Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. v. Northland Television, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Wisconsin Western District Court, Case No. 3:20-cv-00385-wmc
District Judge William M. Conley, presiding

Tags
Last Updated November 13, 2020 at 5:39 PM ST (10.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Husch Blackwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa M. Lawless +1 414 978 5438 +1 414 223 5000 lisa.lawless@huschblackwell.com
Space Eric M. McLeod +1 608 234 6056 +1 608 258 7138 eric.mcleod@huschblackwell.com
Space Lane E Ruhland +1 608 258 7380 Lane.Ruhland@huschblackwell.com
v.
No Logo Northland Television, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ashley Ivy Kissinger +1 303 376 2407 +1 303 296 3956 kissingera@ballardspahr.com
Space Charles D. Tobin +1 202 661 2218 +1 202 661 2299 tobinc@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Godfrey & Kahn, S.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brady C Williamson +1 608 257 3911 +1 608 257 0609 bwilliam@gklaw.com
Space Mike Brady Wittenwyler +1 608 284 2616 +1 608 257 0609 wittenwyler@gklaw.com
No Logo Priorities USA Action, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gillian Kuhlmann +1 310 788 3245 +1 310 788 3399 GKuhlmann@perkinscoie.com
Space Sopen Bharat Shah +60866 374 60x7408 +1 608 663 7499 SShah@perkinscoie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David L Anstaett +1 608 663 5408 +1 608 663 7499 DAnstaett@perkinscoie.com
Space Marc Erik Elias +1 202 628 6600 +1 202 434 1690 melias@perkinscoie.com
Space Brandon Michael Lewis +1 608 294 4009 +1 608 663 7499 blewis@perkinscoie.com
Space Ezra W. Reese +1 202 434 1616 +1 202 434 1690 ereese@perkinscoie.com
Office Madison
Filed 4/27/2020
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Dane
Terminated
Origin 2
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case 20-CV-000030[Price County Circuit Court]
Defendant Custody Status
Flag UA
  Entries (70) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 61 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: 7/30/2020 Response Stating No Opposition
Response Stating No Opposition by Defendant Northland Television, LLC and Intervenor Defendant Priorities USA Action re: [58] Motion for Leave to File, filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. (Williamson, Brady) Modified on 7/30/2020. (lak)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/29/2020, Entered: 7/29/2020 Pretrial Conference OrderCourt Filing
    Pretrial Conference Order - Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Dispositive Motions due 6/1/2021. Settlement Letters due 10/15/2021. Motions in Limine due 10/22/2021. Response to Motion due 11/5/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/16/2021 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 12/6/2021 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/29/2020. (rks)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: 7/28/2020 Brief in Reply
      Brief in Reply by Intervenor Defendant Priorities USA Action in Support of [25] Motion to Dismiss (Anstaett, David)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 58 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: 7/27/2020 motion for leave to file
        Motion for Leave to File Tables For Plaintiff's Oppositions To Motion To Dismiss Of Defendants WJFW-NBC And Priorities USA Action by Plaintiff Donald J. Trump for President, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Tables For Plaintiff's Oppositions To Motion To Dismiss Of Defendants WJFW-NBC And Priorities USA Action) (Lawless, Lisa)
          LREF
          Blank 57 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: 7/24/2020 Text-Only OrderCourt Filing
          ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** At the July 24, 2020 telephonic preliminary pretrial conference, the court granted intervening defendant Priorities USA Action's unopposed oral motion to extend its deadline to file a reply brief to July 28, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/24/2020. (voc)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank  Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 7/24/2020 [:10] (cak)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: None Dismiss
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 56 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: 7/20/2020 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                  ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting [55] Motion for Leave to File. Cf. Hyperphrase v. Microsoft, 2003 WL 21920041 (W.D. Wis. 2003). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/20/2020. (rks)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 55 Filed: 7/18/2020, Entered: 7/18/2020, Terminated: 7/20/2020 motion for leave to file
                    Emergency Motion for Leave to File Opposition Brief (Doc.54) Instanter by Plaintiff Donald J. Trump for President, Inc.. (Lawless, Lisa)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 54 Filed: 7/18/2020, Entered: 7/18/2020 Brief in Opposition
                      Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. re: [25] Motion to Dismiss filed by Priorities USA Action (Lawless, Lisa)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 53 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: 7/10/2020 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
                        Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Al-Amyn S. Sumar re: Defendant Northland Television, LLC (Sumar, Al-Amyn)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: 7/9/2020 Discovery Plan
                          Discovery Plan (Lawless, Lisa)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  Set Pretrial or Status Conference
                            Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 7/14/2020 at 02:00 PM rescheduled to 7/24/2020 at 11:30 AM to accommodate the court's calendar. Counsel for Plaintiff remains responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. (cak)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 51 Filed: 6/23/2020, Entered: 6/23/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting [23] Motion to Intervene. Plaintiff's filing at dkt. [48] is accepted as a "supplement" to its complaint. Briefing set as to [25] MOTION TO DISMISS. Brief in Opposition due 7/17/2020. Brief in Reply due 7/27/2020. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/23/2020. (rks)
                                LREF
                                Blank  Set Pretrial or Status Conference
                                Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 7/14/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (rks)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: 6/19/2020 Brief in Opposition
                                  Brief in Opposition by Defendant Northland Television, LLC re: [49] Motion for Leave to File, filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. (Williamson, Brady)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: 6/19/2020 motion for leave to file
                                    Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply on Motion to Dismiss [Doc.9] Or In Alternative To Disregard New Argument Asserted In Reply by Plaintiff Donald J. Trump for President, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Plaintiff's Proposed Sur-Reply on Motion to Dismiss [Doc.9]) (Lawless, Lisa)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document 48 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: 6/18/2020 Complaint
                                      COMPLAINT by Plaintiff Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. against Priorities USA Action. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2699901.), filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1 Mar 23, 2020 press release, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2 Exponential Threat screenshots, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3 Mar 30, 2020 press release, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 4 One Week Later screenshots, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit 5 Mar 26, 2020 letter to TV station managers, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit 6 Mar 26, 2020 press release, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit 7 Mar 27, 2020 press release, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit 8 Apr 1, 2020 press release, # (9) Exhibit Exhibit B Saletan tweet, # (10) Exhibit Exhibit C Check Your Fact article, # (11) Exhibit Exhibit D Snopes article, # (12) Exhibit Exhibit E Washington Post Article, # (13) Exhibit Exhibit F PolitiFact article, # (14) Exhibit Exhibit G Mar 25, 2020 cease and desist letter) (Lawless, Lisa)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: 6/11/2020 Response Stating No Opposition
                                        Response Stating No Opposition by Plaintiff Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. re: [23] Motion to Intervene filed by Priorities USA Action (Lawless, Lisa)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: 6/8/2020 Declaration
                                          Supplemental Declaration of Jill Bradshaw filed by Defendant Northland Television, LLC re: [8] Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Karofsky v. WMC Issues Mobilization Council, Inc.) (Williamson, Brady)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: 6/8/2020 Brief in Reply
                                            Brief in Reply by Defendant Northland Television, LLC in Support of [8] Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice (Williamson, Brady)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: 6/8/2020 Brief in Reply
                                              Notice of Withdrawal of [13] Motion to Remand by Plaintiff Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. (Lawless, Lisa) Modified on 6/9/2020 (rks).
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: 5/28/2020 Notice - other
                                                Notice by Defendant Northland Television, LLC re [41] Declaration,, [42] Declaration,, [40] Declaration,,,, Correspondence to Court. (Williamson, Brady)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: 5/28/2020 Declaration
                                                  Declaration of Randall D. Smith filed by Defendant Northland Television, LLC in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand re: [13] Motion to Remand (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - 2019 property tax bill, # (2) Exhibit B - insurance policy excerpt, # (3) Exhibit C - voter card, # (4) Exhibit D - voter card, # (5) Exhibit E - driver's license, # (6) Exhibit F - driver's license, # (7) Exhibit G - vehicle registration, # (8) Exhibit H - vehicle registration, # (9) Exhibit I - 2018 state return excerpt, # (10) Exhibit J - 2018 federal return excerpt) (Williamson, Brady)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: 5/28/2020 Declaration
                                                    Declaration of Mary Smith filed by Defendant Northland Television, LLC in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand re: [13] Motion to Remand (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - account statement, # (2) Exhibit B - account statement, # (3) Exhibit C - driver's license, # (4) Exhibit D - driver's license, # (5) Exhibit E - vehicle registration, # (6) Exhibit F - 2018 state return excerpt, # (7) Exhibit G - 2018 federal return excerpt) (Williamson, Brady)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: 5/28/2020 Declaration
                                                      Declaration of Joseph Fuchs filed by Defendant Northland Television, LLC in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand re: [13] Motion to Remand (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - 2019 property tax bill, # (2) Exhibit B - account statement, # (3) Exhibit C - account statement, # (4) Exhibit D - account statement, # (5) Exhibit E - voter card, # (6) Exhibit F - driver's license, # (7) Exhibit G - driver's license, # (8) Exhibit H - vehicle registration, # (9) Exhibit I - vehicle registration, # (10) Exhibit J - 2018 federal tax return excerpt, # (11) Exhibit K - 2017 federal tax return excerpt, # (12) Exhibit L - 2013 federal tax return excerpt, # (13) Exhibit M - 2018 New York tax return excerpt, # (14) Exhibit N - 2018 Maine tax return excerpt, # (15) Exhibit O - 2018 Wisconsin tax return excerpt, # (16) Exhibit P - audit letter and relevant pages from 2015 and 2016 tax returns, # (17) Exhibit Q - financial statement, # (18) Exhibit R - FCC ownership report, # (19) Exhibit S - invoice from CT Corporation, # (20) Exhibit T - utility bills, # (21) Exhibit U - utility bills, # (22) Exhibit V - 2019 property tax bill, # (23) Exhibit W - membership card) (Williamson, Brady)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document 39 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: 5/28/2020 Brief in Opposition
                                                        Brief in Opposition by Defendant Northland Television, LLC re: [13] Motion to Remand filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. (Williamson, Brady)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 38 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: 5/28/2020 Brief in Opposition
                                                          Corrected Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. re: [8] Motion to Dismiss filed by Northland Television, LLC (Lawless, Lisa)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 37 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: 5/28/2020 Brief in Opposition
                                                            Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. re: [8] Motion to Dismiss filed by Northland Television, LLC (Lawless, Lisa)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 36 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: 5/18/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER denying [17] Emergency Motion to Stay. Plaintiff may now have until June 11, 2020, to respond to [23] Motion to Intervene. The pretrial conference originally scheduled for June 11, 2020, is STRUCK. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/18/2020. (rks)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 35 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: 5/18/2020 Brief in Opposition
                                                                Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. re: [23] Motion to Intervene filed by Priorities USA Action (Requesting Stay of Proceedings on Motion to Intervene Pending Ruling on Motion to Remand) (Lawless, Lisa)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: 5/18/2020 Brief in Opposition
                                                                  Brief in Opposition by Intervenor Defendant Priorities USA Action re: [17] Motion to Stay, filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. (Elias, Marc)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: 5/18/2020 Brief in Reply
                                                                    Brief in Reply by Plaintiff Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. in Support of [17] Motion to Stay, Emergency Motion to Stay (Lawless, Lisa)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank  Notice to Counsel
                                                                      Notice to Counsel: Briefing on the proposed intervenor's motion to dismiss (dkt. [25]) is suspended, to be reset at a future date, if needed. (rks/nks)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 32 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: 5/14/2020 Brief in Opposition
                                                                        Brief in Opposition by Defendant Northland Television, LLC re: [17] Motion to Stay, filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. (Williamson, Brady)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: 5/12/2020 Order on Motion to Admit Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                          ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting [22] Motion to Admit Ezra Woolf Reese Pro Hac Vice; granting [28] Motion to Admit Gillian Kuhlmann Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 5/12/2020. (lak)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: 5/12/2020 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Intervenor Defendant Priorities USA Action. (Elias, Marc)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: 5/12/2020 Brief in Support
                                                                              Brief in Support of [17] Motion to Stay, Request to Enter Order on Schedule by Plaintiff Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on schedule) (Lawless, Lisa)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: 5/12/2020, Terminated: 5/12/2020 Motion to Admit Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                Motion to Admit Gillian Kuhlmann Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2676578.) by Intervenor Defendant Priorities USA Action. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Kuhlmann, Gillian)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: 5/12/2020 Declaration
                                                                                  Declaration of Brandon M. Lewis filed by Intervenor Defendant Priorities USA Action re: [25] Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: Mitchum v. Capps Order) (Lewis, Brandon)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: 5/12/2020 Brief in Support
                                                                                    Brief in Support of [25] Motion to Dismiss by Intervenor Defendant Priorities USA Action (Elias, Marc)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: 5/12/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                      MOTION TO DISMISS by Intervenor Defendant Priorities USA Action. Brief in Opposition due 6/2/2020. Brief in Reply due 6/12/2020. (Elias, Marc)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: 5/12/2020 Brief in Support
                                                                                        Brief in Support of [23] Motion to Intervene by Intervenor Defendant Priorities USA Action (Elias, Marc)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: 5/12/2020 Motion to intervene
                                                                                          Motion to Intervene by Intervenor Defendant Priorities USA Action. Response due 5/19/2020. (Elias, Marc)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: 5/12/2020, Terminated: 5/12/2020 Motion to Admit Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                            Motion to Admit Ezra Woolf Reese Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2676500.) by Intervenor Defendant Priorities USA Action. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Reese, Ezra)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: 5/12/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                              Notice of Appearance Sopen B. Shah filed by Sopen Bharat Shah for Intervenor Defendant Priorities USA Action. (Shah, Sopen)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: 5/12/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                Notice of Appearance Brandon M. Lewis filed by Brandon Michael Lewis for Intervenor Defendant Priorities USA Action. (Lewis, Brandon)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: 5/12/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance David L. Anstaett filed by David L. Anstaett for Intervenor Defendant Priorities USA Action. (Anstaett, David)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: 5/12/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance Marc Elias filed by Marc Erik Elias for Intervenor Defendant Priorities USA Action. (Elias, Marc)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: 5/11/2020, Terminated: 5/18/2020 Motion To Stay
                                                                                                      Emergency Motion to Stay re [8] MOTION TO DISMISS Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice Pending Court's Determination of Jurisdiction (Motion to Remand) by Plaintiff Donald J. Trump for President, Inc.. Response due 5/18/2020. (Lawless, Lisa)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: 5/11/2020 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Donald J. Trump for President, Inc.. (Lawless, Lisa)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Set Pretrial or Status Conference
                                                                                                          Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2020 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (rks)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/7/2020, Entered: 5/7/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                            Declaration of Lisa M. Lawless filed by Plaintiff Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. re: [13] Motion to Remand (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex. 1 Southhampton NY property tax records for Randall Smith, # (2) Exhibit Ex. 2 Information re 885 Third Ave., New York, NY, # (3) Exhibit Ex. 3 NY Dept. of State, Alden Global Capital LLC, # (4) Exhibit Ex. 4 Alden Global Capital Wikipedia entry, # (5) Exhibit Ex. 5 NYC property ownership search for Randall Smith, # (6) Exhibit Ex. 6 NYC property records for 605 Park Ave. Penthouse Unit, # (7) Exhibit Ex. 7 NYC property records for 605 Park Ave. Unit 208, # (8) Exhibit Ex. 8 Information on 605 Park Ave. building, # (9) Exhibit Ex. 9 Florida Elections contribution records, Aug. 29, 2014, # (10) Exhibit Ex. 10 Florida Elections contribution records, Apr. 6, 2018, # (11) Exhibit Ex. 11 Florida Elections contribution record, Mar. 24, 2014, # (12) Exhibit Ex. 12 Vanity Fair article, Feb. 5, 2020, # (13) Exhibit Ex. 13 The Nation article, Sept. 27, 2017, # (14) Exhibit Ex. 14 Hamptons.com article, 2013, # (15) Exhibit Ex. 15 Palm Beach Daily News article, Aug. 8, 2013, # (16) Exhibit Ex. 16 Poynter Institute article, Jul. 27, 2011, # (17) Exhibit Ex. 17 Southampton Property Records for R. Joseph Fuchs) (Lawless, Lisa)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/7/2020, Entered: 5/7/2020 Brief in Support
                                                                                                              Brief in Support of [13] Motion to Remand to State Court due to Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Plaintiff Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. (Lawless, Lisa)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/7/2020, Entered: 5/7/2020, Terminated: 6/9/2020 Motion to remand
                                                                                                                MOTION TO REMAND to State Court due to Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Plaintiff Donald J. Trump for President, Inc.. Brief in Opposition due 5/28/2020. Brief in Reply due 6/8/2020. (Lawless, Lisa)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: 5/6/2020 Exhibit
                                                                                                                  Exhibit to [10] Declaration,, filed by Northland Television, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit O - Article by Lev Facher (February 29, 2020), # (2) Exhibit P - Article published by France24 (February 29, 2020), # (3) Exhibit Q - Article by Dareh Gregorian (February 29, 2020), # (4) Exhibit R - FEC filing in MUR 7135, # (5) Exhibit S - Transcript of White House Daily Press Briefing (May 10, 2017), # (6) Exhibit T - Press release published by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. (May 4, 2020), # (7) Exhibit U - White House transcript (February 29, 2020), # (8) Exhibit V - Tweet by President Donald J. Trump (May 3, 2020)) (Williamson, Brady)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: 5/6/2020 Exhibit
                                                                                                                    Exhibit to [10] Declaration,, filed by Northland Television, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit H - Press Release by Priorities USA (March 27, 2020), # (2) Exhibit I - Article by Nancy Cook and Matthew Choi (February 28, 2020), # (3) Exhibit J - Opinion in Marjala v. Fox News Network LLC, # (4) Exhibit K - Article by Phil Thomas (March 1, 2020), # (5) Exhibit L - Article by John Kennedy (March 2, 2020), # (6) Exhibit M - Article by Lauren Egan (February 28, 2020), # (7) Exhibit N - Article by Kevin Freking (February 28, 2020)) (Williamson, Brady)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: 5/6/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                      Declaration of Jill Bradshaw filed by Defendant Northland Television, LLC re: [8] Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Transcript of February 28, 2020 speech, # (2) Exhibit B - Article by Matthew J. Belvedere (January 22, 2020), # (3) Exhibit C - White House transcript (February 27, 2020), # (4) Exhibit D - White House transcript (February 26, 2020), # (5) Exhibit E - White House transcript (March 6, 2020), # (6) Exhibit F - Transcript of advertisement titled "Exponential Threat", # (7) Exhibit G - DVD containing advertisement titled "Exponential Threat") (Williamson, Brady)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: 5/6/2020 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                        Brief in Support of [8] Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice by Defendant Northland Television, LLC (Williamson, Brady)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: 5/6/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                          MOTION TO DISMISS Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice by Defendant Northland Television, LLC. Brief in Opposition due 5/27/2020. Brief in Reply due 6/8/2020. (Williamson, Brady)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: 4/28/2020 Order on Motion to Admit Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting [4] Motion to Admit Charles D. Tobin Pro Hac Vice; granting [5] Motion to Admit Ashley I. Kissinger Pro Hac Vice; granting [6] Motion to Admit Al-Amyn Sumar Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 4/28/2020. (lak)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: 4/28/2020, Terminated: 4/28/2020 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                              Motion to Admit Al-Amyn S. Sumar Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2668540.) by Defendant Northland Television, LLC. (Sumar, Al-Amyn)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: 4/28/2020, Terminated: 4/28/2020 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                Motion to Admit Ashley I. Kissinger Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2668528.) by Defendant Northland Television, LLC. (Kissinger, Ashley)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: 4/28/2020, Terminated: 4/28/2020 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                  Motion to Admit Charles D. Tobin Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2668523.) by Defendant Northland Television, LLC. (Tobin, Charles)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  Standard Attachments Sent
                                                                                                                                    Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: NORTC, Corporate Disclosure Statement. (rks)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank  Add Judge for Shell Case Opening
                                                                                                                                      Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (rks)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: 4/27/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance filed by Mike Brady Wittenwyler for Defendant Northland Television, LLC. (Wittenwyler, Mike)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: 4/27/2020 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Northland Television, LLC. (Williamson, Brady)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: 4/27/2020 notice of removal
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Price County Circuit Court, case number 20-cv-000030. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2667877), filed by Northland Television, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, # (3) Exhibit B - Other Complaints, # (4) Exhibit C - State Court Notice of Filing) (Williamson, Brady)
                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 136 times.

                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?