Outlet Tile Center v. JPMorgan Chase and Co. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:20-cv-03603-GW-MAA
District Judge George H. Wu, presiding

Tags
Last Updated April 26, 2020 at 1:46 PM DT (1.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Outlet Tile Center, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by taulersmith.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Tauler +1 310 746 5601 +1 424 750 5100 rtauler@taulersmith.com
v.
No Logo Does, Defendant
No Logo Jp Morgan Chase & Co, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: 4/23/2020 Order on motion for Temporary Restraining OrderCourt Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge George H. Wu: denying [10] EX PARTE APPLICATION for TRO. (jag)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: 4/23/2020 Order
    STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (mrgo)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: 4/23/2020, Terminated: 4/23/2020 Motion for temporary restraining orderCourt Filing
      APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Defendants' loan program structuring filed by Plaintiff Outlet Tile Center. Application set for hearing on 4/27/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Robert Tauler in Support of Application, # (2) Declaration of Roberto Gutierrez in Support of Application, # (3) Proposed Order) (Tauler, Robert)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: 4/23/2020 Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
        21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), [1] as to defendant JPMorgan Chase and Co.. (mrgo)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: 4/23/2020 Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
          60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), [1] as to defendant United States of America. (mrgo)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: 4/22/2020 Summons Request
            Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), [1] filed by Plaintiff Outlet Tile Center. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Summons)(Tauler, Robert)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: 4/21/2020 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
              NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Outlet Tile Center, identifying Roberto Gutierrez. (Tauler, Robert)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: 4/21/2020 Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form
                NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) [1]. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: 4/21/2020 Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                  NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: 4/21/2020 Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html formCourt Filing
                    NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (et)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: 4/20/2020 Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                      CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Outlet Tile Center, a California Sole Proprietorship. (Tauler, Robert)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: 4/20/2020 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
                        COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26144898 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Outlet Tile Center, a California Sole Proprietorship. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A to Complaint, # (2) Exhibit B to Complaint) (Attorney Robert Tauler added to party Outlet Tile Center, a California Sole Proprietorship(pty:pla))(Tauler, Robert)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 18 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?