Alief Independent School District v. Tesla Lease Trust
State Civil Lawsuit District Court of Harris County, Texas, Case No. 202034468-7

Tags
Last Updated June 10, 2020 at 11:08 PM EDT (1.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo ALIEF INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, Plaintiff
No Logo HARRIS COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT # 278, Plaintiff
No Logo HARRIS-FORT BEND COUNTIES MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT # 3, Plaintiff
No Logo HUMBLE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, Plaintiff
No Logo Klein Independent School District, Plaintiff
No Logo TOMBALL INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Lease Trust"
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None
Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit
    Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None
    ORIGINAL INTERVENTION
      Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: None
      Original Intervention
        Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/9/2020, Entered: None
        CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT
          Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/9/2020, Entered: None
          PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 735 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?