Umeda et al v. Tesla Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:20-cv-02926-SVK
Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen, presiding

Tags
Last Updated February 26, 2021 at 2:51 PM ST (2.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Miyu Umeda, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Edward C. Chen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward C Chen +1 949 287 4278 +1 949 287 4278 Edward.Chen@edchenlaw.com
No Logo Tomomi Umeda, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Edward C. Chen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward C Chen +1 949 287 4278 +1 949 287 4278 Edward.Chen@edchenlaw.com
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bowman and Brooke LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vincent Galvin, Jr. +1 408 279 5393 +1 408 279 5845 vgalvin@bowman-brooke.com
Space Chancellor Way-Chan Tseng +1 408 279 5393 chancellor.tseng@bowmanandbrooke.com
Office San Jose
Filed 4/28/2020
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $5000000000
Nature of Suit 245 - Real Property: Tort Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Outside US
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP,CONSENT
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/23/2021, Entered: None USCA Case Number
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/17/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: None Reconsideration
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: None Transcript Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: None Transcript Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 34 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: 8/24/2020 Response (Non-Motion)
                              RESPONSE re [27] Objection to Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s Reply by Tesla Inc.. (Tseng, Chancellor) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: 8/24/2020 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [28] Motion for Leave to File Response to Objections to Reply. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/24/2020. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: 8/21/2020, Terminated: 8/24/2020 motion for leave to file
                                  MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to Tesla's Reply Evidence filed by Tesla Inc.. (Tseng, Chancellor) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: 8/18/2020 Objection
                                    OBJECTIONS to re [26] Reply to Opposition/Response, New Reply Evidence, and Request to Strike New Arguments and Second Declaration of Atsushi Yamashita, by Miyu Umeda, Tomomi Umeda. (Chen, Edward) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: 8/11/2020 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                      REPLY (re [15] First MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byTesla Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, Supplemental Declaration of Atsushi Yamashita, # (2) Proposed Order Granting Forum non Conveniens Motion to Dismiss, # (3) Proposed Order on Tesla's Objections to Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice)(Tseng, Chancellor) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: 8/3/2020 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / ReplyCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [23] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [15] First MOTION to Dismiss . Reply due by 8/11/2020. Hearing on Motion to Dismiss continued to 9/8/2020 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/3/2020.(svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: 7/31/2020 Declaration in Support
                                          Declaration of Chancellor W. Tseng in Support of [23] First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [15] First MOTION to Dismiss filed byTesla Inc.. (Related document(s)[23]) (Tseng, Chancellor) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: 7/30/2020, Terminated: 8/3/2020 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                            First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [15] First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tesla Inc.. (Tseng, Chancellor) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/29/2020, Entered: 7/30/2020 Request For Judicial Notice
                                              Request for Judicial Notice re [21] Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byMiyu Umeda, Tomomi Umeda. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Edward Chen ISO RJN, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Exhibit 10, # (12) Exhibit 11, # (13) Exhibit 12)(Related document(s)[21]) (Chen, Edward) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/29/2020, Entered: 7/29/2020 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [15] First MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byMiyu Umeda, Tomomi Umeda. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Edward Chen, # (2) Exhibit A to Chen Decl., # (3) Declaration of Shotaro Nagai, # (4) Declaration of Toshifumi Minami, # (5) Declaration of Shuhei Sasaki)(Chen, Edward) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: 7/22/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [19] Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/29/2020. Replies due by 8/5/2020. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 7/22/2020.(svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: 7/22/2020, Terminated: 7/22/2020 stipulation
                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [15] First MOTION to Dismiss for Modified Briefing Schedule filed by Miyu Umeda, Tomomi Umeda. (Chen, Edward) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: 7/14/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Mike Hitoshi Madokoro (Madokoro, Mike) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: 7/8/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting [16] Stipulation to Continue Rule 26(f) Conference, Initial Disclosures, Initial Case Management Conference, and Related Deadlines. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 7/8/2020. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: 7/8/2020, Terminated: 7/8/2020 stipulation
                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES filed by Tesla Inc.. (Tseng, Chancellor) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: 7/8/2020 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                            First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tesla Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Responses due by 7/22/2020. Replies due by 7/29/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Atsushi Yamashita)(Tseng, Chancellor) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER denying without prejudice [13] Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 7/2/2020. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: 7/1/2020, Terminated: 7/2/2020 Motion To StayCourt Filing
                                                                MOTION to Stay filed by Tesla Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Responses due by 7/15/2020. Replies due by 7/22/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Vincent Galvin and Exhibit A)(Tseng, Chancellor) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: 5/22/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Galvin for Defendant Tesla, Inc. (Galvin, Vincent) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: 5/22/2020 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                    Certificate of Interested Entities by Tesla Inc. (Tseng, Chancellor) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: 5/22/2020 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                      ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Defendant Tesla, Inc. (Tseng, Chancellor) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: 5/22/2020 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                        CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tesla Inc... (Tseng, Chancellor) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: 5/22/2020 Answer
                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byTesla Inc.. (Tseng, Chancellor) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: 5/22/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Chancellor Way-Chan Tseng for Defendant Tesla, Inc. (Tseng, Chancellor) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: 5/13/2020 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                              CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Miyu Umeda, Tomomi Umeda.. (Chen, Edward) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: 4/29/2020 Summons issued
                                                                                Summons Issued as to Tesla Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: 4/29/2020 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                  Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/28/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: 4/29/2020 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                                                                    Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/13/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: 4/28/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                      Proposed Summons. (Chen, Edward) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: 4/28/2020 Complaint
                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Tesla Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14419005.). Filed byTomomi Umeda, Miyu Umeda. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Chen, Edward) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 574 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?