USA v. Perez-Gorda et al
Criminal Case Texas Western District Court, Case No. 5:17-cr-00845

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 16, 2021 at 4:24 PM DT (1.3 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 9/16/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Travel
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 9/15/2021, Entered: None Travel
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/10/2021, Entered: None Order to Continue - Ends of Justice
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/2/2021, Entered: None Sealed Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/21/2021, Entered: None Sealed Document
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/16/2021, Entered: None Sealed Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/15/2021, Entered: None Sealed Order on Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: None Sealed Order on Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Hearing
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Continue
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Order Granting Motion for Continuance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Hearing
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Order to Continue - Ends of Justice
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None Sealed Order on Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Sealed Order on Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None Continue
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: None Sealed Order on Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: None Sealed Order on Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/5/2020, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Continue
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 282 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?