed and added back as two separate documents) (Woods, Gloria). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2020: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria).
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank  Summons issued
                                                                            SUMMONS ISSUED as to Smithfield Foods, Inc., Smithfield Fresh Meats Corp.. (Woods, Gloria)
                                                                              LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 44 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?