Faragalla v. Tesla Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 5:20-cv-01025-JGB-SHK
District Judge Jesus G. Bernal, presiding

Tags
Last Updated June 25, 2021 at 2:22 PM DT (2.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Entewan Faragalla, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Shepherd, Finkelman, Miller & Shah, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kolin C. Tang +1 619 235 2416 +1 619 234 7334 ktang@sfmslaw.com
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: 6/25/2021 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation to continue status conference [51]. The Court hereby continues the June 28, 2021 status conference to July 26, 2021 at 9 a.m. (et)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: 6/24/2021 Stipulation to Continue
    Joint STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from June 28, 2021 to July 26, 2021 filed by Defendant Tesla Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Straus, Rachel)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: 6/1/2021 Notice of change of address
      NOTICE of Change of address by Kolin Tang attorney for Plaintiffs William Cravens, Entewan Faragalla, Ritesh Patel, John L Urban. Changing attorneys address to 19712 MacArthur Boulevard, Suite 222, Irvine, CA 92612. Filed by Plaintiffs William Cravens, Entewan Faragalla, Ritesh Patel, John L Urban. (Tang, Kolin)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: 5/21/2021 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation to Continue Status Conference [48]. ( Status Conference set for 6/28/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal.) (twdb)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: 5/20/2021 Stipulation to Continue
          Joint STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from May 24, 2021 to June 28, 2021 filed by Defendant Tesla Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Straus, Rachel)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 5/7/2021 Status Conference - optional html formCourt Filing
            MINUTES OF Telephonic Status Conference held before Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Further Status Conference set for 5/24/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Court Reporter: Phyllis A. Preston. (twdb)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: 4/1/2021 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE FOR AN ADDITIONAL THREE WEEKS [45] by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. The Court hereby continues the April 5, 2021 status conference to April 26, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. (lom)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: 3/30/2021 Stipulation to Continue
                Joint STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from April 5, 2021 to April 26, 2021 filed by Defendant Tesla Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Straus, Rachel)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: 3/19/2021 Notice of change of address
                  NOTICE of Change of firm name by Kolin Tang attorney for Plaintiffs William Cravens, Entewan Faragalla, Ritesh Patel, John L Urban. Changing firm name to Miller Shah, LLP. Filed by Plaintiffs William Cravens, Entewan Faragalla, Ritesh Patel, John L Urban. (Tang, Kolin)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: 3/19/2021 Notice of change of address
                    NOTICE of Change of firm name by James C Shah attorney for Plaintiffs William Cravens, Entewan Faragalla, Ritesh Patel, John L Urban. Changing firm name to Miller Shah, LLP. Filed by Plaintiffs William Cravens, Entewan Faragalla, Ritesh Patel, John L Urban. (Shah, James)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: 3/18/2021 Notice of change of address
                      NOTICE of Change of address by Amir M Nassihi attorney for Defendant Tesla Inc.. Changing attorneys address to 555 Mission Street, Suite 2300, San Francisco, CA 94105. Filed by Defendant Tesla Inc.. (Nassihi, Amir)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: 3/8/2021 Status Conference - optional html formCourt Filing
                        MINUTES OF Telephonic Status Conference (Held) before Judge Jesus G. Bernal: The deadline for Tesla to respond to the First Amended Complaint is stayed pending further order from the Court. Further Status Conference set for 4/5/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Court Reporter: Phyllis A. Preston. (twdb)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: 2/26/2021 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE TO MARCH 8, 2021 AND DEADLINE FOR TESLA TO RESPOND TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT [39] by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Having considered the parties stipulation, the Court hereby continues the March 1, 2021 status conference to March 8, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. The deadline forTesla to respond to the FAC will be set at the upcoming status conference. (lom)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021 Stipulation for Order
                            STIPULATION for Order to Continue Status Conference to March 8, 2021 and Deadline for Tesla to Respond to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Tesla Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Straus, Rachel)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 38 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: 2/19/2021 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                              SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. The telephonic status conference set for 2/22/2021 is hereby continued to 3/1/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Counsel shall dial (877)336-1831, access code: 4899258. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: 2/19/2021 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Judge Jesus G. Bernal: The Court and counsel confer. Counsel jointly update the Court on their efforts to resolve the case. Defendant makes a request to extend the time to answer. The request is granted. Defendant shall respond to the complaint by February 22, 2021. The Court sets a further telephonic status conference on February 22, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. Counsel shall dial (877)336-1831, access code: 4899258. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Phyllis A. Preston. (mga)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: 12/10/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation Regarding Defendant's Deadline to Respond to Amended Complaint [35]. The new deadline for Tesla to respond to the FAC will be set at the December 21, 2020 status conference after the parties have the opportunity to confer with the Court. (twdb)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: 12/8/2020 Stipulation to Continue
                                    STIPULATION to Continue Deadline to Respond to Amended Complaint from December 11, 2020 to December 21, 2020 Re: Amended Complaint/Petition[18] filed by Defendant Tesla Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Straus, Rachel)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 Order Extending Answer Due DeadlineCourt Filing
                                      ORDER GRANTING JOINT REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE AND STIPULATION REGARDING DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Having considered the parties' stipulation, the Court hereby sets a status conference for December 21. 2020, at 11:00 a.m. and orders the following deadlines: 1. Tesla's response to the FAC: December 11, 2020, 2. Plaintiffs' opposition to Tesla's motion (if necessary): January 11, 2021, 3. Tesla's reply in support of its motion (if necessary): February 1, 2021. (bm)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: 11/9/2020 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
                                        Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to December 11, 2020 re Amended Complaint/Petition[18] filed by Defendant Tesla Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Straus, Rachel)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: 11/3/2020 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER APPOINTING LEAD PLAINTIFFS AND CO-LEAD COUNSEL [31] by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. This Court HEREBY ORDERS that: 1. This action shall be referred to and captioned as "In re Tesla MCU Litigation"; 2. Plaintiffs, Entewan Faragalla, John L. Urban, Ritesh Patel, and William Cravens are appointed to serve as Lead Plaintiffs for the putative classes; 3. Shepherd, Finkelman, Miller & Shah, LLP and the Edgar Law Firm LLC are appointed to serve as Co-Lead Counsel for the putative classes. Refer See order for details. (lom)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: 10/29/2020 Stipulation for Order
                                            STIPULATION for Order Appointing Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel filed by Plaintiffs William Cravens, Entewan Faragalla, Ritesh Patel, John L Urban. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Tang, Kolin)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: 10/14/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation Regarding Defendant's Deadline to Respond to Amended Complaint [29]. 1. Teslas response to the FAC: November 11, 2020 2. Plaintiffs opposition to Teslas motion (if necessary): December 14, 2020 3. Teslas reply in support of its motion (if necessary): January 5, 2020. (twdb)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: 10/8/2020 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File
                                                STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Tesla Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Straus, Rachel)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/29/2020, Entered: 9/29/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: granting [27] Non-Resident Attorney Michael D. Donovan APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of William Cravens, Entewan Faragalla, Ritesh Patel and John L Urban, designating Kolin C Tang as local counsel. (lom)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: 9/22/2020, Terminated: 9/29/2020 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                    Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael D. Donovan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs William Cravens, Entewan Faragalla, Ritesh Patel, John L Urban (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 9/10/2020, Receipt No. 28028166) filed by Plaintiffs William Cravens, Entewan Faragalla, Ritesh Patel, John L Urban. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Tang, Kolin)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: 9/22/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation Regarding Deadline to Respond to Amended Complaint [25]. 1. Teslas response to the First Amended Class Action Complaint: October 12, 2020 2. Plaintiffs opposition to Teslas motion (if necessary): November 11, 2020 3. Teslas reply in support of its motion (if necessary): December 2, 2020. (twdb)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: 9/22/2020 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File
                                                        STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Tesla Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Straus, Rachel)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: 9/18/2020 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                          Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kolin Tang counsel for Plaintiff Entewan Faragalla. Michael R. Owens is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Entewan Faragalla. (Tang, Kolin)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: 9/18/2020 Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
                                                            RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form, [20] by Deputy Clerk of Court. The document is hereby stricken. Counsel may refile the application correcting the deficiencies listed in the Notice (Dkt. 20). (iva)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/15/2020, Entered: 9/15/2020 Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
                                                              NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael R Owens. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. [Late Docketing Due to Clerk's office error] (car)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/15/2020, Entered: 9/15/2020 Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
                                                                NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney John F Edgar. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. [Late Docketing Due to Clerk's office error] (car)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/15/2020, Entered: 9/15/2020 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
                                                                  NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael D. Donovan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs William Cravens, Entewan Faragalla, Ritesh Patel, John L Urban (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28028166)[19]. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Certificates of Good Standing have been required since 9/08. See LR 83-2.1.3.3. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). (Thrasher, Lupe)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: 9/10/2020, Terminated: 9/18/2020 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                    [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER DOCUMENT NO. 23] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael D. Donovan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs William Cravens, Entewan Faragalla, Ritesh Patel, John L Urban (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28028166) filed by Plaintiffs William Cravens, Entewan Faragalla, Ritesh Patel, John L Urban. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order on the Pro Hac Vice Application for Michael Donovan) (Tang, Kolin) Modified on 9/18/2020 (iva).
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/8/2020, Entered: 9/8/2020 Amended Complaint/Petition
                                                                      FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Tesla Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1], filed by Plaintiffs Entewan Faragalla(Tang, Kolin)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: 8/12/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation to Amend Complaint and Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule [15]. ( Amended Pleadings due by 9/7/2020.) SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Tesla Inc. (Straus, Rachel)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File
                                                                            STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File amended complaint and motion to dismiss briefing schedule filed by Defendant Tesla Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Straus, Rachel)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: 7/13/2020 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                                              Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nalani Lin Crisologo counsel for Defendant Tesla Inc.. Adding Nalani Crisologo as counsel of record for Tesla Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Tesla Inc.. (Attorney Nalani Lin Crisologo added to party Tesla Inc.(pty:dft))(Crisologo, Nalani)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: 7/10/2020 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
                                                                                STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Tesla Inc. answer now due 8/12/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] filed by Defendant Tesla Inc..(Straus, Rachel)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: 7/10/2020 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                                                  Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amir M Nassihi counsel for Defendant Tesla Inc.. Adding Amir Nassihi as counsel of record for Defendant Tesla Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Tesla Inc.. (Attorney Amir M Nassihi added to party Tesla Inc.(pty:dft))(Nassihi, Amir)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: 7/10/2020 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                                                    Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rachel Aleeza Straus counsel for Defendant Tesla Inc.. Adding Rachel A. Straus as counsel of record for Tesla Inc., d/b/a Tesla Motors, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Tesla Inc., d/b/a Tesla Motors, Inc.. (Attorney Rachel Aleeza Straus added to party Tesla Inc.(pty:dft))(Straus, Rachel)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: 7/10/2020 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                                                      Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael L Mallow counsel for Defendant Tesla Inc.. Adding Michael L. Mallow as counsel of record for Tesla Inc., d/b/a Tesla Motors, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Tesla Inc., d/b/a Tesla Motors, Inc.. (Attorney Michael L Mallow added to party Tesla Inc.(pty:dft))(Mallow, Michael)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: 6/26/2020 waiver of service executed
                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Entewan Faragalla. upon Tesla Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/14/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Candace Jackman for Tesla, Inc.. (Tang, Kolin)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: 5/20/2020 Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form onlyCourt Filing
                                                                                          STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: 5/14/2020 Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
                                                                                            21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] as to Defendant Tesla Inc. (car)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: 5/14/2020 Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                                                                                              NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: 5/14/2020 Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html formCourt Filing
                                                                                                NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (car)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: 5/13/2020 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Entewan Faragalla, (Tang, Kolin)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: 5/13/2020 Summons Request
                                                                                                    Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] filed by Plaintiff Entewan Faragalla. (Tang, Kolin)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: 5/13/2020 Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                                                                                                      CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Entewan Faragalla. (Tang, Kolin)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: 5/13/2020 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
                                                                                                        COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26437185 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Entewan Faragalla. (Attorney Kolin Tang added to party Entewan Faragalla(pty:pla))(Tang, Kolin)
                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 184 times.

                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                           
                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                          Need Password Help?