SANTIAGO v. COMM SOCIAL SECURITY
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:02-cv-04506-GEB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo ELIESEL SANTIAGO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JAMES LANGTON +1 732 499 9400 mandyg1017@aol.com
v.
No Logo COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ANTHONY J. LABRUNA, JR. +1 973 645 2926 anthony.labruna@usdoj.gov
Office Newark
Filed 9/17/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 862 - Social Security: Black Lung
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition District Court Affirmed Decision in its Entirety
County Essex
Terminated 8/8/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '06-4105'['3rd circuit']
Def Custody Status
Flag 12BF
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 USCA Mandate
MANDATE of USCA as to [12] Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA) filed by ELIESEL SANTIAGO (Attachments: # (1) Opinion)(ca3trj, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006, Terminated: 6/6/2008 Appeal Transcript Request
    TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by ELIESEL SANTIAGO re [12] Notice of Appeal (USCA), "None" selected in Section 1A. (ji, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006, Terminated: 6/6/2008 USCA Case Number
      USCA Case Number 06-4105 for [12] Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA) filed by ELIESEL SANTIAGO,. USCA Case Manager Tim McIntyre (Document Restricted - Court Only) (McIntyre, Gregory)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006, Terminated: 6/6/2008 Notice of Appeal (USCA)
        NOTICE OF APPEAL by ELIESEL SANTIAGO. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (Attachments: # (1) Application IFP)(LANGTON, JAMES)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/8/2006 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
          ORDER denying appeal and CLOSING case. Signed by Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr. on 8/3/06. (ms)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/8/2006 OpinionCourt Filing
            MEMORANDUM OPINION . Signed by Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr. on 8/3/06. (ms)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
              ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr. for all further proceedings. Judge Susan D. Wigenton no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr. on 8/3/06. (DD, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton for all further proceedings. Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr. no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr. on 7/5/06. (DD, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                  ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr. for all further proceedings. Judge John C. Lifland no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr. on 4/3/06. (ck )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004 Brief
                    BRIEF PURS TO LOCAL RULE 9.1 filed by COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. (DD, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004 Brief
                      BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by ELIESEL SANTIAGO. (DD, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 Answer
                        ANSWER filed in Social Security Case by COMM SOCIAL SECURITY Plaintiff's Brief due 5/7/03 (Admin. Record Received) (DD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 12/31/2002, Entered: 1/2/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                          CONSENT ORDER, extending time , set answer due for 1/15/03 for COMM SOCIAL SECURITY ( signed by Judge John C. Lifland ) (NM) (DD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                            NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. ( NEWARK - Judge LIFLAND - Magistrate Judge STANLEY R CHESLER) (NM) (dr)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Summons Issued
                              SUMMONS(ES) issued for COMM SOCIAL SECURITY ( 60 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (dr)
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT filed FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 310684 (dr)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 77 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?