Thomson Reuters Enterprise Centre GmbH et al v. ROSS Intelligence Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:20-cv-00613-UNA
District Judge Unassigned Judge, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 12, 2021 at 6:27 PM DT (3 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Thomson Reuters Enterprise Centre GmbH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
Space Michael J. Flynn +1 302 351 9661 +1 302 498 6217 mflynn@mnat.com
No Logo West Publishing Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
Space Michael J. Flynn +1 302 351 9661 +1 302 498 6217 mflynn@mnat.com
v.
No Logo ROSS Intelligence Inc., Defendant
Office Wilmington
Filed 5/6/2020
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
Cause Section 17 U.S.C. § 101 Copyright Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County New Castle
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Service
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: None Notice of Service
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/22/2021, Entered: None Order Setting Mediation Conferences
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/7/2021, Entered: None Letter
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/7/2021, Entered: None Order Setting Mediation Conferences
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: None Request for Oral Argument
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: None Notice - Other
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: None Notice - Other
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Proposed Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Notice of Service
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Notice of Service
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Brief - Reply
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Service
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Notice of Service
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Scheduling Order - General
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Dismiss/Fail to State Claim
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None Opinion - Memorandum Opinion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Stipulation to EXTEND Time
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: None Brief - Opening Brief in Support
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: None Dismiss/Fail to State Claim
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: None Stipulation to EXTEND Time
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Notice - Other
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Request for Oral Argument
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: None Brief - Reply
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None Stipulation to EXTEND Time
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None Brief - Opening Brief in Support
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None Dismiss/Fail to State Claim
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None Stipulation to EXTEND Time
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: None Copyright Report to Register of Copyrights
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: 5/6/2020 Summons Issued - Electronic
                                                                                                      Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: 5/6/2020 Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                        Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Thomson Reuters Corporation for Thomson Reuters Enterprise Centre GmbH and West Publishing Corporation filed by Thomson Reuters Enterprise Centre GmbH and West Publishing Corporation. (mal)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: 5/6/2020 Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner
                                                                                                          Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) see attached list. (mal)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: 5/6/2020 Magistrate Consent FormsCourt Filing
                                                                                                            Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: 5/6/2020 Complaint
                                                                                                              COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against ROSS Intelligence Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-2919270.) - filed by West Publishing Corporation, Thomson Reuters Enterprise Centre GmbH. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)
                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 50 times.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?