District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit United States Supreme Court

USA v. Joseph Merlino
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, Case No. 14-4341

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 5, 2020 at 7:15 PM DT (10.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Joseph Merlino, Aka Skinny Joey, Defendant - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY SCOTT SILVER +1 215 988 9098 lawofficesofgaryssilver@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Bull Run Hall

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL F. MYERS +1 609 348 1125 +1 609 348 3774 mmyers05@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by jacobsbarbone.law Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EDWIN J. JACOBS, JR. +TEL 609 348 1125 ejacobs@jacobsbarbone.law
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David E. Fritchey +1 215 861 8668 +1 215 861 8618 david.fritchey@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ZANE D. MEMEGER zane.memeger@usdoj.gov
Space JOSEPH F. MINNI +1 215 861 8574 +1 215 861 8618 joseph.minni@usdoj.gov
Space DAVID E. TROYER +1 215 861 8475 +1 215 861 8618 david.troyer@usdoj.gov
Nature of Suit
Case Type criminal
Lower Court Case http://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/iquery.pl?caseNumber=2-99-cr-00363-001
Lower Court Case http://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/iquery.pl?caseNumber=2-99-cr-00363-001
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011977515 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None ?
Mandate Reissued, filed. (JK)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011977111 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None ?
    ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney David E. Troyer, Esq. for Appellee USA Letter advising no further appeal. Certificate of Service dated 06/01/2015. (DET)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011965219 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None ?Court Filing
      ORDER (AMBRO, VANASKIE and SHWARTZ, Circuit Judges) granting Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Rehearing for 30 days and also construed as a Motion to Recall the Mandate filed by Appellee USA, filed. VANASKIE, Authoring Judge. (JK)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011953963 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None ?
        ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellee USA for Extension of Time to file Petition for Rehearing for 30 days and also construed as a Motion to Recall the Mandate. Certificate of Service dated 05/06/2015.--[Edited 05/13/2015 by JK] (DET)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011953204 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None ?
          INTERNAL: Document posted. (NR)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011952758 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None ?Court Filing
            PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: AMBRO, VANASKIE and SHWARTZ, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 36. Judge: AMBRO Authoring, Judge: SHWARTZ Dissenting, Judge: AMBRO Concurring. (JK)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011943261 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None ?
              ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney David E. Troyer, Esq. for Appellee USA Letter advising recent Supreme Court case. Certificate of Service dated 04/24/2015. (DET)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011943176 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None ?
                INTERNAL: Document posted. (JK)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011943161 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None ?
                  MANDATE ISSUED, filed.--[RECALLED per Court's Order dated 5/18/2015 - Edited 05/18/2015 by JK] (JK)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011943145 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                    ORDER (AMBRO, VANASKIE and SHWARTZ, Circuit Judges) It is hereby ordered that the orders of the District Court entered 10/20/2014 and 10/24/2014 are reversed and Appellant shall be released from custody immediately. Judge Shwartz dissents from the disposition. The Court will issue its majority, concurring and dissenting opinions at a later time. The mandate shall issue forthwith, filed. Judge: VANASKIE Authoring, Judge: SHWARTZ Dissenting (JK)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011934026 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None ?
                      ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Michael F. Myers, Esq. for Appellant Joseph Merlino. Certificate of Service dated 04/14/2015. (MFM)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None ?
                        ARGUED on Tuesday, April 14, 2015. Panel: AMBRO, VANASKIE and SHWARTZ, Circut Judges. Edwin J. Jacobs, Jr. arguing for Appellant Joseph Merlino; David E. Troyer arguing for Appellee United States of America. (CMH)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011932512 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None ?
                          COURT MINUTES OF ARGUED/SUBMITTED CASES. [13-2087, 13-2088, 13-2090, 14-1235, 14-1755, 14-1756, 14-3987, 14-4341, 14-3147, 14-1890, 14-2913, 14-3861, 14-4103] --[Edited 04/26/2015 by GPK to correct docket text] (CMH)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011929654 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None ?
                            ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney David E. Troyer, Esq. for Appellee USA Letter re custodial status. Certificate of Service dated 04/10/2015. (DET)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011901377 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None ?
                              Oral Argument Notification for Tuesday, 04/14/2015. (CMH)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011879426 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None ?
                                ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Edwin J. Jacobs, Jr. on behalf of Appellant(s) Joseph Merlino. (EJJ)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011879164 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None ?
                                  ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney David E. Troyer, Esq. for Appellee USA. Certificate of Service dated 02/17/2015. (DET)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011878224 Filed: 2/16/2015, Entered: None ?
                                    ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Michael F. Myers, Esq. for Appellant Joseph Merlino. Certificate of Service dated 02/16/2015. (MFM)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011872277 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None ?
                                      Calendared for Tuesday, 04/14/15. (Rescheduled from Monday, 04/13/2015) (CMH)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank  Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None ?
                                        HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Joseph Merlino - Reply Brief. Copies: 7. (SJB)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011859405 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None ?
                                          ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC REPLY BRIEF on behalf of Appellant Joseph Merlino, filed. Certificate of Service dated 01/26/2015 by ECF. (MFM)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank  Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None ?
                                            HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellee USA - Supplemental Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: 1. (EMA)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None ?
                                              HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellee USA - Brief. Copies: 7. (KEL)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011847816 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                ECF FILER: SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX on behalf of Appellee USA, filed. Certificate of Service dated 01/13/2015 by ECF. [Entry edited by the Clerk's Office to reflect the correct event]--[Edited 01/14/2015 by MS] (DET)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011847813 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                  ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellee USA, filed. Certificate of Service dated 01/13/2015 by ECF. (DET)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank  Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                    HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Joseph Merlino - Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: 3 (Volume I attached to Brief). Received: 7. (EAF)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                      HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Joseph Merlino - Addendum to Appendix. Copies: 4. (RM)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                        HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Joseph Merlino - Brief with Volume I of Appendix attached. Copies: 7. (RM)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                          TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) directing Attorney Michael F. Myers, Esq. for Appellant Joseph Merlino to submit hard copies for the Brief and Appendix e-filed on 12/22/14, filed. Due on or before 01/05/2015. (MS)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                            COMPLIANCE RECEIVED. Addendum to Appendix wtih District Court docket report received from Appellant Joseph Merlino. (MS)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 003011834266 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                              ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC ADDENDUM to APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant Joseph Merlino , filed. Certificate of Service dated 12/29/2014 by ECF.--[Edited 12/30/2014 by MS] (MFM)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011829953 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                NON COMPLIANCE Order issued to Appellant Joseph Merlino regarding the brief and/or appendix filed on 12/22/2014. Please open the attachment for the full text of the Order. Compliance due by 12/29/2014. This Order does not change the deadline for filing the next brief. (MS)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011829511 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                  ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant Joseph Merlino, filed. Certificate of Service dated 12/22/2014 by ECF. (MFM)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011829508 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                    ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant Joseph Merlino, filed. Certificate of Service dated 12/22/2014 by ECF. (MFM)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 003011829499 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                      ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Volume I of Appendix attached on behalf of Appellant Joseph Merlino, filed. Certificate of Service dated 12/22/2014 by ECF. (MFM)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011829107 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                        BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Joseph Merlino due on or before 01/21/2015. Appendix due on or before 01/21/2015 (JK)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011829097 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER (RENDELL and SMITH, Circuit Judges) denying the Motion to Expedite and Stay Execution of Sentence filed by Appellant Joseph Merlino, filed. Panel No.: ECO-006-E. RENDELL, Authoring Judge. (JK)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011826742 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                            ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee USA to Motion stay request, Motion to Expedite. Certificate of Service dated 12/19/2014. (DET)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011821773 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                              ECF FILER: SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC ADDENDUM to MOTION on behalf of Appellant Joseph Merlino , filed. Certificate of Service dated 12/15/2014 by ECF. (MFM)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank  Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                CLERK EVENT transcript by Court Reporter Ms. Joan Carr filed in District Court on 12/03/2014. (JK)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                  TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) In accordance with 3d Cir. LAR 4.1, a motion to expedite an appeal must include the proposed briefing schedule. On or before 5:00 p.m. today, 12/15/14, Appellant must file a supplement to his 12/13/14 motion outlining the proposed briefing schedule. Appellee's response to the motion must then be filed no later than 2 p.m. on Friday, 12/19/14. (HAG)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011820529 Filed: 12/14/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    ECF FILER: Exhibit E to Defendant's Motion to Stay Sentence Pending Appeal, for expedited consideration of this Motion, to expedite Appeal, and to extend Defendant's January 5, 2015 Reporting Date until after this Couit decides Defendant's Stay Motion filed by Appellant Joseph Merlino. Certificate of Service dated 12/13/2014. (MFM)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011820523 Filed: 12/13/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      ECF FILER: Exhibits A, B, C, and D to Defendant's Motion to Stay Sentence Pending Appeal, to Expedite consideration of this Motion, to Expedite Appeal, and to Extend Defendant's Reporting Date of January 5, 2015 until after this Court decides Defendant's Stay Motion filed by Appellant Joseph Merlino. Certificate of Service dated 12/13/2014. (MFM)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011820520 Filed: 12/13/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellant Joseph Merlino to stay Execution of Sentence Pending Appeal or in the alternative to Extend Defendant's Prison Reporting Date of January 5, 2015 Until the Third CIrcuit Rules on Defendant's Motion to Stay Execution of Sentence Pending Appeal, to Expedite Consideration of Defendant's Motion to Stay Execution of Sentence Pending Appeal and Defedant's Appeal. Certificate of Service dated 12/13/2014. (MFM)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011797614 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          ECF FILER: TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER (Part II) filed by VERITEXT TRANSCRIPITION SERVICE for date(s) of OCTOBER 10, 2014 AND OCTOBER 24, 2014. (JC)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 11/12/2014. (JK)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011790452 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                              ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David E. Troyer on behalf of Appellee(s) United States of America. (DET)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011789424 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                ORDER to Court Reporter Ms. Joan Carr directing transcripts, ordered on 11/07/2014 , to be filed by 12/10/2014. (JK)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011788668 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  ECF FILER: CRIMINAL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Joseph Merlino, filed. (MFM)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011788663 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                    ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Joseph Merlino, received. (MFM)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011788596 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                      ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Joseph Merlino advising this court that transcripts are needed. Requested date(s) are: October 10, 2014 and October 24, 2014, to be filed by (MFM)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011788593 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                        ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael F. Myers, Esquire on behalf of Appellant(s) Joseph Merlino. (MFM)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                          PARTIAL RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF (From Document No. 912 and 918 forward available on CM/ECF). (JK)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011782987 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                            CRIMINAL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Joseph Merlino in District Court No. 2-99-cr-00363-001. (JK)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 73 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?