Elie Laskar v. Tesla Motors, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. 20BBCV00306

Tags
Last Updated December 14, 2020 at 12:37 AM ST (9.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Laskar Elie, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Friedman Todd
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Motors Inc."
Type Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Request for Dismissal - Before Trial not following ADR or more than 60 days since ADR 09/25/2020
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: 9/25/2020 Request For Dismissal
    Blank 12 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: 7/16/2020 Proof Of Personal Service
      Blank 11 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: 6/29/2020 United States District Court Civil Minutes
        Blank 10 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: 6/29/2020 United States District Court Acknowledgment of Receipt
          Blank 9 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: 6/29/2020 United States District Court Civil Docket
            Blank 8 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: 5/14/2020 Summons
            - First Amended Complaint
              Blank 7 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: 5/14/2020 Amended Complaint
              - First
                Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: 5/5/2020 Notice of Case Management Conference
                  Blank 5 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: 5/5/2020 Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
                    Blank 4 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: 5/5/2020 Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
                      Blank 3 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: 5/5/2020 Civil Case Cover Sheet
                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: 5/5/2020 Summons
                        on Complaint
                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: 5/5/2020 Complaint

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 45 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?