ROYCE ASSOCIATES, et al v. FEDERAL PACIFIC ELEC, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:02-cv-03360-DMC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ROYCE ASSOCIATES, L.P., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf, Block, Schorr and Solis-Cohen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM J. FRIEDMAN +1 973 228 5700
v.
No Logo FEDERAL PACIFIC ELECTRIC CORP., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Riker, Danzig, Scherer, Hyland, Perretti, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DENNIS J. KRUMHOLZ +1 973 538 0800 dkrumholz@riker.com
No Logo JOHN DOE, INC., Defendant
No Logo Reliance Electric Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JAMES C. ORR +1 973 624 0800 +1 214 526 7910 orrj@wemed.com
No Logo RELIANCE ELECTRIC CORP, Defendant
No Logo DENTREE ASSOCIATE, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norris, McLaughlin & Marcus, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARTHA N. DONOVAN +1 908 722 0700 mndonovan@nmmlaw.com
No Logo RITA WOLDENBERG, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Norris, McLaughlin & Marcus, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARTHA N. DONOVAN +1 908 722 0700 mndonovan@nmmlaw.com
Office Newark
Filed 7/12/2002
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 6901 Environmental Cleanup Expenses
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Essex
Terminated 6/16/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BN, CLOSED, LEAD, RULE16
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 24 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER and AGREED that the this matter captioned Royce Associates L.P. vs. Federal Pacific Electric Company action No. 02-3360 (DMC) is hereby dismissed w/prejduce and it is further Ordered that the matter captioned DENTREE ASSOCIATES AND RITA WOLDENBERG VS. FEDERAL PACIFIC ELECTRIC COMPANY civil action No. 02-3382 (DMC) be and hereby is dismissed w/prejudice. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over this case pursuant to settlement agreement. etc. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 11/22/04. (JB, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 23 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
    ORDER DISMISSING CASE w/out costs and w/prejudice w/the right to re-open the action in 90 days if settlement agreement is not consummated.. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 06/16/04. (JB, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004 Settlement Conference
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Falk: Settlement Conference held on 6/14/2004. (mm-sl, )
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004 Telephone Conference
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Falk: Telephone Conference held on 6/9/2004. (mm, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 22 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER SCHEDULING Settlement Conference for 5/24/2004 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. Status Conference set for 5/24/2004 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk.. Signed by Judge Mark Falk on 05/19/04. (JB, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 Settlement Conference
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Falk: Settlement Conference held on 5/17/2004. (McNerney, L)
              LREF
              Legal Document 21 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER SCHEDULING Settlement Conference set for 5/17/2004 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. Status Conference set for 5/17/2004 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk.. Signed by Judge Mark Falk on 04/28/04. (JB, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Settlement Conference
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Falk: Settlement Conference held on 4/27/2004. (McNerney, L)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/21/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER SCHEDULING Settlement Conference set for 4/22/2004 09:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. Status Conference set for 4/22/2004 09:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk.. Signed by Judge Mark Falk on 03/18/04. (JB, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/23/2004 Telephone Conference
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Falk : Telephone Conference held on 3/17/2004. (ej, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004 Telephone Conference
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Falk : Telephone Conference held on 3/15/2004. (ej, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                        CASE MANAGEMENT RDER Discovery due by 5/15/2004. Discovery Hearing set for 3/4/2004 10:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk.. Signed by Judge Mark Falk on 03/01/04. (JB, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004 Telephone Conference
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Falk : Telephone Conference held on 2/13/2004. (ej, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/5/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER, extending discovery for the conclusion until 4/14/04 etc. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk ) (NM) (JB)
                              LREF
                              Blank 17 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/5/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER, that sharing the incurred shipping costs on a equal (50/50) basis w/plaintiffs, defendant, FP, etc. setting a case/management discovery conference for 10:30 10/22/03 signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk ) (NM) (JB)
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER, fact discovery shall remain open until 1/15/04 A case management discovery conference shall be held before the Hon. Mark Falk, U.S.M.J. on 08/21/03 at 10:00am. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk ) (NM) (JB)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER, setting status conference for 10:30 7/17/03 ( signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk ) (NM) (JB)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                    RULE 7.1 DISCLOUSURE STATEMENT by RELIANCE ELECTRIC CO (JB)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 13 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                      ANSWER by RELIANCE ELECTRIC CO to SECOND amended complaint; jury demand (JB)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 12 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                        ANSWER by RELIANCE ELECTRIC CO to amended complaint; jury demand w/certf of service. (JB)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 11 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER, setting status conference for 10:00 5/14/03 ( signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk ) (NM) (JB)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Summons Issued
                                            SUMMONS(ES) issued for RELIANCE ELECTRIC CORP. ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (JB) Modified on 01/31/2003
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 10 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Amended Complaint
                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT by ROYCE ASSOCIATES , amending [3-1] amended complaint against RELIANCE ELECTRIC CORP. (JB) Modified on 02/13/2003
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Summons Issued
                                                SUMMONS(ES) issued for RELIANCE ELECTRIC CO ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (JB)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Amended Complaint
                                                  SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by DENTREE ASSOCIATE, RITA WOLDENBERG, (in civ. 02-3382) (Answer due 1/27/03 for FEDERAL PACIFIC ELEC ) amending [3-1] amended complaint against RELIANCE ELECTRIC CO (JB) Modified on 01/31/2003
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER, consolidating cases 02-3382 and 02-3360 for purposes of discovery and trial etc. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk ) (NM) (bl) Modified on 01/16/2003
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Set/Clear Flags
                                                      Consolidated Lead Case (bl)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Case No Longer Referred to Arbitration
                                                        CASE WITHDRAWN from Arbitration. (cc)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                          PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER setting Amending of pleadings on 1/2/03 ; Joining of Parties 1/2/03 Discovery cutoff 1/14/03 ; Status conference 10:00 2/27/03 ; Settlement conference 10:00 2/27/03 ; ( signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk )(NM) (JB)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: 10/2/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            LETTER ORDER, set scheduling conference for 9:00 12/6/02 ; etc. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk ) (NM) (DD)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                              ANSWER by FEDERAL PACIFIC ELEC to amended complaint; jury demand & cert. of service. (mn)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED as to JOHN DOE, INC. 8/15/02 Answer deadline projected for 10/15/02 for FEDERAL PACIFIC ELEC (JB)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 Amended Complaint
                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT by ROYCE ASSOCIATES , (Answer due 9/9/02 for FEDERAL PACIFIC ELECTRIC ) amending [1-1] complaint (JB)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 Case Referred to Arbitration
                                                                    CASE REFERRED to arbitration (femp)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 Summons Issued
                                                                      SUMMONS(ES) issued for FEDERAL PACIFIC ELEC ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (femp)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                        NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. ( NEWARK - Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh - Magistrate Judge Mark Falk) (NM) (femp)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 Complaint
                                                                          COMPLAINT filed; jury demand FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 309320 (femp)
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 59 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?