BSJA, Inc. et al v. Wells Fargo and Co et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:20-cv-03588-ODW-JC
District Judge Otis D. Wright, II, presiding

Tags
Last Updated April 26, 2020 at 1:50 PM DT (1.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alexhd, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David M Angeloff +1 310 954 2000 david@stalwartlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by stalwartlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ji-In Lee +1 310 954 2000 jiin@stalwartlaw.com
Space Dylan Ruga +1 310 954 2000 dylan@stalwartlaw.com
No Logo BSJA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by stalwartlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David M Angeloff +1 310 954 2000 david@stalwartlaw.com
Space Ji-In Lee +1 310 954 2000 jiin@stalwartlaw.com
Space Dylan Ruga +1 310 954 2000 dylan@stalwartlaw.com
v.
No Logo Does, Defendant
No Logo WELLS FARGO & CO, Defendant
Unknown Role, NORWEST CORP
Wells Fargo Bank, NA Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Defendant
Unknown Role, NORWEST CORP
Unknown Role, Day Runner, Inc.
Unknown Role, Yucca Uranium Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: 4/23/2020 Summons issued
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] as to defendant Wells Fargo & Co. (lc)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: 4/23/2020 Summons Request
    Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] filed by Plaintiffs Alexhd, LLC, BSJA, Inc.. (Ruga, Dylan)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: 4/23/2020 Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons
      NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request[13]. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Resubmitted request is still incorrect re Named Does in the Caption. As advised in first deficiency. Summons caption erroneously cites Does as 1-" 50"... whereas the Complaint cite it as Does 1- "10". Please correct summons caption correct match that of the complaint. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: 4/22/2020 Summons Request
        Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,,, [12] filed by Plaintiff Alexhd, LLC, BSJA, Inc.. (Ruga, Dylan)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: 4/22/2020 Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue SummonsCourt Filing
          NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request[11]. The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. CLARIFICATION OF THE ABOVE: 1) MISSING Official case number with assigned Judge and Magistrates initials : All filings henceforth to read as: 2:20-cv-03588-ODW-JC. 2) Please review complaint as to does listed as Does 1-10, the summons reads as Does 1-"50". The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: 4/22/2020 Summons Request
            Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, [9], Summons Request[5] filed by Plaintiff Alexhd, LLC, BSJA, Inc.. (Ruga, Dylan)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: 4/21/2020 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
              MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: 4/20/2020 Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons
                NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request[5]. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Incomplete caption. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: 4/20/2020 Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
                  21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint [1] as to defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (esa)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: 4/20/2020 Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                    NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: 4/20/2020 Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html formCourt Filing
                      NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/19/2020, Entered: 4/19/2020 Summons Request
                        Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] filed by Plaintiffs ALEXHD, LLC, BSJA, Inc.. (Ruga, Dylan)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/19/2020, Entered: 4/19/2020 Summons Request
                          Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] filed by Plaintiffs ALEXHD, LLC, BSJA, Inc.. (Ruga, Dylan)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/19/2020, Entered: 4/19/2020 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                            NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs ALEXHD, LLC, BSJA, Inc., (Ruga, Dylan)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/19/2020, Entered: 4/19/2020 Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                              CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs ALEXHD, LLC, BSJA, Inc.. (Ruga, Dylan)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/19/2020, Entered: 4/19/2020 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
                                COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiffs BSJA, Inc., ALEXHD, LLC. (Attorney Dylan Ruga added to party ALEXHD, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Dylan Ruga added to party BSJA, Inc.(pty:pla))(Ruga, Dylan)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 24 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?