DE GENNARO v. CARNIVAL CRUISE LINE, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:02-cv-04518-JAG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DANA DE GENNARO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Donald M. Onorato, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald M. Onorato +1 201 343 7222
v.
Carnival Cruise Lines Carnival Cruise Lines, Defendant

Represented by Freehill, Hogan & Mahar, LLP

No Logo Richard Roe, Defendant
No Logo RICHARD ROE, INC., Defendant
Office Newark
Filed 9/18/2002
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County Bergen
Terminated 10/10/2002
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case :00- -00000[L 6833-02]
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BB, CLOSED, RULE16
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Miscellaneous Document
Returned Receipt filed RE: 10/22/02 file received in Florida (nr)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002 Terminated Case
    Case closed (nr)
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER, transferring case to the Southern Dist. of Florida ( signed by Mag. Judge G. D. Haneke ) (NM) (nr)
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: 10/2/2002 Answer
        ANSWER to Complaint by dft CARNIVAL CRUISE LINE w/certsvc. (ak)
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER, setting scheduling conference for 10:00 10/8/02 ( signed by Mag. Judge G. D. Haneke ) (NM) (nr)
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002, Terminated: 10/10/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
            NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. ( NEWARK - Judge GREENAWAY - Magistrate Judge G. DONALD HANEKE) (NM) (dr)
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Notice of Removal
              NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CARNIVAL CRUISE LINES from Superior Ct of Bergen Cty w/copies of Summons, Cmp w/ Jury demand, Certf of Service. FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 310705 (dr)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Case Referred to Arbitration
                CASE REFERRED to arbitration (dr)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 62 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?