Tesla Incorporated v. County of Alameda
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:20-cv-03186-TSH
District Judge Thomas S. Hixson, presiding

Tags
Last Updated May 20, 2020 at 4:11 PM DT (1.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Tesla Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kyle Kenneth Batter +1 650 801 5000 +1 650 801 5000 kylebatter@gmail.com
v.
No Logo County of Alameda, California, Defendant
Officially listed as "County of Alameda"
Office Oakland
Filed 5/9/2020
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 950 - Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Constitutionality of State Statutes
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Alameda
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: 5/12/2020 Summons issued
      Summons Issued as to County of Alameda. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: 5/12/2020 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
        Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: 5/11/2020 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
          Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/26/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/9/2020, Entered: 5/9/2020 Proposed Summons
            Proposed Summons. (Batter, Kyle) (Filed on 5/9/2020)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/9/2020, Entered: 5/9/2020 Complaint
              COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against County of Alameda ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14454322.). Filed byTesla Incorporated. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Batter, Kyle) (Filed on 5/9/2020)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 843 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?