Greenspan v. Qazi et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:20-cv-03426-JD
District Judge James Donato, presiding

Tags
Last Updated April 8, 2021 at 9:04 PM DT (2.2 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Greenspan, Aaron, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Aaron Jacob Greenspan"

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenspan, Aaron

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron J. Greenspan +1 415 670 9350 +1 415 373 3959 aarong@thinkcomputer.com
v.
Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant
Officially listed as "Elon Musk"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
Tesla, Inc. Unknown Role, Tesla, Inc.
Unknown Role, Musk, Elon Reeve
Unknown Role, Solarcity Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John C. Dwyer +1 650 843 5000 +1 650 849 7400 dwyerjc@cooley.com
Space Aarti G. Reddy +1 415 693 2000 areddy@cooley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tesla, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lindsey Renee Adams-Hess +1 408 857 0802 ladamshess@tesla.com
No Logo Qazi, Omar, Defendant
Officially listed as "Omar Qazi"

Toggle Switch Represented by Kronenberger Rosenfeld, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karl Stephen Kronenberger +1 415 955 1155 +1 415 955 1158 karl@KRInternetlaw.com
Space Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld +1 415 955 1155 +1 415 955 1158 Jeff@KRInternetlaw.com
No Logo Smick Enterprises Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kronenberger Rosenfeld, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karl Stephen Kronenberger +1 415 955 1155 +1 415 955 1158 karl@KRInternetlaw.com
Space Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld +1 415 955 1155 +1 415 955 1158 Jeff@KRInternetlaw.com
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John C. Dwyer +1 650 843 5000 +1 650 849 7400 dwyerjc@cooley.com
Space Aarti G. Reddy +1 415 693 2000 areddy@cooley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tesla, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lindsey Renee Adams-Hess +1 408 857 0802 ladamshess@tesla.com
Office San Francisco
Filed 5/20/2020
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County San Francisco
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ProSe
Flags ADRMOP,E-ProSe,ProSe
  Entries (113) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 112 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: 4/8/2021 Request For Judicial Notice
Request for Judicial Notice re [109] Opposition/Response to Motion, [110] Opposition/Response to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Supplemental and Amended Complaint and Qazi Defendants' Special Motion To Strike Claims Under California's Anti-SLAPP Statute, Civ. Proc. Code ? 425.16 filed byAaron Jacob Greenspan. (Related document(s)[109], [110]) (Greenspan, Aaron)
    LREF
    Legal Document 111 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: 4/8/2021 Declaration in Support
    Declaration of Aaron Greenspan in Support of [109] Opposition/Response to Motion, [110] Opposition/Response to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Supplemental and Amended Complaint and Qazi Defendants' Special Motion To Strike Claims Under California's Anti-SLAPP Statute, Civ. Proc. Code ? 425.16 filed byAaron Jacob Greenspan. (Related document(s)[109], [110]) (Greenspan, Aaron)
      LREF
      Legal Document 110 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: 4/8/2021 Opposition/Response to Motion
      OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [108] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Supplemental and Amended Complaint ) filed byAaron Jacob Greenspan. (Greenspan, Aaron)
        LREF
        Legal Document 109 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: 4/8/2021 Opposition/Response to Motion
        OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [107] MOTION to Strike [103] Amended Complaint,,,, State Law Claims Under California's Anti-SLAPP Statute, CCP ?425.16, and Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) ) filed byAaron Jacob Greenspan. (Greenspan, Aaron)
          LREF
          Legal Document 108 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: 3/12/2021 Motion to Dismiss
          MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Supplemental and Amended Complaint filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. Responses due by 4/9/2021. Replies due by 4/23/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Aarti Reddy ISO Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint, # (2) Exhibit 1 to Reddy Declaration, # (3) Exhibit 2 to Reddy Declaration, # (4) Exhibit 3 to Reddy Declaration, # (5) Exhibit 4 to Reddy Declaration, # (6) Exhibit 5 to Reddy Declaration, # (7) Exhibit 6 to Reddy Declaration, # (8) Exhibit 7 to Reddy Declaration, # (9) Proposed Order Granting MTD TAC, # (10) Request for Judicial Notice, # (11) Proposed Order Granting RJN)(Reddy, Aarti)
          LREF
          Legal Document 107 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: 3/12/2021 Motion to Strike
          MOTION to Strike [103] Amended Complaint,,,, State Law Claims Under California's Anti-SLAPP Statute, CCP ?425.16, and Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Omar Qazi, Smick Enterprises Inc.. Responses due by 4/9/2021. Replies due by 4/23/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger, # (2) Proposed Order)(Kronenberger, Karl)
          LREF
          Blank 106 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: 2/25/2021 Court Filing
          ORDER. On defendants' request, Dkt. No. [104], defendants Musk and Tesla, Inc. (Tesla Defendants) may file a motion to dismiss the third amended complaint, Dkt. No. [103], by March 12, 2021. Plaintiff Greenspan may file an opposition brief by April 9, 2021, and the Tesla Defendants may file a reply brief by April 23, 2021. The same briefing schedule will apply to the anticipated motion to dismiss by defendants Qazi and Smick Enterprises, Inc. (Qazi Defendants). The Court will set a hearing date for the motions if warranted after the briefing is closed. The request for an extension of page limits is denied. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/25/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF)
            LREF
            Legal Document 105 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: 2/19/2021 Opposition/Response to Motion
            OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [104] Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For An Order Changing Time and Extending Page Limits for Briefing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint ) filed byAaron Jacob Greenspan. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Aaron Greenspan, # (2) Proposed Order)(Greenspan, Aaron)
            LREF
            Legal Document 104 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: 2/19/2021 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
            Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For An Order Changing Time and Extending Page Limits for Briefing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. Responses due by 2/23/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Aarti Reddy, # (2) Proposed Order)(Reddy, Aarti)
            LREF
            Legal Document 103 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Amended Complaint
            AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byAaron Jacob Greenspan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: Tesla, Inc. Internal Documents, # (2) Exhibit B: Form CH-130: Civil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing, # (3) Exhibit C: Example Posts and Messages by Omar Qazi, # (4) Exhibit D: Plaintiff's Notice of Intent to Sue and Responses, # (5) Exhibit E: IRS Form 13909 Complaints and IRS Letter 5177, # (6) Exhibit F: Example Versions of Omar Qazi's "The Victims of Aaron Greenspan Foundation" Website, # (7) Exhibit G: Excerpts of Essays Concerning Plaintiff by Omar Qazi, # (8) Exhibit H: United States Copyright Office Certificates of Registration, # (9) Exhibit I: Example Improper "Goodwill" Charges, # (10) Exhibit J: California DMV Correspondence Regarding Autonomous Driving, # (11) Exhibit K: Relevant Tesla, Inc. Quarterly Press Releases and SEC Filing Excerpts, # (12) Exhibit L: Excerpts of Deposition Testimony, # (13) Exhibit M: Plaintiff's Transactions in Tesla, Inc.)(Greenspan, Aaron)
            LREF
            Legal Document 102 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: 1/25/2021 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER RE CONDUCT, SERVICE, AND DEFAULT MOTIONS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/25/2021. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF)
              LREF
              Blank 101 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: 1/15/2021 Court Filing
              ORDER. The request for leave to file a third amended complaint, Dkt. No. [100], is granted. The amended complaint will replace all the previously filed complaints, and should be drafted as a free-standing document that does not incorporate any prior pleadings by reference. Plaintiff should take this opportunity to ensure that the amended complaint provides a "short and plain statement" of the grounds for relief as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8(a)(2). Complaints running to 80 or more pages and accompanied by hundreds of pages of exhibits are typically not well-taken under Rule 8, and may be summarily dismissed on that basis. An amended complaint that is consistent with this Order may be filed by February 12, 2021. The pending motions to dismiss and to strike, Dkt. Nos. [75], [76], are terminated without prejudice to renewal if warranted after the amended complaint is filed. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/15/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF)
                LREF
                Legal Document 100 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/14/2021 Motion for Leave to File Document
                MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental And Amended Complaint filed by Aaron Jacob Greenspan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: Proposed Third Supplemental And Amended Complaint, # (2) Exhibit B: Proposed Third Supplemental And Amended Complaint (Redline Version), # (3) Declaration of Aaron Greenspan, # (4) Proposed Order)(Greenspan, Aaron)
                LREF
                Legal Document 99 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: 1/12/2021 CompelCourt Filing
                MOTION to Compel Compliance with Court Order filed by Aaron Jacob Greenspan. Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 1/26/2021. Replies due by 2/2/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Aaron Greenspan, # (2) Proposed Order)(Greenspan, Aaron)
                LREF
                Legal Document 98 Filed: 12/31/2020, Entered: 12/31/2020 Reply to Opposition/Response
                REPLY (re [96] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave To File Application for Default and/or Motion for Default Judgment on Smick Enterprises, Inc. ) filed byAaron Jacob Greenspan. (Greenspan, Aaron)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 97 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: 12/30/2020 Opposition/Response to Motion
                  OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [96] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave To File Application for Default and/or Motion for Default Judgment on Smick Enterprises, Inc. ) filed bySmick Enterprises Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Kronenberger, Karl)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 96 Filed: 12/28/2020, Entered: 12/28/2020 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                  ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave To File Application for Default and/or Motion for Default Judgment on Smick Enterprises, Inc. filed by Aaron Jacob Greenspan. Responses due by 1/4/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order)(Greenspan, Aaron)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 95 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: 12/9/2020 Response ( Non Motion )
                  RESPONSE re [93] Request for Judicial Notice, [92] Request for Judicial Notice iso Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Reddy, Aarti)
                    LREF
                    Blank 94 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: 12/7/2020 Court Filing
                    ORDER. The motion to strike, motion to dismiss, and motion for sanctions, Dkt. Nos. [75], [76], [83], are suitable for decision without oral argument. Civil L.R. 7-1(b). The motion hearings set for December 10, 2020, are vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/7/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 93 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: 12/3/2020 Request For Judicial Notice
                      Request for Judicial Notice re [70] Amended Complaint,,,,,,, filed byAaron Jacob Greenspan. (Related document(s)[70]) (Greenspan, Aaron)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 92 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: None Request For Judicial Notice
                        Request for Judicial Notice re [70] Amended Complaint,,,,,,, filed byAaron Jacob Greenspan. (Related document(s)[70]) (Greenspan, Aaron)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 91 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 Reply to Opposition/Response
                          REPLY (re [83] MOTION for Sanctions on Kronenberger Rosenfeld LLP, Omar Qazi and Smick Enterprises, Inc. ) filed byAaron Jacob Greenspan. (Greenspan, Aaron)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 90 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: 11/9/2020 Opposition/Response to Motion
                            OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [83] MOTION for Sanctions on Kronenberger Rosenfeld LLP, Omar Qazi and Smick Enterprises, Inc. ) filed byOmar Qazi, Smick Enterprises Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger)(Kronenberger, Karl)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 89 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: 11/6/2020 Response ( Non Motion )
                            RESPONSE re [82] Response ( Non Motion ) Reply in Support of Request for Judicial Notice and Consideration of Documents Incorporated by Reference by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Reddy, Aarti)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 88 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: 11/6/2020 Response ( Non Motion )
                              RESPONSE re [81] Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Qazi Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Reddy, Aarti)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 87 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: 11/6/2020 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                REPLY (re [76] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint ) filed byElon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Aarti Reddy, # (2) Exhibit A to the Declaration of Aarti Reddy)(Reddy, Aarti)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 86 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: 11/6/2020 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                REPLY (re [75] MOTION to Strike [70] Amended Complaint,,,,,,, State Law Claims Under California's Anti-SLAPP Statute, CCP ?425.16, and Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) ) filed byOmar Qazi, Smick Enterprises Inc.. (Kronenberger, Karl)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 85 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: 11/2/2020 Statement of Recent Decision
                                  STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byAaron Jacob Greenspan. (Related document(s)[77]) (Greenspan, Aaron)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 84 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: 11/2/2020 Court Filing
                                    ORDER. The motion for an order to show cause, Dkt. No. [77], is suitable for decision without oral argument. Civil L.R. 7-1(b). The motion hearing set for November 5, 2020, is vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/2/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 83 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: 10/26/2020 SanctionsCourt Filing
                                      MOTION for Sanctions on Kronenberger Rosenfeld LLP, Omar Qazi and Smick Enterprises, Inc. filed by Aaron Jacob Greenspan. Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 11/9/2020. Replies due by 11/16/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Aaron Greenspan, # (2) Proposed Order)(Greenspan, Aaron)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 82 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: 10/16/2020 Response ( Non Motion )
                                      RESPONSE re [76] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint 's Request for Judicial Notice by Aaron Jacob Greenspan. (Greenspan, Aaron)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 81 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: 10/16/2020 Request For Judicial Notice
                                        Request for Judicial Notice re [80] Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byAaron Jacob Greenspan. (Related document(s)[80]) (Greenspan, Aaron)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 80 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: 10/16/2020 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                          OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [75] MOTION to Strike [70] Amended Complaint,,,,,,, State Law Claims Under California's Anti-SLAPP Statute, CCP ?425.16, and Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), [76] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint ) filed byAaron Jacob Greenspan. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Aaron Greenspan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(d))(Greenspan, Aaron)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 79 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: 10/14/2020 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                          REPLY (re [77] MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Kronenberger Rosenfeld LLP and Defendants Omar Qazi and Smick Enterprises, Inc. Should Not Be Held In Contempt Of Court ) filed byAaron Jacob Greenspan. (Greenspan, Aaron)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 78 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: 10/13/2020 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                            OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [77] MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Kronenberger Rosenfeld LLP and Defendants Omar Qazi and Smick Enterprises, Inc. Should Not Be Held In Contempt Of Court ) filed byOmar Qazi, Smick Enterprises Inc.. (Kronenberger, Karl)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 77 Filed: 9/28/2020, Entered: 9/28/2020 Show CauseCourt Filing
                                              MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Kronenberger Rosenfeld LLP and Defendants Omar Qazi and Smick Enterprises, Inc. Should Not Be Held In Contempt Of Court filed by Aaron Jacob Greenspan. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 10/13/2020. Replies due by 10/20/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Aaron Greenspan, # (2) Proposed Order)(Greenspan, Aaron)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 76 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: 9/25/2020 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                              MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 10/16/2020. Replies due by 11/6/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Aarti Reddy ISO Tesla's Motion to Dismiss, # (2) Appendix A to Reddy Declaration, # (3) Exhibit 1 to Reddy Declaration, # (4) Exhibit 2 to Reddy Declaration, # (5) Exhibit 3 to Reddy Declaration, # (6) Exhibit 4 to Reddy Declaration, # (7) Exhibit 5 to Reddy Declaration, # (8) Exhibit 6 to Reddy Declaration, # (9) Exhibit 7 to Reddy Declaration, # (10) Exhibit 8 to Reddy Declaration, # (11) Proposed Order re Motion to Dismiss, # (12) Request for Judicial Notice and Consideration of Documents, # (13) Proposed Order re Request for Judicial Notice)(Reddy, Aarti) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 75 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: 9/25/2020 Motion to strikeCourt Filing
                                              MOTION to Strike [70] Amended Complaint,,,,,,, State Law Claims Under California's Anti-SLAPP Statute, CCP ยง425.16, and Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Omar Qazi, Smick Enterprises Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 10/16/2020. Replies due by 11/6/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger, # (2) Proposed Order)(Kronenberger, Karl)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 74 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: 9/9/2020 Notice of withdrawal of motion
                                              Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Sanctions on Kronenberger Rosenfeld LLP, Omar Qazi and Smick Enterprises, Inc. (Greenspan, Aaron) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 73 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: 9/2/2020 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [66] MOTION for Sanctions on Kronenberger Rosenfeld LLP, Omar Qazi and Smick Enterprises, Inc. ) filed byOmar Qazi, Smick Enterprises Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger in Support of Opposition, # (2) Declaration of Omar Qazi in Support of Opposition)(Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 72 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: 9/2/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER RE DEFAULT AND CIVILITY. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/2/2020. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: 8/31/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER. In light of the filing of the second amended complaint, Dkt. No. [70], the motions to dismiss, Dkt. Nos. [56], [65], are terminated as moot. All related deadlines and hearings are vacated. On the parties' joint request to extend page limits and set a briefing schedule, Dkt. No. [69], defendants Musk and Tesla, Inc., may file a single motion to dismiss of up to 18 pages and a reply brief of up to 12 pages. Defendants Qazi and Smick Enterprises Inc. may file a single motion to dismiss and a reply brief up to the same page limits. Defendants are advised that their briefs should not duplicate arguments. Plaintiff may file a single opposition brief of up to 35 pages that responds to both motions. The motions to dismiss are due by September 25, 2020. Plaintiff's opposition brief is due by October 16, 2020. The reply briefs are due by November 6, 2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/31/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 70 Filed: 8/26/2020, Entered: 8/26/2020 Amended complaint
                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byAaron Jacob Greenspan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: August 7, 2019 Unanswered E-Mail to Tesla Board of Directors, # (2) Exhibit B: Example Posts by Omar Qazi, # (3) Exhibit C: October 9, 2019 Bloomberg Article, # (4) Exhibit D: Twitter Direct Messages Involving Omar Qazi, # (5) Exhibit E: Plaintiff's Notice of Intent to Sue, # (6) Exhibit F: Elon Musk's Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Intent to Sue, # (7) Exhibit G: March 4, 2020 IRS Letter 5177 to Think Computer Foundation, # (8) Exhibit H: Versions of Omar Qazi's "The Victims of Aaron Greenspan Foundation" Website and Contextual Documents, # (9) Exhibit I: Essays Concerning Plaintiff by Omar Qazi, # (10) Exhibit J: SFPD Incident Report No. 190764227, # (11) Exhibit K: United States Copyright Office Registration No. TX 6-890-602 Certificate of Registration, # (12) Exhibit L: February 3, 2020 Unanswered E-Mail to Tesla Board of Directors, # (13) Exhibit M: April 29, 2020 Unanswered E-Mail to Tesla Board of Directors, # (14) Exhibit N: Open Correspondence Between David Einhorn and Elon Musk, # (15) Exhibit O: Example Redacted Tesla Litigation Vehicle Service Documents, # (16) Exhibit P: Declaration of Neil S. Greenspan, MD, PhD, # (17) Exhibit Q: Excerpts of Deposition Testimony of Martin Tripp, Karl Hansen and Elon Musk, # (18) Exhibit R: Tesla, Inc. Quarterly Press Releases and SEC Forms 10-Q / 10-K / 10-K/A, # (19) Exhibit S: Tesla, Inc. SEC Form 8-K Filed November 5, 2013, # (20) Exhibit T: California Department of Motor Vehicles Correspondence Regarding Autonomous Driving, # (21) Exhibit U: Versions of Omar Qazi's "Review" of Authoritas, # (22) Exhibit V: Tesla, Inc. Internal Documents, # (23) Exhibit W: Plaintiff's Transactions in Tesla, Inc.)(Greenspan, Aaron) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 69 Filed: 8/26/2020, Entered: 8/26/2020, Terminated: 8/31/2020 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                    Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Increase Page Limits and Set a Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Anticipated Second Amended Complaint filed by Tesla, Inc.. Responses due by 8/31/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order and Stipulated Request to Increase Page Limits and Set Briefing Schedule, # (2) Declaration of Aarti G. Reddy)(Dwyer, John) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 68 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: 8/21/2020 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                    RESPONSE re [58] Request for Judicial Notice by Aaron Jacob Greenspan. (Greenspan, Aaron) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 67 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: 8/21/2020 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                      OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [56] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ) filed byAaron Jacob Greenspan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # (2) Exhibit B: Proposed Second Amended Complaint (Redline Version), # (3) Declaration of Aaron Greenspan, # (4) Proposed Order)(Greenspan, Aaron) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 66 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: 8/19/2020, Terminated: 9/9/2020 Motion for sanctionsCourt Filing
                                                      MOTION for Sanctions on Kronenberger Rosenfeld LLP, Omar Qazi and Smick Enterprises, Inc. filed by Aaron Jacob Greenspan. Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/2/2020. Replies due by 9/9/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Aaron Greenspan, # (2) Proposed Order)(Greenspan, Aaron) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 65 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: 8/18/2020, Terminated: 8/31/2020 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                      MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and Special Motion to Strike Claims Under California's Anti-SLAPP Statute, Civ. Proc. Code ?425.16 filed by Omar Qazi, Smick Enterprises Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/1/2020. Replies due by 9/8/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger, # (2) Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion)(Kronenberger, Karl)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 64 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: 8/12/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER. The Court finds the motion to lift default, Dkt. No. [44], to be suitable for decision on the papers. Civil L.R. 7-1(b). The hearing on this motion is vacated. In light of the Court's order maintaining the stay of discovery, Dkt. No. 63, the initial case management conference is also vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/12/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 63 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: 8/7/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER. The motion to lift discovery stay, Dkt. No. [60], is denied. A stay on discovery will continue pending an order on the motion to dismiss, Dkt. No. [56]. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/7/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 62 Filed: 8/5/2020, Entered: 8/5/2020 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                          REPLY (re [44] MOTION to Set Aside Default ) filed byOmar Qazi, Smick Enterprises Inc.. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 61 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: 8/3/2020 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                            Request for Judicial Notice re [60] Emergency MOTION to Lift Stay If Relevant and Clarify Applicability of the PSLRA filed byAaron Jacob Greenspan. (Related document(s)[60]) (Greenspan, Aaron) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 60 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: 8/3/2020, Terminated: 8/7/2020 Motion to Lift Stay
                                                              Emergency MOTION to Lift Stay If Relevant and Clarify Applicability of the PSLRA filed by Aaron Jacob Greenspan. Responses due by 8/6/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Aaron Greenspan, # (2) Proposed Order)(Greenspan, Aaron) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 59 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: 7/31/2020 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                              OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [51] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Clarify and Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint, to Clarify and Set a Briefing Schedule and Page Limit for Defendants Responsive Pleading, and to Clarify the Default and Default Request, Pursuant to Lo ) filed byAaron Jacob Greenspan. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Aaron Greenspan, # (2) Proposed Order)(Greenspan, Aaron) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 58 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: 7/31/2020 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                              Request for Judicial Notice re [56] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed byElon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Related document(s)[56]) (Dwyer, John) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 57 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: 7/31/2020 Declaration in Support
                                                                Declaration of John C. Dwyer in Support of [56] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed byElon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix, # (2) Exhibit)(Related document(s)[56]) (Dwyer, John) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 56 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: 7/31/2020, Terminated: 8/31/2020 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 8/14/2020. Replies due by 8/21/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Dwyer, John) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 55 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: 7/30/2020 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [44] MOTION to Set Aside Default ) filed byAaron Jacob Greenspan. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Aaron Greenspan, # (2) Proposed Order)(Greenspan, Aaron) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 54 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: 7/30/2020 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 53 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: 7/30/2020 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                  ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Reddy, Aarti) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 52 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: 7/30/2020 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                    ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Greenspan, Aaron) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 51 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: 7/28/2020, Terminated: 9/2/2020 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                      ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Clarify and Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint, to Clarify and Set a Briefing Schedule and Page Limit for Defendants Responsive Pleading, and to Clarify the Default and Default Request, Pursuant to Local Rules 6-3 And 7-11 filed by Omar Qazi, Smick Enterprises Inc.. Responses due by 8/3/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger, # (2) Proposed Order)(Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 50 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: 7/28/2020 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                      Certificate of Interested Entities by Omar Qazi, Smick Enterprises Inc. (Amended) (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 49 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: 7/24/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Maurice Werter Trevor for Defendants Tesla, Inc. and Elon Musk (Trevor, Maurice) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 48 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: 7/23/2020 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                          Request for Judicial Notice re [45] APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST OMAR QAZI ANDSMICK ENTERPRISES, INC. filed byAaron Jacob Greenspan. (Related document(s)[45]) (Greenspan, Aaron) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 47 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: 7/21/2020 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                            REPLY (re [45] APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST OMAR QAZI ANDSMICK ENTERPRISES, INC. ) filed byAaron Jacob Greenspan. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Aaron Greenspan)(Greenspan, Aaron) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 46 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: 7/21/2020 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                            OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [45] APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST OMAR QAZI ANDSMICK ENTERPRISES, INC. ) filed byOmar Qazi, Smick Enterprises Inc.. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 45 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: 7/21/2020, Terminated: 9/2/2020 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                              APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST OMAR QAZI AND SMICK ENTERPRISES, INC. filed by Aaron Jacob Greenspan. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Aaron Greenspan)(Greenspan, Aaron) (Filed on 7/21/2020) Modified on 7/21/2020 (fabS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 44 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: 7/16/2020, Terminated: 9/2/2020 Motion to Set Aside DefaultCourt Filing
                                                                              MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Omar Qazi, Smick Enterprises Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/30/2020. Replies due by 8/6/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Omar Qazi, # (2) Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger, # (3) Proposed Order)(Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 43 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: 7/16/2020 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                              Certificate of Interested Entities by Omar Qazi, Smick Enterprises Inc. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 42 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: 7/16/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 41 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: 7/16/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Karl Stephen Kronenberger (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: 7/14/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER. In response to the parties' request for additional pages for a motion to dismiss, Dkt. No. 37, the page limits for briefing on the anticipated motion to dismiss by Elon Musk and Tesla, Inc. ("Tesla Defendants") are extended as follows: 25 pages for the Tesla Defendants' opening brief, 25 pages for plaintiff's opposition, and 15 pages for the Tesla Defendants' reply. On the Tesla Defendants' Motion to Set Briefing Schedule, Dkt. No. 34, the Tesla Defendants must file their motion to dismiss or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint, Dkt. No. 20, by July 31, 2020, with plaintiff's opposition (if any) due by August 21, 2020. The Tesla Defendants may file a reply by September 4, 2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/14/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings No NEF
                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines as to [56] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Responses due by 8/21/2020. Replies due by 9/4/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 39 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: 7/13/2020 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                        REPLY (re [14] MOTION for Costs and Expenses Pursuant to FRCP 4(d)(2) for Service on Elon Musk ) filed byAaron Jacob Greenspan. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Aaron Greenspan)(Greenspan, Aaron) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 38 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: 7/10/2020 Certificate of service
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc. re [34] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule Pursuant to Local Rules 6-3 and 7-11 , [33] Notice of Appearance, [32] Notice of Appearance (Reddy, Aarti) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: 7/10/2020, Terminated: 7/14/2020 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                          ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Increase Page Limits for Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Civ. L.R. 7-11) filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. Responses due by 7/14/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Stipulated Request and [Proposed] Order ISO Joint Administrative Motion to Increase Page Limits for Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Reddy, Aarti) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 36 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: 7/10/2020 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                          OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [34] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule Pursuant to Local Rules 6-3 and 7-11 ) filed byAaron Jacob Greenspan. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Aaron Greenspan, # (2) Proposed Order)(Greenspan, Aaron) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 35 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: 7/9/2020 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                          OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [14] MOTION for Costs and Expenses Pursuant to FRCP 4(d)(2) for Service on Elon Musk ) filed byElon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of L. Rager, # (2) Exhibit to Rager Decl., # (3) Proposed Order, # (4) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Jackman, Candace) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: 7/9/2020, Terminated: 7/14/2020 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                          ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule Pursuant to Local Rules 6-3 and 7-11 filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. Responses due by 7/13/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Aarti Reddy, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Reddy, Aarti) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: 7/9/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Dwyer (Dwyer, John) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: 7/9/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Aarti G. Reddy (Reddy, Aarti) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 31 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: 7/7/2020 Certificate of service
                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc. re [30] Certificate of Interested Entities (Jackman, Candace) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: 7/7/2020 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                Certificate of Interested Entities by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc. re [17] Certificate of Interested Entities (Amended) (Jackman, Candace) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 29 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: 7/7/2020 Certificate of service
                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc. re [24] Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Set Briefing Schedule and Extend Page Limits (Jackman, Candace) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 28 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: 7/7/2020 Notice of withdrawal of motion
                                                                                                    Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Clarification of Clerk's Declination of Default on Omar Qazi and Smick Enterprises, Inc. (Greenspan, Aaron) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: 7/7/2020 Clerks Notice of Entry of Default
                                                                                                      Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Omar Qazi and Smick Enterprises. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Related documents(s) [26]) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 26 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: 7/7/2020, Terminated: 7/7/2020 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                                                        MOTION for Entry of Default Against Omar Qazi and Smick Enterprises, Inc. filed by Aaron Jacob Greenspan. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Aaron Greenspan)(Greenspan, Aaron) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: 7/6/2020 Certificate of service
                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc. re [19] Notice of Appearance, [17] Certificate of Interested Entities (Jackman, Candace) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 24 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: 7/6/2020 Notice of withdrawal of motion
                                                                                                          Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Set Briefing Schedule and Extend Page Limits (Jackman, Candace) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 23 Filed: 7/3/2020, Entered: 7/3/2020 Proposed Order
                                                                                                            Proposed Order re [21] Opposition/Response to Motion to Set Briefing Schedule and Extend Page Limits by Aaron Jacob Greenspan. (Greenspan, Aaron) (Filed on 7/3/2020)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020, Terminated: 7/7/2020 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                              ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Clarification of Clerk's Declination of Default on Omar Qazi and Smick Enterprises, Inc. re [16] Clerk's Declination of Default, filed by Aaron Jacob Greenspan. Responses due by 7/6/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Aaron Greenspan, # (2) Proposed Order)(Greenspan, Aaron) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                              OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [18] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule and Extend Page Limits ) filed byAaron Jacob Greenspan. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Aaron Greenspan)(Greenspan, Aaron) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020 Amended complaint
                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byAaron Jacob Greenspan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: August 7, 2019 Unanswered E-Mail to Tesla Board of Directors, # (2) Exhibit B: Example Posts Concerning Plaintiff by Omar Qazi, # (3) Exhibit C: October 9, 2019 Bloomberg Article, # (4) Exhibit D: Twitter Direct Messages Involving Omar Qazi, # (5) Exhibit E: Plaintiff's Notice of Intent to Sue, # (6) Exhibit F: Elon Musk's Response to Plaintiffs Notice of Intent to Sue, # (7) Exhibit G: March 4, 2020 IRS Letter 5177 to Think Computer Foundation, # (8) Exhibit H: Omar Qazi's "The Victims of Aaron Greenspan Foundation" Website, # (9) Exhibit I: Essays Concerning Plaintiff by Omar Qazi, # (10) Exhibit J: SFPD Incident Report No. 190764227, # (11) Exhibit K: United States Copyright Office Registration No. TX 6-890-602 Certificate of Registration, # (12) Exhibit L: February 3, 2020 Unanswered E-Mail to Tesla Board of Directors, # (13) Exhibit M: April 29, 2020 Unanswered E-Mail to Tesla Board of Directors, # (14) Exhibit N: Open Correspondence Between David Einhorn and Elon Musk, # (15) Exhibit O: Example Redacted Tesla Litigation Vehicle Service Documents, # (16) Exhibit P: Declaration of Neil S. Greenspan, MD, PhD, # (17) Exhibit Q: Excerpts of Deposition Testimony of Martin Tripp, Karl Hansen and Elon Musk, # (18) Exhibit R: Tesla, Inc. Quarterly Press Releases and SEC Forms 10-Q / 10-K / 10-K/A, # (19) Exhibit S: Plaintiff's Transactions in Tesla, Inc.)(Greenspan, Aaron) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: 7/1/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Candace A Jackman (Jackman, Candace) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: 7/1/2020, Terminated: 7/6/2020 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule and Extend Page Limits filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. Responses due by 7/6/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Candace Jackman, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Proposed Order)(Adams-Hess, Lindsey) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: 7/1/2020 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                Certificate of Interested Entities by Tesla, Inc. (Adams-Hess, Lindsey) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: 7/1/2020 Clerks Declination of Default
                                                                                                                  Clerk's DECLINATION OF DEFAULT. Affidavit of service does not meet requirements of California Code of Civil Procedure 417.10 and Civil L.R. 4-2. (Related documents(s) [15])(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: 6/30/2020, Terminated: 7/1/2020 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Entry of Default Against Omar Qazi and Smick Enterprises, Inc. filed by Aaron Jacob Greenspan. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Aaron Greenspan)(Greenspan, Aaron) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: 6/25/2020 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Costs and Expenses Pursuant to FRCP 4(d)(2) for Service on Elon Musk filed by Aaron Jacob Greenspan. Responses due by 7/9/2020. Replies due by 7/16/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Aaron Greenspan, # (2) Proposed Order)(Greenspan, Aaron) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: 6/25/2020 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aaron Jacob Greenspan as to Elon Musk, effective 6/23/2020 (Greenspan, Aaron) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: 6/19/2020 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aaron Jacob Greenspan as to Tesla, Inc. effective 6/12/2020 (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service Unexecuted Summons as to Omar Qazi, # (2) Certificate/Proof of Service Unexecuted Summons as to Smick Enterprises, Inc.)(Greenspan, Aaron) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/9/2020, Entered: 6/9/2020 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aaron Jacob Greenspan as to Omar Qazi and Smick Enterprises, Inc. effective 6/7/2020 (Greenspan, Aaron) (Filed on 6/9/2020)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: 6/3/2020 Case Management Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/3/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: 5/27/2020 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 05/27/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: 5/27/2020 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text OnlyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: 5/27/2020 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aaron Jacob Greenspan.. (Greenspan, Aaron) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: 5/27/2020 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                              Certificate of Interested Entities by Aaron Jacob Greenspan identifying Other Affiliate Think Computer Corporation, Other Affiliate Turing Feynman LLC for Aaron Jacob Greenspan. (Greenspan, Aaron) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/21/2020, Entered: 5/21/2020 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to Elon Musk, Omar Qazi, Smick Enterprises Inc., Tesla, Inc. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 5/21/2020, Entered: 5/21/2020 New Case Filing Fee
                                                                                                                                  FEE PAID (Filing fee$ 400, Pay.gov Tracking ID: 26P0CBHG). (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/21/2020, Entered: 5/21/2020 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                                                                    Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: 5/21/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                      Proposed Summons. (Attachments: # (1) Musk, # (2) Smick, # (3) Tesla)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: 5/21/2020 Complaint
                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Elon Musk, Omar Qazi, Smick Enterprises Inc., Tesla, Inc. Filed by Aaron Greenspan. Consent/Declination due by 6/3/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2020: # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit F, # (8) Exhibit G, # (9) Exhibit H, # (10) Exhibit I, # (11) Exhibit J, # (12) Exhibit K, # (13) Exhibit L, # (14) Exhibit M) (wsnS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 12,718 times.

                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?