TEACHERS PLACEMENT v. NEWARK PUBLIC SCHOOL, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:02-cv-03429-JCL-MF

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo TEACHERS PLACEMENT GROUP, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MATTHEW V. DELDUCA +1 609 620 3200 mdelduca@dechert.com
No Logo ALAM NOOR, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
No Logo DEEPIKA SABERWAL, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
No Logo JANAKI RAGHAVAN, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
No Logo JYOTI ANIL GOUR, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
No Logo LEO SIMEON, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
No Logo MADHURI PHILKHANA, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
No Logo MANJU MISRA, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
No Logo MAYA NAYAR, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
No Logo MINI P. JAYAPRAKASH, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
No Logo MRIDULA BAJAJ, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
No Logo NEELAM SHARMA, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
No Logo PUSHPALATHA SANJAI, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
No Logo SEETHALAKSHMI SUBRAMANIAM, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
No Logo VIDYA MUJUMDAR, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
No Logo YEARUA V. REDDY, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
v.
No Logo ALAM NOOR, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
No Logo DEEPIKA SABERWAL, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
No Logo JANAKI RAGHAVAN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
No Logo JYOTI ANIL GOUR, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
No Logo LEO SIMEON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
No Logo MADHURI PHILKHANA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
No Logo MANJU MISRA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
No Logo MAYA NAYAR, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
No Logo MINI P. JAYAPRAKASH, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
No Logo MRIDULA BAJAJ, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
No Logo NEELAM SHARMA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
No Logo NEWARK PUBLIC SCHOOL DISTRICT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ADAMS STERN GUTIERREZ & LATTIBOUDERE, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CHERIE L. ADAMS +1 973 735 2742 +1 973 725 2743 cadams@asgllaw.com
No Logo PUSHPALATHA SANJAI, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
No Logo SEETHALAKSHMI SUBRAMANIAM, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
No Logo VIDYA MUJUMDAR, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
No Logo YEARUA V. REDDY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EUGENE G. LISS +1 973 890 1819
Office Newark
Filed 7/17/2002
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Essex
Terminated 4/22/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BF, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 36 Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE as settled w/out costs & w/out prejudice. Signed by Judge John C. Lifland on 4/22/04. (sr, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 35 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
    SCHEDULING ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 4/21/2004 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. Status Conference set for 4/21/2004 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. Signed by Judge Mark Falk on 4/13/04. (bl, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004 Telephone Conference
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Falk: Telephone Conference held on 4/8/2004. (McNerney, L)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: 4/6/2004 Telephone Conference
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Falk: Telephone Conference held on 4/5/2004. (McNerney, L)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004 Telephone Conference
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Falk : Telephone Conference held on 3/30/2004. (ej, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Settlement Conference
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Falk : Settlement Conference held on 3/3/2004, Status Conference held on 3/3/2004. (ej, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 34 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/23/2004 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Settlement Conference set for 3/3/2004 03:30 PM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. Status Conference set for 3/3/2004 03:30 PM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk.. Signed by Judge Mark Falk on 2/23/04. (ak, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/20/2004 Settlement Conference
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Falk : Settlement Conference held on 2/19/2004, Status Conference held on 2/19/2004. (ej, )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Mail Returned
                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Scheduling Order sent to Cherie Adams. Esq.; not listed in Lawyers Diary (ak, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Settlement Conference set for 2/19/2004 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. Status Conference set for 2/19/2004 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk.. Signed by Judge Mark Falk on 1/14/04. (ak, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 11/21/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                      Deadline updated; terminating [19-2] hearing Motion set for 10/28/02 on [19-1] motion terminating [18-2] hearing Motion set for 10/28/02 on [15-1] dispositive motion notice dismissing complaint (jb)
                        LREF
                        Blank 32 Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003 Answer to Counterclaim
                        ANSWER by TEACHERS PLACEMENT to [27-2] counter claim w/certsvc. (ak)
                          LREF
                          Blank 31 Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/22/2003 Stipulation
                          STIPULATION extending time to answer, move or otherwise respond to dfts' counterclaim (ak)
                            LREF
                            Blank 29 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, setting status conference for 10/14/03 , setting settlement conference for 10/14/03 ( signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk ) (NM) (ak)
                              LREF
                              Blank 30 Filed: 9/18/2003, Entered: 10/2/2003 Answer
                              ANSWER to Verified Complaint by dft NEWARK PUBLIC SCHOOL w/certsvc. (ak)
                                LREF
                                Blank 28 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: 9/18/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                CONSENT ORDER, setting answer due for 9/12/03 for NEWARK PUBLIC SCHOOL ( signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk ) (NM) (ak)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 27 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003 Answer
                                  ANSWER w/exhibits to Complaint; jury demand and COUNTERCLAIM by dfts ALAM NOOR, DEEPIKA SABERWAL, MANJU MISRA, YEARUA V. REDDY, SEETHALAKSHMI SUBRAMANIAM, LEO SIMEON, NEELAM SHARMA, MADHURI PHILKHANA, JANAKI RAGHAVAN, MAYA NAYAR, MINI P. JAYAPRAKASH, MRIDULA BAJAJ, PUSHPALATHA SANJAI, JYOTI ANIL GOUR, VIDYA MUJUMDAR against plt (ak)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 26 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: 8/28/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                    Application/ORDER, resetting answer due for 9/12/03 for VIDYA MUJUMDAR, for JYOTI ANIL GOUR, for PUSHPALATHA SANJAI, for MRIDULA BAJAJ, for MINI P. JAYAPRAKASH, for MAYA NAYAR, for JANAKI RAGHAVAN, for MADHURI PHILKHANA, for NEELAM SHARMA, for LEO SIMEON, for SEETHALAKSHMI SUBRAMANIAM, for YEARUA V. REDDY, for MANJU MISRA, for DEEPIKA SABERWAL, for ALAM NOOR ( signed by Judge John C. Lifland ) (NM) (ak)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 25 Filed: 8/20/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Application and Clerk's Order to extend time to an
                                      APPLICATION by NEWARK PUBLIC SCHOOL and Clerk's Order extending time to answer. Answer due 9/5/03 for NEWARK PUBLIC SCHOOL (ak)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 24 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying [19-1] motion to dismiss complaint denying [18-1] dispositive motion to dismiss complaint ( signed by Judge John C. Lifland ) n/m (ak)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 23 Filed: 5/29/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                          PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 12/1/03 ; Status conference 8/12/03 ; Settlement conference 8/12/03 ; ( signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk )(NM) (ak)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 22 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                            Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: L. Johnson; Minutes of: 10/28/02; The following actions were taken, [19-1] motion to dismiss complaint taken under advisement Rule 78, [18-1] dispositive motion to dismiss complaint taken under advisement Rule 78 By Judge John C. Lifland (ak)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 21 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: 9/30/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TEACHERS PLACEMENT of copy of opposition brief to defts' motion to dismiss (jd)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 20 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: 9/30/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NEWARK PUBLIC SCHOOL of copy of reply brief (jd)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: 9/30/2002, Terminated: 7/29/2003 Motion to Dismiss
                                                  Notice of MOTION to dismiss complaint by ALAM NOOR, DEEPIKA SABERWAL, MANJU MISRA, YEARUA V. REDDY, SEETHALAKSHMI SUBRAMANIAM, LEO SIMEON, NEELAM SHARMA, MADHURI PHILKHANA, JANAKI RAGHAVAN, MAYA NAYAR, MINI P. JAYAPRAKASH, MRIDULA BAJAJ, PUSHPALATHA SANJAI, JYOTI ANIL GOUR, VIDYA MUJUMDAR, Motion set for 10/28/02 on [19-1] motion cert of service (Brief/PO Subm) (jd)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: 9/30/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                    Notice of MOTION to dismiss complaint by NEWARK PUBLIC SCHOOL, Motion set for 10/28/02 on [15-1] dispositive motion notice dismissing complaint cert of service (Brief/PO Subm) (jd)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/12/2002 Transcript
                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings taken on 08/16/02 (sr)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER that TPG's request for a preliminary injunction prohibiting the teachers from becoming or continuing to be employed by the School District is denied; denying TPG's request for a preliminary injunction prohibiting the School District from employing the Teachers directly, etc. ( signed by Judge John C. Lifland ) (NM) (jd)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/20/2002 Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion
                                                          Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion dismissing complaint by dft NEWARK PUBLIC SCHOOL (ak)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/20/2002 Certification
                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL CERTIFICATION w/exhibits of Michael Vanjani on behalf of plt TEACHERS PLACEMENT (ak)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/20/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                              Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Lynne Johnson; Minutes of: 8/16/02; The following actions were taken, OTSC w/TRO; ordered that plt's application for a TRO be denied; OTBS By Judge John C. Lifland (ak)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 8/14/2002, Entered: 8/20/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Lynne Johnson; Minutes of: 8/14/02; The following actions were taken, SETTLEMENT NEGOITIATIONS CONDUCTED; counsel indicates the case has not been settled; ordered hrg. set for 8/16/02 By Judge John C. Lifland (ak)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 8/13/2002, Entered: 8/15/2002 Affidavit
                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Ray Coleman (ak)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/15/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Matthew V. DelDuca of Plt's Reply Brief in Support of Order to Show Cause, etc. (ak)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/15/2002 Certification
                                                                      CERTIFICATION of Michael Vanjani on behalf of plt TEACHERS PLACEMENT (ak)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 8/9/2002, Entered: 8/12/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                        CERTIFICATES OF SERVICE by Eugene G. Liss of dft's brief in opposition to plt's notice of motion, etc. (ak)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 8/9/2002, Entered: 8/12/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cherie Adams of Memorandum of Law in Opposition to plt's application for an entry of an order to show cause with temporary restraints, etc. (ak)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 8/9/2002, Entered: 8/12/2002 Certification
                                                                            CERTIFICATION w/exhibits of Randall Kanter on behalf of dft NEWARK PUBLIC SCHOOL and in opposition to plt's application for temporary restraints w/certification of signature pursuant to L.Civ.R.11.2 (ak) Modified on 08/12/2002
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 8/9/2002, Entered: 8/12/2002 Affidavit
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT w/exhibits of Ray Coleman on behalf of dft NEWARK PUBLIC SCHOOL and in opposition to plt's application for temporary restraints (ak)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 8/9/2002, Entered: 8/12/2002 Certification
                                                                                CERTIFICATION w/exhibits of Richard H. Hahn on behalf of dft NEWARK PUBLIC SCHOOL and in opposition to plt's application for an entry of an Order to Show Cause w/ Temporary Restraints (ak)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: 7/25/2002 Summons Issued
                                                                                  SUMMONS(ES) issued for NEWARK PUBLIC SCHOOL, ALAM NOOR, DEEPIKA SABERWAL, MANJU MISRA, YEARUA V. REDDY, SEETHALAKSHMI SUBRAMANIAM, LEO SIMEON, NEELAM SHARMA, MADHURI PHILKHANA, JANAKI RAGHAVAN, MAYA NAYAR, MINI P. JAYAPRAKASH, MRIDULA BAJAJ, PUSHPALATHA SANJAI, JYOTI ANIL GOUR, VIDYA MUJUMDAR ( Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (ak)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/22/2002 Certification
                                                                                    CERTIFICATION w/exhibits of Radha Vanjani on behalf of plt TEACHERS PLACEMENT (ak)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/19/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                      NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. ( NEWARK - Judge John C. Lifland - Magistrate Judge Stanley R. Chesler) (NM) (femp)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/19/2002 Complaint
                                                                                        VERIFIED COMPLAINT filed FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 309432 (femp) Modified on 07/19/2002
                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 296 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?